Klein & Heuchan, Inc. v. CoStar Realty Information, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Klein & Heuchan, Inc.
Defendant: CoStar Realty Information, Inc. and CoStar Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2008cv01227
Filed: June 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pinellas
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Presiding Judge: Mary S. Scriven
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ENDORSED ORDER ruling deferred 143 Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/3/2010. (LN)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED ORDER granting 149 CoStar's Motion to Stay pending 11th Circuit ruling. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/3/2010. (LN)
June 2, 2010 Filing 155 NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Sherrill Jackson re: 148 Notice of appeal USCA number: 10-12201-D. Transcripts 03/01/10 & 03/02/10 (JMS)
June 2, 2010 Filing 154 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Sherrill Jackson re 148 Notice of appeal Estimated transcript filing date: 06/02/10. USCA number: 10-12201-D. Transcript 03/01/10 & 03/02/10. (JMS)
May 25, 2010 Filing 151 RESPONSE in opposition re 149 MOTION to stay further litigation over attorneys' fees and costs re 143 MOTION for attorney fees and Costs with Incorporated Memorandum of Law pending appeal MOTION to stay further litigation over attorneys' fees and costs re 143 MOTION for attorney fees and Costs with Incorporated Memorandum of Law pending appeal filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2010 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. re 148 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 10-12201. (Tibbals, Lara)
May 11, 2010 Filing 149 MOTION to stay further litigation over attorneys' fees and costs re 143 MOTION for attorney fees and Costs with Incorporated Memorandum of Law pending appeal by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
May 10, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 141 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 142 Judgment by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. (Filing fee paid) (Tibbals, Lara) Modified on 5/10/2010 (DG).
May 10, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 141 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 142 Judgment by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. (Filing fee not paid) (Tibbals, Lara) NOTE: COUNSEL'S OFFICE NOTIFIED BY TELEPHONE ON 5/10/10 THAT THIS ITEM NEEDS TO BE REFILED AS THE ACTUAL ITEM DOES NOT REFERENCE BOTH ITEMS MENTIONED IN THIS DOCKET ENTRY. Modified on 5/10/2010 (DG).
May 10, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 148 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (DG)
May 7, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 142 Judgment by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Filing fee not paid) (Tibbals, Lara) NOTE: COUNSEL'S OFFICE NOTIFIED BY TELEPHONE ON 5/10/10 THAT THIS ITEM NEEDS TO BE REFILED AS THERE IS A DISCREPANCY BETWEEN ACTUAL ITEM AND DOCKET SHEET ENTRY. Modified on 5/10/2010 (DG).
May 7, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number T055358 re 148 Notice of appeal filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc. (ARC) Modified on 5/10/2010 (AG).
May 3, 2010 Filing 145 AFFIDAVIT of Paul M. Finamore, Esq. re: 143 MOTION for attorney fees and Costs with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2010 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey W. Gibson, Esq. re: 143 MOTION for attorney fees and Costs with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2010 Filing 143 MOTION for attorney fees and Costs with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Zebrak on behalf of CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. (Zebrak, Scott)
April 16, 2010 Filing 139 JUDGMENT in favor of CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc. against Scott Bell Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/16/2010. (JLH)
April 15, 2010 Filing 138 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST SCOTT BELL a/k/a CHRISTOPHER SCOTT BELL: The Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Judgment and Permanent Injunction 105 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (LN)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ENDORSED ORDER granting 136 Motion for reconsideration. Attorney Scott Zebrak has two (2) days to sign up properly for ECF. If Attorney Zebrak complies within two (2) days, he shall be reinstated as pro hac vice counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/30/2010. (LN)
March 29, 2010 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for reconsideration re 131 Order by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Tibbals, Lara)
March 26, 2010 Filing 135 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re 121 Bench trial - completed Written Closing Argument filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2010 Filing 134 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT and conclusions of law by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2010 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 120 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
March 26, 2010 Filing 132 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT and conclusions of law by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: Attorney SCOTT ZEBRAK is stricken as counsel of record for Defendants in this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/26/2010. (LN)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ENDORSED ORDER granting 126 Motion to extend time to submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Extension granted through March 26, 2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/23/2010. (LN)
