Hunt v. Hillsborough County et al Featured Case

Claim that library patrons should be able to bring their own scanners instead of paying to use photocopy machine.

Plaintiff: Dennis Hunt
Defendant: Hillsborough County, City of Tampa, James J. Lumsford Law Library, Stephen Hogue, Bennie Holder, Charles A. Hathcox, Norma J. Wise, Bill C. Spradlin, David L. Pilver, Sandra Kellaher and Scott Dunlap
Case Number: 8:2007cv01168
Filed: July 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Presiding Judge: Thomas G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2011 Filing 129 CLERK'S certificate of destruction of PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes (JLH)
March 8, 2011 Filing 128 PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT EXHIBITS: The records in this case indicate that this case was disposed of more than thirty (30) days ago. The records also indicate that the Clerk's Office is in possession of various exhibits used during the proceedings.Pursuant to Local Rule 5.04, you are notified that you have thirty (30) days for the removal of the exhibits from the custody of the Clerk's Office, or the exhibits will be destroyed, as permitted by Local Rule 5.04. (JLH)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 126 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Motion was taken under advisement during trial and denied as moot post jury verdict.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/13/2010. (SMB)
May 13, 2010 Filing 126 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rule 50) and Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
May 12, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE of exhibits placed in the exhibit room (jury trial - 1 envelope) (JLH)
May 12, 2010 Filing 124 JUDGMENT in favor of David L. Pilver and against Dennis Hunt. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/12/2010. (SMB)
May 12, 2010 Filing 123 JURY VERDICT. (SMB)
May 12, 2010 Filing 122 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY TRIAL (DAY 3) completed on 5/12/2010. Testimony completed. Verdict rendered. Verdict for the Defendant. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
May 12, 2010 Filing 121 DEFENDANT'S FINALIZED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (SMB)
May 12, 2010 Filing 120 PLAINTIFF'S FINALIZED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (SMB)
May 12, 2010 Filing 119 COURT'S JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (SMB)
May 11, 2010 Filing 118 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY TRIAL (DAY 2) held on 5/11/2010. Trial will resume on 5/12/10 at 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORAL ORDER denying 84 Defendant's motion in limine; denying 101 Plaintiff's amended motion in limine. Issued by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/10/2010. (SMB)
May 10, 2010 Filing 116 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL (DAY 1) held on 5/10/2010. Jury selected and sworn. Testimony offered. Trial will resume on 5/11/10 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED ORDER granting 112 Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time to file Proposed Verdict Form. Extension granted through May 3, 2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/6/2010. (LN)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ENDORSED ORDER granting 111 Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time to file Jury Instructions. Extension granted through May 3, 2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/6/2010. (LN)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ENDORSED ORDER granting 110 Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time to file Exhibit and Witness Lists. Extension granted through May 3, 2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/6/2010. (LN)
May 5, 2010 Filing 112 MOTION for extension of time to file document - proposed verdict form by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
May 5, 2010 Filing 111 MOTION for extension of time to file document - proposed jury instructions by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
May 5, 2010 Filing 110 MOTION for extension of time to file documents - exhibit and witness lists by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
May 4, 2010 Filing 109 EXHIBIT LIST For Trial by David L. Pilver.. (Todd, Stephen)
May 4, 2010 Filing 108 WITNESS LIST by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENDORSED ORDER denying 106 Motion to extend time; denying 106 Motion to continue trial. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/4/2010. (LN)
May 3, 2010 Filing 106 EMERGENCY MOTION to extend time to file his proposed jury instructions, verdict form, voir dire, statement of the action and witness and trial exhibits, MOTION to continue jury trial by Dennis Hunt. (BES)
April 29, 2010 Filing 105 STATEMENT of the case for trial by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/29/2010. (LN)
April 29, 2010 Filing 103 Amended MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically cellular telephones during trial by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
April 29, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE OF HEARING: JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL (date certain) are set for MONDAY, MAY 10, 2010, at 8:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. (SMB)
April 29, 2010 Filing 101 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION in limine by Dennis Hunt. (LDB)
April 28, 2010 Filing 100 PROPOSED voir dire questions by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 90 Motion in limine. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/28/2010. (LN)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ENDORSED ORDER granting 97 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to amend. The Clerk is directed to docket [97-1] as Plaintiff's Amended Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/28/2010. (LN)
April 9, 2010 Filing 83 MAY TRIAL CALENDAR: This case is set on the May trial term beginning on 5/3/2010 and running through 5/28/2010 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/9/2010. (SMB)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice (for lack of specificity) 81 Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/8/2010. (LN)
April 8, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically Cellular Telephones during Trial by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
April 8, 2010 Filing 80 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2010. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
April 1, 2010 Filing 79 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
