Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel Featured Case

Admiralty in rem action over an Italian-registered passenger ship which sank in 1915 during World War I and is lying at a depth of 500 meters in international waters approximately 65 miles southeast of Sardinia in the Mediterranean Sea.

Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Defendant: The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel
Claimant: Kingdom of Spain
Case Number: 8:2007cv00616
Filed: April 9, 2007
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Referring Judge: Mary S. Scriven
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2008 102
RECEIPT for return of exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes as to Kingdom of Spain. (AG)
April 15, 2008 101
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/5/08 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson. (Entire Transcript is filed with 8:06-cv-1685). (RFM)
April 4, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER approving 94 --Kingdom of Spain's voluntary dismissal of 14 --verified claim; dismissing without prejudice Spain's claim; denying as moot 32 --Odyssey Marine Exploration Inc.'s motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/4/2008. (BK)
April 3, 2008 98
AFFIDAVIT of K. Russell LaMotte re: 97 Unopposed MOTION for K. Russell LaMotte to appear pro hac vice by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 2, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 93 Motion to conduct hearing in camera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/2/2008. (MTT)
April 1, 2008 94
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kingdom of Spain (Goold, James)
March 31, 2008 93
MOTION to Conduct Hearing In Camera by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 12, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion for an order declaring certain materials as not confidential. The Clerk of Court is directed to return to Spain the items filed by Spain under seal as attachments to its Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (doc. 87). Spain is directed to notify the Court within 30 days whether it intends to pursue a claim in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/12/2008. (DK)
March 6, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 --motion to dismiss; denying 17 --motion for more definite statement. Counts 3-6 are dismissed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2008. (BK)
March 5, 2008 90
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/5/2008. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (MTT)
March 4, 2008 89
RESPONSE to motion re 87 MOTION for leave to file under seal filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 3, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 84 Motion to conduct the March 5, 2008 hearing in camera; granting 87 Motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/3/2008. (MTT)
February 28, 2008 87
MOTION for leave to file under seal by Kingdom of Spain. (AG)
February 22, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ruling deferred 82 Motion seeking an order finding certain materials not confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 2/22/2008. (DK)
February 20, 2008 85
RESPONSE in opposition re 84 MOTION to Conduct March 5 Hearing In Camera filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
February 19, 2008 84
MOTION to Conduct March 5 Hearing In Camera by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 8, 2008 83
RESPONSE to motion re 82 MOTION to declare certain materials as not confidential under the protective order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 81 filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 10, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court
PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/10/2008. (DK)
January 9, 2008 77
PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Newspaper: El Pais Date(s) of publication 11/18/07. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 21, 2007 73
NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 47 Summons issued o fStatus of Service of Process on Kingdom of Spain (Thiel, Eric)
November 28, 2007 71 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER setting forth procedures for identical or parallel filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/28/2007. (MTT)
November 26, 2007 70
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/26/2007. (MTT)
November 19, 2007 69
ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 65 Order setting preliminary pretrial by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 13, 2007 68
ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 65 Order setting preliminary pretrial by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 7, 2007 67
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 65 Order setting preliminary pretrial (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 5, 2007 66
REPLY to response to motion re 41 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 2, 2007 65 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER setting preliminary pretrial. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/2/2007. (maa)
October 30, 2007 64
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 26, 2007 63 Opinion or Order of the Court
ENDORSED ORDER granting 62 --motion by Kingdom of Spain to file a reply to 58 --plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/26/2007. (BK)
October 25, 2007 62
Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Claimant's Motion to Dismiss by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 22, 2007 61
REQUEST for oral argument re 30 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment, 32 MOTION for preliminary injunction, 41 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 10, 2007 57 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 56 --motion to extend to 10/30/2007 the time within which to file case management report. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/10/2007. (BK)
October 5, 2007 54 Opinion or Order of the Court
ENDORSED ORDER granting 52 --motion for extension of time within which to respond to 41 --motion to dismiss amended complaint. Response due 10/22/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2007. (BK) Modified on 10/9/2007 (CH).
October 3, 2007 52
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Thiel, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 28, 2007 49 Opinion or Order of the Court
ENDORSED ORDER granting 46 --Odyssey's motion for leave to file a five-page reply to 42 --Spain's opposition to 28 , 32 --Odyssey's motions for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/28/2007. (BK)
September 27, 2007 47
Summons issued as to Kingdom of Spain. (CH)
September 26, 2007 46
MOTION for leave to file Reply to Claimant Kingdom of Spain's Opposition to Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 25, 2007 44 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER directing the Clerk to designate Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo as the magistrate assigned to this case. NEW CASE NUMBER: 8:07-cv-616-T-23MAP. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/25/2007. (BK)
September 19, 2007 43
MEMORANDUM in opposition re 30 Motion for protective order, 27 Motion for protective order, filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
September 7, 2007 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 plaintiff's Second Joint Motion for extension of time to file completed case management report. The case management report shall be filed on or before 10/9/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/7/2007. (maa)
September 6, 2007 38
Second MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report (Joint Motion) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 16, 2007 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER transferring case to Judge Merryday, with his consent. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 8/16/2007. (len)
August 15, 2007 34
NOTICE by Kingdom of Spain of Motion to Transfer Related Cases (Local Rule 1.04(b)) (Goold, James)
August 14, 2007 33
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment, 32 MOTION for preliminary injunction, 29 Amended complaint by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven.
July 27, 2007 22
Joint MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
July 23, 2007 20
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION for more definite statement and related relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven.
June 26, 2007 18
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION for more definite statement and related relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven.
June 19, 2007 17
MOTION for more definite statement and related relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
June 7, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 15 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/7/2007. (MEH)
June 1, 2007 15
Unopposed MOTION for James A. Goold to appear pro hac vice by Kingdom of Spain. (Banker, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven.
May 7, 2007 13
PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Newspaper: The Tampa Tribune Date(s) of publication 4/30/07. (Thiel, Eric)
April 25, 2007 11
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2007. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (smb)
April 12, 2007 4
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/12/2007. (smb)
April 11, 2007 3
MOTION for Order Directing Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest In Rem by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 9, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T041141) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.(CH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kingdom of Spain
Represented By: Keith Dennis Skorewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?