March 20, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPTS. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of these transcripts. If no such Notice is filed, the transcripts may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcripts to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SJ)
March 20, 2010 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial - Day Two held on 3/2/10 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Court Reporter Sherrill L. Jackson, RPR,Telephone number 813/301-5041. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/12/2010, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2010, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2010. (SJ)
March 20, 2010 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial - Day One held on 3/1/10 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.. Court Reporter Sherrill L. Jackson, RPR, Telephone number 813/301-5041. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/12/2010, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2010, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2010. (SJ)
March 19, 2010 Filing 126 Joint MOTION to extend time to Submit Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ENDORSED ORDER granting 124 Stipulated Motion to Set Deadline to file an opposition on March 19, 2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/17/2010. (LN)
March 15, 2010 Filing 124 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically motion to set deadline by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
March 10, 2010 Filing 123 NOTICE of exhibits placed in the exhibit room (bench trial - 1 box, 1 folder) (JLH)
March 2, 2010 Filing 122 FINALIZED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST from bench trial conducted on 3/1/10 and 3/2/10. (SMB)
March 2, 2010 Filing 121 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL (DAY 2) held on 3/2/2010. Trial concluded. Counsel to file their proposed findings of facts and conclusions of law on or before 3/19/10. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
March 2, 2010 Filing 120 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings on CoStar's Theory of Vicarious Liability by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Aungst, Brian)
March 2, 2010 Filing 119 *DOCUMENT TERMINATED. COUNSEL TO REFILE IN COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES FOR SIGNATURES.* MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings on CoStar's Theory of Vicarious Liability by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Gibson, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/2/2010 (CD).
March 1, 2010 Filing 118 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: BENCH TRIAL (DAY 1) held on 3/1/2010. Testimony and evidence taken. Trial will resume on 3/2/10 at 9:00 a.m. with cross examination of Christopher "Scott" Bell. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORAL ORDER denying 101 Motion in limine; denying 103 Motion in limine. Issued by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/1/2010. (SMB)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 114 motion to appear pro hac vice as to SCOTT ZEBRAK. Scott Zebrak is admitted to practice in this Court for the limited purpose of appearing in this case. The admission of Scott Zebrak is conditioned on the continued appearance in this case of an active member of the Florida Bar Association, resident of the State of Florida, upon whom service as to all matters connected with this action may be made with the same effect as if made upon Scott Zebrak within the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/1/2010. (LN)
February 25, 2010 Filing 115 RESPONSE in opposition re 103 MOTION in limine regarding irrelevant defense filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION for Scott Zebrak to appear pro hac vice by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 111 Motion for electronics. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/23/2010. (LN)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 110 Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/23/2010. (LN)
February 22, 2010 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Leave to Use Laptop Computers and Cellular Telephones at Trial by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2010 Filing 110 MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically two laptop computers and two assocated wireless cards and three internet enabled cellular telephones by CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
February 17, 2010 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Matthew Oppenheim re 108 Memorandum in opposition by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
February 17, 2010 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 101 Motion in limine filed by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
February 16, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Magidson on behalf of Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Magidson, Joshua)
February 16, 2010 Filing 106 MARCH TRIAL CALENDAR: Bench trial (date certain) is set for MONDAY, MARCH 1, 2010, at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/16/2010. (SMB)
February 16, 2010 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION for permanent injunction by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guerrant, William)
February 15, 2010 Filing 104 STIPULATION and Motion for Entry of Judgment and Permanent Injunction by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guerrant, William) Modified on 2/16/2010 (MRH). NOTE: TERMINATED. INCORRECT CODE. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE AS A MOTION USING TWO MOTION RELIEFS.