February 23, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE OF HEARING: The case is placed on the MAY TRIAL CALENDAR. A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE hearing is set for THURSDAY, APRIL 8, 2010, at 8:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 15 minutes. **Plaintiff shall appear for the hearing.**(SMB)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of USCA DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as to 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal filed by David L. Pilver. EOD: 02/18/2010; USCA number: 09-13923-GG. Issued as mandate. (JMS)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of USCA Dennis Hunt's motion for leave to amentd his response brief and to file additional record excerpts are DENIED as to 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal filed by David L. Pilver. EOD: 02/18/10; USCA number: 09-13923-GG. (JMS)
October 16, 2009 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving record on appeal (volume of pleadings: 2, volume of exhibits: 1 Folder of docuemntary exhibits 28 - 31) on 10/13/09 re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. USCA number: 09-13923-GG. (EJC)
October 8, 2009 RECORD on appeal sent to USCA re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. Transmittal includes certified copy of docket sheet, volume of pleadings: 2, volume of exhibits: 1 Folder of docuemntary exhibits 28 - 31. USCA number 09-13923-GG (EJC)
August 27, 2009 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving certificate of readiness on 8/27/09 re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. USCA number: 09-13923-G. (EJC)
August 19, 2009 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE of readiness sent to USCA re: 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. ROA consists of: volume of pleadings: 2 volume of documentary exhibits: 1 (doc. 28-31). USCA number: 09-13923-G (JMS)
August 12, 2009 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving USCA appeal fees received $455 receipt number T051328 on 8/7/09 re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. USCA number: 09-13923-G. (EJC)
August 11, 2009 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by David L. Pilver re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. USCA number: 09-13923-G. (EJC)
August 10, 2009 Set/reset deadlines re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal : Certificate of readiness due by 8/21/2009 (EJC)
August 7, 2009 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving initial appeal package on 8/4/09 re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. USCA number: 09-13923-G. (EJC)
August 5, 2009 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding USCA appeal fees received $455 receipt number T051328 re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal USCA number: unknown. (EJC)
August 5, 2009 USCA appeal fees received $455 receipt number T051328 re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal filed by David L. Pilver (EJC)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 71 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/4/2009. (LN)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion to extend time; denying 69 Motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/3/2009. (LN)
August 3, 2009 Filing 71 AMENDED (UNOPPOSED) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Pilver's 63 motion for stay by Dennis Hunt. NOTE: 63 MOTION TO STAY RULED ON. (MRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
July 31, 2009 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 67 Notice of interlocutory appeal. (EJC)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 68 Motion for extension of time to respond to 63 Pilver's motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 7/31/2009. (JDE)
July 29, 2009 Filing 69 MOTION to extend time to respond to 62 order, MOTION for leave to file motion for the District Court to reconsider the findings in 62 order by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
July 29, 2009 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 63 motion to stay by Dennis Hunt. NOTE: 63 MOTION TO STAY RULED ON. (MRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
July 29, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 62 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentOrder on motion for summary judgment by David L. Pilver. Filing fee not paid. (Todd, Stephen) Modified text on 7/31/2009 (EJC).
July 29, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE by David L. Pilver re 62 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentOrder on motion for summary judgment of Interlocutory Appeal (Todd, Stephen) Modified on 7/29/2009 (MRH). NOTE: TERMINATED. INCORRECT CODE. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.
July 29, 2009 Filing 65 CANCELLATION NOTICE: The pre-trial conference set for 8-5-09 at 9:15 a.m. is cancelled. The trial scheduled for September 2009 is cancelled. (LN)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER granting 63 Defendant's Motion for STAY pending outcome of appeal. This case is STAYED until the appellate court renders it mandate. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/29/2009. (LN)
July 24, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION to stay (Without Bond) of Pretrial and Trial Pending Outcome of Appeal and Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver. (Todd, Stephen)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED ORDER denying 60 Motion to File Documents Electronically. Defendant may mail documents for filing. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/15/2009. (LN)
June 10, 2009 Filing 60 MOTION for permission to file documents electronically by Dennis Hunt. (RFM)
May 29, 2009 Filing 59 SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE to motion re 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
May 22, 2009 Filing 58 RESPONSE to motion re 40 Law Library Board's MOTION for summary judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (BSN)
May 22, 2009 Filing 57 SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE to motion re 32 by Norma J Wise MOTION for partial summary judgment Regarding Count II of the Complaint, and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (BSN)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply or Motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/13/2009. (SMB)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER denying 49 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/12/2009. (LN)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's motion for enlargement of time or motion for leave to amend. 10-day extension granted from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/12/2009. (LN)
May 11, 2009 Filing 53 FIRST AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Response/Reply, or MOTION for leave of court to amend/correct responses by Dennis Hunt. (Attachments: # 1 - Exhibit 1, Proposed Second Amended Response to Law Library Board's Motion for Summary Judgment (initially received by the Court on 5/8/09); # 2 - Exhibit 2, Proposed Second Amended Response to Pilver's Motion for Summary Judgment)(MRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
May 8, 2009 Filing 52 SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE to motion re 40 MOTION for summary judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (MRH) Modified on 5/11/2009 (MRH). NOTE: TERMINATED. NO LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE. PROPOSED PLEADING. SEE DOCUMENT 53 .
