Securities and Exchange Commission v. Nadel et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Arthur Nadel, Scoop Capital, LLC, Scoop Management, Inc., Scoop Real Estate, L.P., Valhalla Investment Partners, L.P., Valhalla Management, Inc., Victory IRA Fund, Ltd., Victory Fund, Ltd., Viking IRA Fund, LLC, Viking Fund, LLC and Viking Management, LLC
Receiver: Burton W. Wiand
Case Number: 8:2009cv00087
Filed: January 21, 2009
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Sarasota
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Lazzara
Referring Judge: Thomas B. McCoun III
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2017 1311 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 1310 Verified MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Enforce Constructive Trust through Turnover of Real Property, or in the Alternative, through Foreclosure of the Receiver's Equitable Lien by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Doc 29 Order granting partial motion for summary judgment, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Judgment, # 3 Exhibit C - BK Case Doc 39 Order Granting Motion to Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay or Alternatively Relief From the Automatic Stay, # 4 Exhibit D - AQ Doc 115 Motion to transfer, # 5 Exhibit E - AQ Doc 182 ORDER granting 115 Motion to transfer; granting 117 Motion to transfer, # 6 Exhibit F - AQ Doc 184 Turnover Order, # 7 Exhibit G - 1 (pages 1-25) - AQ Doc 258 MOTION for confirmation of sale of Realty - with exhibits, # 8 Exhibit G - 2 (pages 25-50) - AQ Doc 258 MOTION for confirmation of sale of Realty - with exhibits-2, # 9 Exhibit G - 3 (pages 51-101) - AQ Doc 258 MOTION for confirmation of sale of Realty - with exhibits-2, # 10 Exhibit H - AQ Doc 263 FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING RECEIVER'S SALE OF REALTY, # 11 Exhibit I - Hudgins Doc 264 Order Approving Sale of Real Propert)(Lamont, Michael)
September 15, 2017 1310 Verified MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Enforce Constructive Trust through Turnover of Real Property, or in the Alternative, through Foreclosure of the Receiver's Equitable Lien by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Lamont, Michael)
September 15, 2017 1309 Featured Case ORDER granting 1308 Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve Seventh Interim Distribution by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/15/2017. (SKH)
August 31, 2017 1308 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve Seventh Interim Distribution by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Distribution Amounts, # 2 Exhibit B - Reserves, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Lamont, Michael)
August 23, 2017 1307 NOTICE by Arthur Nadel Request to Stop Electronic Notifications (Foster, Todd)
August 23, 2017 1306 NOTICE by William F Bishop Request to Stop Electronic Notifications (Essenson, James)
August 23, 2017 1305 NOTICE by World Opportunity Fund, L.P. Request to Stop Electronic Notification and Notice of Removal of Counsel for Interested Party (Connelly, James)
August 17, 2017 1304 Featured Case ORDER granting 1302 Unopposed Motion for APPROVAL OF THE SALE OF (1) CERTAIN ASSETS OF QUEST ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC., and (2) DISPOSITION OF OTHER ASSETS OF QUEST ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM THE COURT by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/17/2017. (SKH)
August 15, 2017 1303 NOTICE by La Bellasara Condominium Association, Inc. to Stop Electronic Notification (Garcia, Martin)
August 15, 2017 1302 Unopposed MOTION for APPROVAL OF THE SALE OF (1) CERTAIN ASSETS OF QUEST ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. AND (2) DISPOSITION OF OTHER ASSETS OF QUEST ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM THE COURT by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Order, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Hatchett Equipment Inventory, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Copies of Orders)(Perez, Jared) Modified relief and text on 8/15/2017 (KMM).
July 7, 2017 1301 Featured Case ORDER granting 1300 Receiver's Verified Motion for Approval of Sale of Undeveloped Land Located in Buncombe County, North Carolina. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/7/2017. (SKH)
July 6, 2017 1300 MOTION for an order approving sale of undeveloped land in Buncombe County, North Carolina by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Appraisal - March 2015, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Receiver's Deed)(Perez, Jared) Modified relief and text on 7/6/2017 (KMM).
