Eros, LLC v. Doe Featured Case

Plaintiff Eros, LLC, a maker and seller of virtual adult-themed objects within the Second Life platform, sued defendants and alleged that they have made and sold unauthorized copies of plaintiff's virtual products within Second Life using plaintiff's trademark.

Plaintiff: Eros, LLC
Defendant: Robert Leatherwood and John 1-10 Does
Case Number: 8:2007cv01158
Filed: July 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Presiding Judge: Thomas G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2008 Filing 21 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order/Consent Judgment) (MRH)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion to enter consent judgment. Consent Judgment Attached. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 3/20/2008. (JD)
March 20, 2008 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Consent judgment as to Defendant Robert Leatherwood, Declaration of Francis X. Taney, Jr., Judgment by Consent as to Defendant Robert Leatherwood, Certificate of Service by Eros, LLC. (Taney, Francis)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Motion to extend time until 3/21/08 to move for default judgment. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 3/7/2008. (JD)
March 7, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to extend time to Apply for Default Judgment, Declaration of Francis X. Taney, Jr. and Certificate of Service by Eros, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taney, Francis)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: A review of the file reveals that a default has been entered against Defendant Leatherwood, and Plaintiff has failed to promptly move for default judgment pursuant to Local Rule 1.07. Therefore, Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before 3/7/08, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Local Rule 3.10. Failure to respond shall result in this action being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/28/2008. (JD)
November 16, 2007 Filing 15 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert Leatherwood (MRH)
November 15, 2007 Filing 14 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Robert Leatherwood by Eros, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Francis X. Taney, Jr. in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Robert Leatherwood, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Villoch, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 30, 2007 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on October 25, 2007 by Eros, LLC as to Robert Leatherwood. (Villoch, Alfred)
October 24, 2007 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Robert Leatherwood. (mrh)
October 24, 2007 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Robert Leatherwood, John Does 1-10 with Jury Demand filed by Eros, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Villoch, Alfred) Modified on 10/25/2007 (mrh).
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Second Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/5/2007. (Williams, Carrie)
September 4, 2007 Filing 9 Second MOTION for discovery EX PARTE EMERGENCY Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoenas and Conduct Related Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Eros, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoenas# 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kevin Alderman# 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Form of Order)(Villoch, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER VACATING 7 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. The motion 6 is granted. Francis X. Tanney is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by August 30, 2007. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/31/2007. (jd, )
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 6 motion to appear pro hac vice due to the failure to pay the special admission fee. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/30/2007. (jd, ) Modified on 8/1/2007 (mrh). NOTE: VACATED PURSUANT TO 8 ENDORSED ORDER ENTERED 7/31/07.
July 16, 2007 Filing 6 MOTION for Francis X. Taney, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Eros, LLC. (Villoch, Alfred)
July 13, 2007 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 with Notice of Expected Deadlines and Case Management Report made a part herein. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/13/2007. (ls )
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion to issue subpoenas; granting 2 Motion for related discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/5/2007. (Wilson, Thomas)
July 5, 2007 Filing 3 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: # 1) (ag)
July 3, 2007 Filing 2 EX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION for leave to issue subpoenas, MOTION to conduct related discovery, with incorporated memorandum of law by Eros, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(ag) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 3, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ; jury demand (Filing fee $350.00; receipt number T042148) filed by Eros, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eros, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eros, LLC
Represented By: Alfred Villoch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Leatherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?