February 11, 2010 Filing 103 MOTION in limine regarding irrelevant defense by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER granting 100 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time through February 12, 2010, to File Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/9/2010. (LN)
February 8, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION in limine regarding certain prejudicial evidence not produced during the court-ordered discovery deadlines by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Gibson, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2010 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file motions in limine (four-day extension) by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ENDORSED ORDER granting 97 Consented to Motion for Realignment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/2/2010. (LN)
February 2, 2010 Filing 98 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/2/2010. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB)
February 1, 2010 Filing 97 Consent MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Realignment by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
January 28, 2010 Filing 96 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by CoStar Group, Inc., CoStar Realty Information, Inc.. (Sansone, William)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Attorney SHARI ROSS LAHLOU is stricken as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/4/2009. (LN)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 69 CoStar's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/25/2009. (SMB)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to comply with the Court's Order [Dkt. 57] entered on 7/14/09. Attorney SHARI ROSS LAHLOU shall show cause, in writing, within eleven (11) days of the date of this Order as to why she should not be stricken as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/20/2009. (SMB)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 85 Motion of Matthew Oppenheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 11/20/2009. (ACS)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Defendants' Unopposed Amended Motion to Substitute Attorneys of Record. William Sauers, Esq., Sanya Kerksiek, Esq., and Crowell & Moring LLP are relieved of any further responsibility to represent Defendants in this case. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 11/18/2009. (ACS)
November 13, 2009 Filing 90 Amended MOTION to substitute attorney (unopposed) by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying without prejudice 84 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Substitute Attorneys of Record. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 11/12/2009. (ACS)
November 12, 2009 Filing 88 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Bench Trial reset for MARCH 2010. Pretrial Conference reset for TUESDAY, 2/2/2010 at 8:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 15 minutes. (LN)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ENDORSED ORDER granting 86 Joint Motion to continue pre-trial conference and non-jury trial. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/12/2009. (LN)
November 10, 2009 Filing 86 MOTION to continue Pre-Trial Conference and Trial by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
November 10, 2009 Filing 85 MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim to appear pro hac vice by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
November 10, 2009 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION to substitute attorney by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENDORSED ORDER denying 75 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/6/2009. (LN)
October 30, 2009 Filing 82 RESPONSE in opposition to Klein and Heuchan's Motion to Strike filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Lardizabal)(Sauers, William)
October 30, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc. re 69 MOTION for summary judgment Against Klein and Heuchan of Filing of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Declaration of Robert Lardizabal)(Sauers, William)
October 29, 2009 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Local Rule 3.01(G)(Supplemental) by Jeffrey W. Gibson on behalf of Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2009 Filing 79 NOTICE by Klein & Heuchan, Inc. re 78 Certificate of Counsel of Withdrawal (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2009 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Local Rule 3.01(G)(Supplemental) by Jeffrey W. Gibson on behalf of Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 70 Nicholas Ottaviano's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 10/28/2009. (ACS)
October 16, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Klein & Heuchan, Inc. re 71 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 69 MOTION for summary judgment Against Klein and Heuchan filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2009 Filing 75 MOTION to strike (1) Declaration of Robert Lardizabal [D.E. 69-5]; (2) Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 of COSTARs Motion for Summary Judgment [D.E. 69-8, 69-9, 69-10]; and (3) Exhibit 10 of Declaration of Steven J. Williams [D.E. 69-4 pp.3-13] by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