June 22, 2017 1299 Featured Case ORDER granting 1298 Motion for Clarification. Within three business days the Receiver shall disburse the funds as set forth in the attached Order (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/22/2017. (SKH)
June 21, 2017 1298 Unopposed MOTION for clarification re 1296 Order on Motion for Settlement, 1297 Order pdf by Burton W. Wiand. (Sharp, Susan)
June 21, 2017 1297 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED directing the Receiver to disburse to La Bellasara $103,109.60 from the sale proceeds of the La Bellasara property. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/21/2017. (SKH)
June 21, 2017 1296 Featured Case ORDER granting 1291 Unopposed Motion for Settlement with Wells Fargo. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/21/2017. (SKH)
June 20, 2017 1295 STIPULATION re 1291 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement with Wells Fargo; Entry of an Order Authorizing Disbursement of Sale Proceeds to Wells Fargo; and Relief from Injunction, Permitting Wells Fargo to Foreclose on the Laurel Mountain Property, 1293 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by La Bellasara Condominium Association, Inc.. (Garcia, Martin)
June 14, 2017 1294 NOTICE of change of address by Sean P. Keefe (Keefe, Sean)
June 13, 2017 1293 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1292 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 1291 Unopposed Motion for Settlement with Wells Fargo; Entry of an Order Authorizing Disbursement of Sale Proceeds to Wells Fargo; and Relief from Injunction, Permitting Wells Fargo to Foreclose on the Laurel Mountain Property. The response is due on or before 6/20/2017, and the Reply is due on or before 6/27/2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/13/2017. (CB)
June 12, 2017 1292 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1291 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement with Wells Fargo; Entry of an Order Authorizing Disbursement of Sale Proceeds to Wells Fargo; and Relief from Injunction, Permitting Wells Fargo to Foreclose on the Laurel Mountain Property by La Bellasara Condominium Association, Inc.. (Garcia, Martin)
June 12, 2017 1291 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement with Wells Fargo; Entry of an Order Authorizing Disbursement of Sale Proceeds to Wells Fargo; and Relief from Injunction, Permitting Wells Fargo to Foreclose on the Laurel Mountain Property by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A, # 2 Composite Exhibit B, # 3 Composite Exhibit C, # 4 Composite Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Sharp, Susan)
June 1, 2017 1290 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED regarding the Hatchett Lease involving Quest. Receiver has 90 days to retrieve the equipment without interference. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/1/2017. (CCB)
May 12, 2017 1289 STATUS report Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Report by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Lamont, Michael)
May 9, 2017 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 1284 Order on motion to extend time. Sent to 6500 Lakeview Dr., Falls Church, VA 22041. Return to sender; attempted not known; unable to forward to Chester Vincentz. (LMD)
May 8, 2017 1288 BRIEF on the status of the Hatchett Lease filed by John Hatchett Carney. (KMM)
May 5, 2017 1287 BRIEF filed by Byron W. Hatchett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Mailing Envelope)(KMM)
May 5, 2017 1286 DECLARATION of Jeffrey C. Rizzo re 1285 Memorandum in support by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - RE Quest Oil Lease, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Bar of Texas _ Find A Lawyer _ John Hatchett Carney, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - FW Hatchett Ranch oil revenue suspense, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - RE. Big Problem, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - FW Fax Hatchett, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - FW. W-9 and Gryska POA, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Letter - Carney re. $1500 check for Hatchett Ranch for new well, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Letter to Receiver's attorneys, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Hatchett Lease)(Maglich, Jordan)
May 5, 2017 1285 MEMORANDUM in support re 1272 Order on motion to stayOrder on Motion for Order to Show CauseOrder on Motion for Leave to File Receiver's Supplemental Brief filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - SEC v Nadel Hearing Transcript of 03-22-17 Hearing)(Maglich, Jordan)
April 26, 2017 1284 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1283 Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Briefing on or before May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/26/2017. (CCB)
April 26, 2017 1283 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to May 5, 2017 to submit supplemental briefing regarding Hatchett Lease by Burton W. Wiand. (Maglich, Jordan) Modified text on 4/26/2017 (KMM).