May 7, 2009 Filing 51 RESPONSE to motion re 50 MOTION to extend time to complete tasks plaintiff is responsible to complete in this case MOTION to amend/correct 48 Response to motion, 47 Response to motion, 46 Response to motion MOTION to amend/correct 48 Response to motion, 47 Response to motion, 46 Response to motion, 49 MOTION to amend/correct 9 Amended complaint (with Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support) filed by David L. Pilver, Hillsborough County, Law Library Board, Norma J. Wise. (Todd, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION to extend time to complete tasks plaintiff is responsible to complete in this case, or, MOTION for leave of court to amend/correct 48 Response to motion, 47 Response to motion, 46 Response to motion by Dennis Hunt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Amended Response as to Law Library; # 2 Exhibit - Proposed Amended Response as to Norma J. Wise; # 3 Exhibit - Proposed Amended Response as to David L. Pilver)(MRH)
May 4, 2009 Filing 49 MOTION for leave of court to amend/correct 9 Amended complaint by Dennis Hunt. NOTE: NO PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF. (MRH)
May 1, 2009 Filing 48 RESPONSE to motion re 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
May 1, 2009 Filing 47 RESPONSE to motion re 32 MOTION for partial summary judgment Regarding Count II of the Complaint, and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (MRH) Modified on 5/4/2009 (MRH).
May 1, 2009 Filing 46 RESPONSE to motion re 40 MOTION for summary judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Dennis Hunt. (MRH)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 44 Motion to appoint counsel. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date hereof to respond to the pending motions for summary judgment, failing which the Court will consider the motions without the benefit of a response. Plaintff's motion to appoint counsel is denied. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/17/2009. (MLR)
April 16, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION for summary judgment, MOTION to appoint counsel by Dennis Hunt. (MRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 42 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/15/2009. (JDE)
March 26, 2009 Filing 41 MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on March 26, 2009 Hearing outcome: the parties have reached an impasse.(Grilli, Peter)
March 25, 2009 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Dennis Hunt. (JLH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 24, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION for summary judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support by Law Library Board. (Todd, Stephen)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. Responses to defense motions due on or before April 17, 2009. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/19/2009. (LN)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ORDER appointing Peter Grilli as mediator in this action. MEDIATION Conference set for MARCH 26, 2009 at the U. S. Courthouse. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/18/2009. (LN)
March 17, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support, 32 MOTION for partial summary judgment Regarding Count II of the Complaint, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Dennis Hunt. (JLH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 16, 2009 Filing 36 RESCHEDULED NOTICE of mediation to be held on March 26, 2009 @ 9:00 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli, Esq. (Grilli, Peter)
February 24, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE by Ryan Christopher Rodems re 34 Order on motion to withdraw as attorney Compliance with Order (Rodems, Ryan)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff 33 . Plaintiff's counsel are relieved of any further duty as counsel for Plaintiff upon the condition that counsel serves Plaintiff with a copy of this Order, by either personal service or certified mail, within 10 days. Additionally, counsel shall file in this cause a certificate of service of a copy of this Order, showing the date of such service if served personally or a return receipt if served by mail. This action is STAYED for 30 days, during which time Plaintiff may have substitute counsel file a Notice of Appearance or to notify the Court of his intent to proceed pro se. If no counsel files a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall be considered as proceeding pro se with a record address of: 2319 Nantucket Drive, Sun City Center, Florida 33573. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/11/2009. (LN)
February 6, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION for Ryan Christopher Rodems and Barker, Rodems & Cook, P.A., to withdraw as attorney by Dennis Hunt. (Rodems, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
January 26, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION for partial summary judgment Regarding Count II of the Complaint, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Norma J. Wise. (Todd, Stephen)
January 23, 2009 Filing 31 DEPOSITION of Norma Wise taken on 1/8/09 (EXHIBIT 4) re: 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver.(Todd, Stephen)
January 23, 2009 Filing 30 DEPOSITION of David Pilver taken on 1/8/09 (EXHIBIT 3) re: 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver.(Todd, Stephen)
January 23, 2009 Filing 29 DEPOSITION of Dennis Hunt taken on 11/26/08 (EXHIBIT 1) re: 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver.(Todd, Stephen)
January 23, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Qualified Immunity) and Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 (continued) - Transcript of Proceedings taken on June 8, 2005 (Judge Barber), # 2 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of Proceedings taken on Oct. 15, 2003)(Todd, Stephen)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for 3/18/2009 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/9/2009. (SMB)
January 7, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE of mediation to be held on March 18, 2009 @ 9:00 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli, Esq. (Grilli, Peter)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation and directing selection of a mediator on or before January 20, 2009. Lead counsel Ryan Christopher Rodems to coordinate dates. Mediation shall be conducted on or before June 1, 2009. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/15/2008. (LN)