October 16, 2009 Filing 74 DEPOSITION of Christopher Scott Bell taken on August 20, 2009 re: 72 Response in opposition to motion by Klein & Heuchan, Inc..(Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2009 Filing 73 DEPOSITION of Mark S. Klein taken on August 27, 2009 re: 72 Response in opposition to motion by Klein & Heuchan, Inc..(Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2009 Filing 72 RESPONSE in opposition re 69 MOTION for summary judgment Against Klein and Heuchan filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2009 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 69 MOTION for summary judgment Against Klein and Heuchan by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
October 8, 2009 Filing 70 MOTION for Nicholas L. Ottaviano to withdraw as attorney by Scott Bell. (Ottaviano, Nicholas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
September 25, 2009 Filing 69 MOTION for summary judgment Against Klein and Heuchan by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Williams Decl. and Williams Decl. Exs. A and B, # 2 Williams Decl. Exs. C-F, # 3 Williams Decl. Exs. G-H, # 4 Lardizabar Decl., # 5 Bell Deposition Excerpts, # 6 Klein Deposition Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 5, # 13 Exhibit 6, # 14 Exhibit 7, # 15 Exhibit 8, # 16 Exhibit 9, # 17 Exhibit 10)(Sauers, William)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED ORDER granting 67 Partially Consented to Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. Extension granted through September 25, 2009. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/9/2009. (LN)
September 8, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION to extend time to File Dispositive Motions (Partially Consented to Motion) by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Sauers, William)
September 3, 2009 Filing 66 MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on September 2, 2009 Hearing outcome: the parties have reached an impasse.(Grilli, Peter)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Scott Bell (Dkt. 58). See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 8/3/2009. (MLB)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER granting 61 Agreed Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline. NEW DEADLINES: discovery, August 27, 2009; dispositive motions, September 14, 2009. All other deadlines remain UNCHANGED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/30/2009. (LN)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for SEPTEMBER 2, 2009. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/28/2009. (LN)
July 22, 2009 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 60 Notice of mediation, 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadline Amended Certificate of Service by William J. Sauers on behalf of CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc. (Sauers, William)
July 22, 2009 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadline by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Sauers, William)
July 22, 2009 Filing 60 Amended NOTICE of mediation to be held on September 2, 2009, 1:30 p.m. before Peter Grilli. (Sauers, William)
July 17, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Love on behalf of Scott Bell (Love, Randall)
July 16, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION for James B. Astrachan and Julie R. Rubin to withdraw as attorney by Scott Bell. (JLH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER for JAMES B. ASTRACHAN, SHARI ROSS LAHLOU and JULIE REBECCA RUBIN to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/14/2009. (LN)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Paul Finamore's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 7/2/2009. (ACS)
June 25, 2009 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Paul M. Finamore to withdraw as attorney for Movants by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Cases #8:08-cv-1227-T-30EAJ and #8:09-cv-565-T30TGW are CONSOLIDATED for all further proceedings. The parties shall file all subsequent papers in lead case #8:08-cv-1227-T-30EAJ. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE case #8:09-cv-565-T-30TGW. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/25/2009. (LN)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion for leave to file reply. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/4/2009. (LN)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED ORDER granting 48 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. NEW DEADLINE: Fact discovery, July 27, 2009. All other deadlines remain UNCHANGED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/4/2009. (LN)
June 1, 2009 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 50 Joint MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification by William J. Sauers on behalf of CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc. (Sauers, William)
May 29, 2009 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Sauers, William)
May 28, 2009 Filing 49 RESPONSE in opposition re 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2009 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Sauers, William)
May 28, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Sauers, William)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER appointing Peter Grilli as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for AUGUST 20, 2009. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/7/2009. (LN)
May 6, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of mediation to be held on August 20, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli, Esq.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2009 Filing 44 REPLY to 23 Counterclaim by Scott Bell. Related document: 23 Counterclaim filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc..(Ottaviano, Nicholas) Modified on 4/14/2009 (MRH). NOTE: EDITED TEXT.