April 21, 2017 1282 MANDATE of USCA: Reversed and Remanded as to 1226 Notice of appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Issued as Mandate: 4/19/17 USCA number: 16-10942-GG. (JNB)
April 13, 2017 1281 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1280 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefs on or before April 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/13/2017. (CCB)
April 12, 2017 1280 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing Regarding Harchett Lease by Burton W. Wiand. (Maglich, Jordan)
April 12, 2017 1279 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Maglich on behalf of Burton W. Wiand (Maglich, Jordan)
April 11, 2017 1278 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1277 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Gianluca Morello only as counsel for Receiver. Attorney Gianluca Morello terminated. The Clerk is directed to change the docket accordingly. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/11/2017. (CCB)
April 11, 2017 1277 Unopposed MOTION for Gianluca Morello to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff-Receiver by Burton W. Wiand. (Lamont, Michael)
March 31, 2017 1276 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of March 22, 2017 motion hearing. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. (DJC)
March 31, 2017 1275 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on March 22, 2017 before the Honorable Judge Richard A. Lazzara. Court Reporter David J. Collier, Telephone number (813) 301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/21/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2017. (DJC)
March 22, 2017 1274 Respondent's Exhibit List by John Hatchett Carney. (Attachments: Exhibit # 1 - Photograph of Pit.) (CAB)
March 22, 2017 1273 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: MOTION HEARING held on 3/22/2017 re: 1261 Emergency MOTION to stay /enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and MOTION for order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against Hatchett Leaseholders and their Representatives for failure to comply with the Court's Order Appointing Receiver filed by Burton W. Wiand. Court Reporter: David Collier (CAB)
March 22, 2017 1272 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1261 Motion to Stay; denying 1261 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying [1269 & 1271] Motions for Leave to File Suit; and directing the parties to file legal memoranda no later than April 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/22/2017. (CCB)
March 21, 2017 1271 MOTION for leave to file suit for damages and declaratory relief against receiver by John Hatchett Carney. (KMM)
March 21, 2017 1270 RESPONSE to Motion re 1261 Emergency MOTION to stay /enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and MOTION for order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against Hatchett Leaseholders and their Representatives for failure to comply with the Court's Order Appointing Receiver filed by John Hatchett Carney. (KMM)
March 21, 2017 1269 MOTION for leave to file suit for damages and declaratory relief against receiver by Byron W. Hatchett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KMM)
March 21, 2017 1268 RESPONSE to Motion re 1261 Emergency MOTION to stay /enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and MOTION for order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against Hatchett Leaseholders and their Representatives for failure to comply with the Court's Order Appointing Receiver filed by Byron W. Hatchett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KMM)
March 8, 2017 1267 Featured Case ORDER granting 1266 Motion, specifically to Abandon Contents of Torrance, CA, Storage Unit and give possession of same to the Securities and Exchange Commission by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/8/2017.(SKH)
March 8, 2017 1266 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Abandon Contents of Torrance, CA., Storage Unit and Give Possession of Same to the Securities and Exchange Commission by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - CMA Storage Unit Inventory)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 7, 2017 1265 NOTICE of compliance re 1263 Order directing response to motion by Burton W. Wiand (Morello, Gianluca)
March 6, 2017 1264 NOTICE of Hearing on 1261 Emergency Motion to Stay/enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and Motion for Order to Show Cause for 3/22/2017 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
March 6, 2017 1263 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED setting hearing for Wednesday, March 22, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15B on 1261 Emergency Motion to Stay/enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and Motion for Order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against Hatchett Leaseholders and their Representatives for failure to comply with the Court's Order Appointing Receiver; and directing response to same no later than 3/20/2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/6/2017. (CCB)
March 3, 2017 1262 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver re 1261 Emergency MOTION to stay /enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and MOTION for order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against Hatchett Leaseholders and their Representatives for failure to comply with the Court's Order Appointing Receiver by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