December 11, 2008 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 9 Amended complaint by David L. Pilver, Norma J. Wise.(Todd, Stephen)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Defendants' Motion for leave to file responsive pleadings out of time. Answers due within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/3/2008. (LN)
November 26, 2008 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Responsive Pleading out of Time by David L. Pilver, Norma J. Wise. (Todd, Stephen)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Defendant Norma J. Wise's and Defendant David L. Pilver's Joint Motion to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint 12 is DENIED. With respect to Defendants Norma J. Wise and David L. Pilver, discovery is limited for the next 90 days to the issue of qualified immunity. Wise and Pilver may again address the issue in a motion for summary judgment if they wish. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/22/2008. (LN)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 1/26/2009. Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2009. Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, 8/5/2009 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. *** JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEPTEMBER 2009 *** Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/15/2008. (LN)
July 14, 2008 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 17 Order to show cause filed by Dennis Hunt. (Rodems, Ryan)
July 14, 2008 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rodems, Ryan)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: parties' failure to file a Case Management Report. Show Cause Response due by 7/25/2008. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/14/2008. (LN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 9 Amended complaint by Law Library Board.(Todd, Stephen)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Defendant Law Library Boards' unopposed motion for enlargement of time to file a responsive pleading. The responsive pleading shall be filed up to and including 4/30/08. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/22/2008. (SMB)
April 18, 2008 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Law Library Board. (Todd, Stephen)
April 14, 2008 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 12 Motion to dismiss filed by Dennis Hunt. (Rodems, Ryan)
April 4, 2008 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support by David L. Pilver, Norma J. Wise. (Todd, Stephen)
April 2, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Todd on behalf of David L. Pilver, Law Library Board, Norma J. Wise (Todd, Stephen)
March 28, 2008 Filing 10 Summons issued as to David L. Pilver, Law Library Board, Norma J. Wise. (JLH)
March 13, 2008 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Law Library Board, David L. Pilver, Norma J. Wise with Jury Demand filed by Dennis Hunt. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Dennis Hunt.(Rodems, Ryan)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 7 is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects. The Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. The Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Direct Service of the Summons and Complaint by U. S. Marshal, Motion for Extension of Time for Service, and Motion for the Court to Appoint an Attorney to Represent the Plaintiff is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's failure to file an Amended Complaint within 20 days shall result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/26/2008. (LN)
February 6, 2008 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the court deny without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency; allow the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 20 days; and deny as moot 6 Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Direct that Service of the Summons and Complaint be Effected by U.S. Marshal or Other Officer; and Motion for an Exten[s]ion of Time to Serve the Summons and Complaint on all Defendants; and Motion for the Court to Appoint an Attorney to Represent the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 2/6/2008. (AMS)
January 3, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION for the court to direct that service of the summons and complaint be effected by U.S. Marshal or other officer; MOTION to extend time to serve the summons and complaint on all defendants; and MOTION to appoint counsel by Dennis Hunt. (MRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
August 14, 2007 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel of new case number, 8:07-cv-1168-T-30TBM; and magistrate judge assignment, Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. (mrh)
August 14, 2007 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III as. New case number: 8:07-cv-1168-T-30TBM. (mrh)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas G. Wilson recused. Signed by Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/13/2007. (Williams, Carrie)
July 6, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 7/6/2007. (smb)
July 3, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Dennis Hunt. (mrh) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 3, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill C. Spradlin, David L. Pilver, Sandra Kellaher, Scott Dunlap, Hillsborough County, City of Tampa, James J. Lumsford Law Library, Stephen Hogue, Bennie Holder, Charles A. Hathcox, Norma J. Wise ; jury demand filed by Dennis Hunt. (Attachments: # 1 - Exhibits)(mrh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Hillsborough County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Lumsford Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennie Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Hathcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma J. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill C. Spradlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Pilver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Kellaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?