Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel Featured Case

Plaintiff Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. filed a complaint in rem against Defendant Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel. Plaintiff alleged that it located Defendant, a cannon wreck of the Colonial period lying within the English Channel at a depth of less than 200 meters between 25 and 40 miles from the Coast of the United Kingdom and beyond the territorial waters or continguous zone of any sovereign nation.

Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Defendant: The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Case Number: 8:2008cv01044
Filed: May 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. McCoun III
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2010 Filing 30 JUDGMENT in favor of Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. against The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LYB)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 --motion for default judgment; vacating 11 --warrant of arrest; directing the Clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT awarding the plaintiff clear title to the shard of glass, the ship's bell, and the piece of sheeting described in Exhibit B (Doc. 28-2) to the motion for default judgment; TERMINATE any pending motion; and CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/30/2010. (BK)
March 11, 2010 Filing 28 Amended MOTION for default judgment against The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., to show cause by 3/19/2010 why action should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/10/2010. (BK)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 25 --motion to seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/11/2010. (BK)
January 8, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to file under seal and Memorandum of Law in Support by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying without prejudice 23 --motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/30/2009. (BK)
December 29, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION for default judgment against The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. On or before Friday, January 8, 2010, the plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/29/2009. (TKD)
July 30, 2009 Filing 21 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel and all claimants who failed to plea or otherwise defend. (AG)
July 29, 2009 Filing 20 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 proposed clerk's default)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
February 9, 2009 Filing 19 PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Newspaper: Tampa Tribune and London Times Date(s) of publication January 23, 2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Tampa Tribune, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of London Times)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion to approve notice of action in rem and arrest. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/20/2009. (AGG)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 16 --motion by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., for approval of notice of action in rem and arrest. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/15/2009. (BK)
January 14, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION for approval of Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest for publication by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Approve Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 12, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of change of address by Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion for preliminary injunction. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 9/10/2008. (JMF)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for a report and recommendation, if granted, or for disposition, if denied: 9 --motion for preliminary injunction by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/10/2008. (BK)
September 8, 2008 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. New case number: 8:08-cv-1044-T-23MAP. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER designating Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo to this matter in place of Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/5/2008. (BK)
June 24, 2008 Filing 11 *** VACATED pursuant to 29 Order *** WARRANT to arrest vessel returned executed 06/24/08. (AG) Modified on 8/2/2010 (LYB).
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 6 Motion to appoint substitute custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 6/19/2008. (AG)
June 19, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 19, 2008 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Melinda J. MacConnel re: 6 MOTION to appoint custodian (Substitute Custodian) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 19, 2008 Filing 7 CONSENT and indemnification agreement for appointment of substitute custodian.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
June 19, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to appoint custodian (Substitute Custodian) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for issuance of warrant in rem. The clerk is directed to issue a warrant of arrest.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 6/19/2008. (AG)
June 18, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for issuance of warrant in rem by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
June 2, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/2/2008. (TKD)
May 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T046245) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc..(LYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unidentified, Wrecked and Abandoned Sailing Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?