March 3, 2017 1261 Emergency MOTION to stay /enjoin Texas Railroad Commission Administrative Proceeding filed against Receivership Entity Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and, MOTION for order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against Hatchett Leaseholders and their Representatives for failure to comply with the Court's Order Appointing Receiver by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Hatchett Ranch enclosing Receivership Orders, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Bill Hatchett, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Quest EMG 8-20-13, # 4 Exhibit 4 - QUEST - Letter to Hatchett and Gilmore 8-27-13, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Receiver's attorneys, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to J. Carney re. Hatchett Ranch, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Quest-Hatchett Ranch. Railroad Commission of Texas Letter 11.29.16, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter 12-28-16, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Filing Correspondence and Receivership Orders, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Letter from RRC 1.19.17)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 22, 2017 1260 Featured Case OPINION/ORDER of USCA: Reversed and Remanded as to 1226 Notice of appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. EOD: 2/22/17; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 16-10942-GG. (JNB)
January 10, 2017 1259 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1253 Receiver's Motion to Approve Sixth Interim Distribution and to Increase Certain Reserves. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/10/2017. (CCB)
January 9, 2017 1258 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1253 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve Sixth Interim Distribution filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Keefe, Sean)
December 27, 2016 1257 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1256 unopposed motion for extension of time to file response/reply as to 1254 memorandum in opposition to Receiver's unopposed motion to approve sixth interim distribution and increase certain reserves by Burton W. Wiand. An extension of time for filing is granted until January 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/27/2016.(DMB)
December 26, 2016 1256 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1254 Memorandum in opposition to Receiver's unopposed motion to approve sixth interim distribution and increase certain reserves by Burton W. Wiand. (Keefe, Sean)
December 21, 2016 1255 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing Burton W. Wiand to respond to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Limited Objection 1254 to Unopposed Motion to Approve Sixth Interim Distribution and Increase Certain Reserves on or before January 5/2017. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/21/2016. (CCB)
December 21, 2016 1254 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 1253 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Receiver's Unopposed Motion to (1) Approve Sixth Interim Distribution and (2) Increase Certain Reserves filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
December 20, 2016 1253 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve Sixth Interim Distribution by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit Reserves, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 24, 2016 1252 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting Request by Intervenor GE Capital Corp. to Stop Electronic Notification 1251 . The Clerk is directed to term Bush Ross, P.A. and to remove them from electronic notification. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/24/2016. (CCB)
October 24, 2016 1251 NOTICE by General Electric Capital Corporation to Stop Electronic Notification (Kasten, Arthur)
October 19, 2016 1250 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of Filing Final Judgments Against Paul R. Downey, Jeffry P. Downey, and John M. Leonard (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 6, 2016 1249 Featured Case ORDER granting 1245 Twenty-First Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/6/2016. (SKH)
September 27, 2016 1248 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 1244 First National Bank's Motion to Intervene and Go Free of Stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/27/2016. (CCB)
September 27, 2016 1247 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1244 MOTION to intervene [Renewed] and MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Relief from Stay to Enforce its Security Interest in Assets of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and Memorandum of Law filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert)
September 26, 2016 1246 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1244 MOTION to intervene [Renewed] and MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Relief from Stay to Enforce its Security Interest in Assets of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and Memorandum of Law filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First National Bank's Proof of Claim Form)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 19, 2016 1245 Unopposed Twenty-First Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit Rec's 20th Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit Prior Listing of Interim Motions, # 4 Exhibit Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 5 Exhibit Recovery from Investors, # 6 Exhibit Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 7 Exhibit Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 8 Exhibit Categorization and Summary of all WGK Costs, # 9 Exhibit Attorney Fee Schedule, # 10 Exhibit Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 11 Exhibit Recovery from Investors, # 12 Exhibit Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 13 Exhibit Recovery of Commissions, # 14 Exhibit James Hoyer, PA - Claims Administration and Objections, # 15 Exhibit James Hoyer, PA - Asset Analysis & Recovery, # 16 Exhibit Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 17 Exhibit PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 18 Exhibit E-Hounds, Inc, # 19 Exhibit The RWJ Group, LLC, # 20 Exhibit Yip Associates, # 21 Exhibit Goetz, Baldwin & Geddes P.C., # 22 Exhibit Stichter Riedel Blain & Postler PA, # 23 Exhibit Law Office of D. Harris and Law Office of A. Anderson, # 24 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified text on 9/20/2016 (KMM).