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Counterclaim-Defendant Scott Bell's Motion to Dismiss 38 is GRANTED as to Count III of Counterclaim-Plaintiff's complaint and DENIED as to the remaining Counts. The language of Counterclaim-Plaintiffs complaint is stricken as stated in Part III of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/8/2009. (LN)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation and directing selection of a mediator on or before May 6, 2009. Lead counsel Brian J. Aungst to coordinate dates. Mediation shall be conducted on or before October 1, 2009. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/6/2009. (LN)
March 18, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Aungst on behalf of Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Aungst, Brian)
March 9, 2009 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 38 Motion to dismiss Counterclaim against Scott Bell filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Sarich, Sanya)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/19/2009. (LN)
February 18, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION to dismiss CoStar Counterclaim by Scott Bell. (Ottaviano, Nicholas)
February 17, 2009 Filing 37 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 23 Counterclaim by Scott Bell. (JLH)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Counter Defendant Scott Bell's Motions to Quash Service of Summons 29 33 are DENIED. Counter Defendant Scott Bell has 20 days to respond to the counterclaim. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/30/2009. (LN)
January 23, 2009 Filing 35 RESPONSE in opposition re 29 MOTION to quash service of summons, 33 MOTION to dismiss complaint for insurriency of service of process MOTION to quash service filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Sarich, Sanya)
January 22, 2009 Filing 34 RETURN of (alias summons) service executed on 1/13/09 by Klein & Heuchan, Inc. as to Scott Bell. (JLH)
January 7, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION to dismiss complaint for insurriency of service of process, MOTION to quash service by Scott Bell. (JLH)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 the parties' Agreed Motion for Entry of a Protective Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 1/2/2009. (ACS)
December 22, 2008 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
December 17, 2008 Filing 30 ALIAS Summons reissued as to Scott Bell. (JLH)
December 11, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION to quash service of summons by Scott Bell. (JLH)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Motion of Sanya Sarich to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 27 Motion of William Sauers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 12/11/2008. (ACS)
December 9, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION for William J. Sauers to appear pro hac vice by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
December 9, 2008 Filing 26 MOTION for Sanya Sarich to appear pro hac vice by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
December 8, 2008 Filing 25 REPLY to 23 Counterclaim by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. Related document: 23 Answer to complaintCounterclaim filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc..(Gibson, Jeffrey)
November 24, 2008 Filing 24 Summons issued as to Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (JLH)
November 21, 2008 Filing 23 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Klein & Heuchan, Inc. by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guerrant, William)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Answers due by 11/21/2008. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/20/2008. (LN)
November 20, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 20 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 2 Complaint Amended Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification by William Cooper Guerrant, Jr on behalf of CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc. (Guerrant, William)
November 20, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 2 Complaint by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
November 19, 2008 Filing 19 **MOTION TERMINATED; INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED; COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins. Modified on 11/20/2008 (JLH).
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 5/28/2009. Dispositive motions due by 9/1/2009. Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, 12/1/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. *** BENCH TRIAL set for JANUARY 2010 *** Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/6/2008. (LN)
November 5, 2008 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 14 Defendants' Motion for more definite statement. Defendants are directed to file an answer to the Complaint within 20 days. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/30/2008. (LN)
October 9, 2008 Filing 15 RESPONSE in opposition re 14 MOTION for more definite statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION for more definite statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
October 3, 2008 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins. New case number: 8:08-cv-1227-T-30EAJ. Magistrate Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (MRH)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Agreed Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Defendants' answers due 10/7/2008. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/24/2008. (LN)
September 23, 2008 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 2 Complaint by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue 8 is DENIED. Defendants are directed to file an answer to the Complaint within 20 days. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/3/2008. (LN)
July 31, 2008 Filing 9 RESPONSE in opposition re 8 MOTION to dismiss Complaint or to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Klein & Heuchan, Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss Complaint or to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Guerrant, William)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Answers due by 7/24/2008. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/11/2008. (LN)
July 10, 2008 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 2 Complaint by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc.. (Guerrant, William)
June 26, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 6/26/2008. (SMB)
June 26, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Gibson on behalf of Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2008 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Christopher Winters re 1 Notice of removal by CoStar Group, Inc. (LYB)
June 25, 2008 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CoStar Realty Information, Inc. and CoStar Group, Inc. filed in state court on 6/4/2008 by Klein & Heuchan, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LYB)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, case number 08-8290CI-15 filed in State Court on 06/04/2008. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number T046592 filed by CoStar Realty Information, Inc., CoStar Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, # 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(LYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein & Heuchan, Inc. v. CoStar Realty Information, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klein & Heuchan, Inc.
Represented By: J. Paul Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoStar Realty Information, Inc.
Represented By: William Cooper Guerrant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoStar Group, Inc.
Represented By: William Cooper Guerrant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?