September 9, 2016 1244 MOTION to intervene [Renewed] and, MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Relief from Stay to Enforce its Security Interest in Assets of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. and Memorandum of Law by First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Rotella, Raymond) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
August 30, 2016 1243 STATUS report Receiver's Twentieth Interim Report by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 19, 2016 1242 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: 1226 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of pleadings: 1 volume USCA number: 16-10942-GG (KMM) (KMM).
July 19, 2016 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding 1 volume of pleadings re 1226 Notice of appeal USCA number: 16-10942-GG. (KMM)
June 17, 2016 1241 Featured Case ORDER granting 1240 Unopposed Motion to (1) approve procedure to administer claims and proof of claim form (2) establish deadline for filing proofs of claim, and (3) Permit notice by mail and publication. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/17/2016. (MSS)
June 15, 2016 1240 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically (1) Approve Procedure to Administer Claims and Proof of Claim Form, (2) Establish Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim, and (3) Permit Notice by Mail and Publication for Receivership Entity Quest by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 14, 2016 1239 NOTICE by Van Operating, Ltd. of Substitution of Counsel (Lieb, Stephanie)
March 25, 2016 1238 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 1230 Order on Motion for Order of SaleOrder on Motion for Order to Show Cause - Return of Service on Thomas Walbridge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Thomas Walbridge Return of Service)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 25, 2016 1237 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 1230 Order on Motion for Order of SaleOrder on Motion for Order to Show Cause - Return of Service on Anne Nadel Walbridge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Anne Nadel Walbridge Return of Service)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 23, 2016 1236 NOTICE of compliance re 1235 Notice canceling hearing by Burton W. Wiand (Morello, Gianluca)
March 23, 2016 1235 Featured Case ORDER/NOTICE canceling Show Cause hearing scheduled for Friday, March 25, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. Receiver to notify Anne Nadel Walbridge and Thomas Walbridge that they are no longer required to appear before the Court. (SKH)
March 23, 2016 1234 SUPPLEMENT re 1230 Order on Motion for Order of SaleOrder on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Supplement to Rec's Unopposed Motion at Docket 1229) by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
March 23, 2016 1233 *** Terminated- Counsel notified to properly file document with the case number and style listed on the document *** CERTIFICATE of service by Burton W. Wiand re 1229 MOTION for Order of Sale MOTION for order to show cause, 1230 Order on Motion for Order of SaleOrder on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Service on Thomas Walbridge). (Morello, Gianluca) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 3/24/2016 (KMM).
March 23, 2016 1232 *** Terminated- Counsel notified to properly file document with the case number and style listed on the document *** CERTIFICATE of service by Burton W. Wiand re 1229 MOTION for Order of Sale MOTION for order to show cause, 1230 Order on Motion for Order of SaleOrder on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Service on Anne Nadel Walbridge). (Morello, Gianluca) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 3/24/2016 (KMM).
March 16, 2016 1231 NOTICE OF HEARING: Show Cause Hearing scheduled 3/25/2016 at 11:00 a.m., in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (Note change in Courtroom due to construction.) (SKH)
March 16, 2016 1230 Featured Case ORDER granting 1229 Receiver's Unopposed Verified Motion for Approval of Sale and scheduling Show Cause Hearing for FRIDAY, MARCH 25, 2016, at 11:00 a.m., in COURTROOM 10B, before the undersigned, in the event that Anne Nadel Walbridge and Thomas Walbridge do not forthwith execute the quit claim deed transferring any and all interests they may have in the subject property in Vermont to the Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/16/2016. (SKH)
March 15, 2016 1229 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Marshfield, Washington County, Vermont and for Order to Show Cause by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Morello, Gianluca) . Modified on 3/16/2016 (KMM).
March 4, 2016 1228 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 1226 Notice of appeal. (KMM)
March 4, 2016 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding copy of docket entry re: receipt for appeal filing fee re 1226 Notice of appeal USCA number: unknown. (KMM)
March 3, 2016 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number tpa35272 re 1226 Notice of appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (ARC)
March 3, 2016 1227 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 1226 Notice of appeal. (Wirth, Steven)
March 3, 2016 1226 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1222 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wirth, Steven)
March 2, 2016 1225 COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT CODE UNDER APPEAL DOCUMENTS NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wirth, Steven) Modified on 3/3/2016 (BSN).
February 18, 2016 1224 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 1223 Pro-Se Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically to utilize CM/ECF by Paul Downey. Mr. Downey may resubmit his request with a detailed explanation as to why he needs to access this case through the CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/18/2016. (SKH)
February 18, 2016 1223 Pro-Se MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to utilize CM/ECF by Paul Downey. (Attachment # 1 Mailing Envelope) (KMM)
February 2, 2016 1222 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1209 Receiver's Motion Determination that Wells Fargo's Failure to Comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process Extinguished Interests, as set forth in the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/2/2016. (CCB)
January 11, 2016 1221 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1209 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Determination that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Failure to Comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process Extinguished Its Purported Interests in Receivership Properties filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Keefe, Sean)
January 8, 2016 1220 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from January 22, 2016 to through January 29, 2016. (Wirth, Steven)
December 28, 2015 1219 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing the Receiver Burton W. Wiand to REPLY to Response in Opposition re 1209 Motion to determine that Wells Fargo Bank's failure to comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process extinguished its purported interests in receivership properties and for lease of proceeds of sale of Sarasota property. Reply due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/28/2015. (SKH)
December 28, 2015 1218 Featured Case ORDER granting 1211 Unopposed Receiver's Twentieth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and his Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/28/2015. (SKH)
December 23, 2015 1217 REQUEST for oral argument re 1216 Response in Opposition to Motion for Determination that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Failure to Comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process Extinguished its Purported Interest In Receivership Properties, and for Release of Proceeds of Sale of Sarasota Property by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
December 23, 2015 1216 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1209 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Determination that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Failure to Comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process Extinguished Its Purported Interests in Receivership Properties and for Release of Proceeds of Sale of Sarasota Property filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
December 22, 2015 1215 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from December 23, 2015 to January 7, 2016. (Wirth, Steven)
December 22, 2015 1214 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from December 23, 2015 to January 7, 2016. (Shaheen, Louis)
December 15, 2015 1213 Featured Case ORDER granting 1212 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve fifth interim distribution by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/15/2015. (SKH)
December 11, 2015 1212 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve fifth interim distribution by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit Reserves, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 11, 2015 1211 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (Twentieth Motion) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit Rec's 19th Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit Prior Listing of Interim Motions, # 4 Exhibit Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 5 Exhibit Recovery from Investors, # 6 Exhibit Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 7 Exhibit Recovery of Commissions, # 8 Exhibit Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 9 Exhibit Appeal of R. Schneiderman, et al, # 10 Exhibit Categorization and Summary of all WGK Costs, # 11 Exhibit Attorney Fee Schedule, # 12 Exhibit Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 13 Exhibit Recovery from Investors, # 14 Exhibit Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 15 Exhibit Recovery of Commissions, # 16 Exhibit James Hoyer Newcomer & Smiljanich PA, # 17 Exhibit James Hoyer Newcomer & Smiljanich PA re appeal, # 18 Exhibit Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 19 Exhibit Appeal of R. Schneiderman, et al, # 20 Exhibit PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 21 Exhibit E-Hounds, Inc., # 22 Exhibit The RWJ Group, Inc., # 23 Exhibit Yip Associates, # 24 Exhibit Brannock & Humphries, # 25 Exhibit Scott Douglass McConnico, # 26 Exhibit Stichter Riedel Blain & Postler PA, # 27 Exhibit Law Office of D. Harris and Law Office of A. Anderson, # 28 Exhibit FedReceiver, # 29 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 7, 2015 1210 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver re 1209 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Determination that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Failure to Comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process Extinguished Its Purported Interests in Receivership Properties by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Laurel Preserve Loan Invoice, # 2 Exhibit Letter from Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.)(Keefe, Sean)
December 7, 2015 1209 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Determination that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Failure to Comply with this Court's Claims Administration Process Extinguished Its Purported Interests in Receivership Properties by Burton W. Wiand. (Keefe, Sean)
December 4, 2015 1208 STATUS report The Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Report (5/1/15 - 10/31/15) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 6, 2015 1207 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1206 Motion to Substitute Attorney Martin Garcia for La Bellasara Condominium. Attorney Hunter Wyman Carroll terminated. The clerk is directed to effectuate the substitution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/6/2015. (CCB)
November 6, 2015 1206 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by La Bellasara Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Garcia, Martin)
November 6, 2015 1205 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Garcia on behalf of La Bellasara Condominium Association, Inc. (Garcia, Martin)
October 1, 2015 1204 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1199 Receiver's Motion to Overrule Objection to Determination of Claim Number 469. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/1/2015. (CCB)
September 29, 2015 1203 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1202 Receiver's Motion for Permission to Prosecute Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/29/2015. (CCB)
September 28, 2015 1202 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Permission to Prosecute Appeal by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 18, 2015 1201 Featured Case ORDER granting 1196 Unopposed Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and his Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/18/2015. (SKH)
September 16, 2015 1200 NOTICE Of filing Amended Certificate of Service as to by Burton W. Wiand re 1199 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Overrule Objection to Determination of Claim Number 469 filed by MMG Bank (Morello, Gianluca) Modified on 9/17/2015 (BSN).
September 15, 2015 1199 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Overrule Objection to Determination of Claim Number 469 filed by MMG Bank by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 14, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 1185 Order on Motion for Settlement. Unable to forward mail to Donald Rowe. (KMM)
September 2, 2015 1198 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED accepting docket 1195 as a timely filed response and concluding that Claimants' objections should remain overruled. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/2/2015. (CCB)
September 2, 2015 1197 RESPONSE to Motion re 1190 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Overrule Objections to Claims 403, 404, 405, 406, 407, 408, and 477 filed by Chester Vincentz. (KMM)
August 28, 2015 1196 Nineteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals (November 1, 2014 through April 30, 2015) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - The Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Prior Interim Motions for Orders Awarding Fees, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Scoop Receivership-Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Scoop Receivership-Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 8 Exhibit 8 - Scoop Receivership-Appeal of R. Schneiderman, et al., # 9 Exhibit 9 - Categorization and Summary of all WGK Costs, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Attorney Fee Schedule, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 15 Exhibit 15 - James, Hoyer, Newcomer & Smiljanich, P.A., # 16 Exhibit 16 - James, Hoyer, Newcomer & Smiljanich, P.A. re appeal, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Scoop Legal Team-Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 18 Exhibit 18 - Scoop Legal Team-Appeal of R. Schneiderman, et al., # 19 Exhibit 19 - PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 20 Exhibit 20 - E-Hounds, Inc., # 21 Exhibit 21 - The RWJ Group, LLC, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Yip Associates, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Brannock & Humphries, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Scott Douglass & McConnico LLP, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Law Office of D. Harris and Law Office of A. Anderson, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified text on 8/28/2015 (KMM).
August 28, 2015 1195 Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re 1190 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Overrule Objections to Claims 403, 404, 405, 406, 407, 408, and 477 filed by Chester Vincentz. (KMM)
August 27, 2015 1194 Featured Case ORDER granting 1190 Motion to Overrule Objections to Claims. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/27/2015. (SKH)
August 19, 2015 1193 Featured Case ORDER of USCA: Motion to dismiss case with prejudice filed by Appellant Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA is GRANTED. [7547898-2] Parties are to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees as to 1178 Notice of appeal filed by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA. EOD: 8/19/15; USCA number: 15-12097-AA. (JNB)
August 12, 2015 1192 Declaration of M. Yip by Burton W. Wiand re 1190 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Overrule Objections to Claims 403, 404, 405, 406, 407, 408, and 477 Notice of Filing Declaration of Maria Yip (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M. Yip Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to M. Yip Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to M. Yip Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to M. Yip Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to M. Yip Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to M. Yip Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to M. Yip Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to M. Yip Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to M. Yip Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to M. Yip Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10-1 to M. Yip Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 10-2 to M. Yip Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 to M. Yip Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 to M. Yip Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 13 to M. Yip Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 to M. Yip Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 to M. Yip Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 16 to M. Yip Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 to M. Yip Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 18 to M. Yip Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 19 to M. Yip Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 20 to M. Yip Declaration, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 21 to M. Yip Declaration, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 22 to M. Yip Declaration, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 23 to M. Yip Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 24 to M. Yip Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 25 to M. Yip Declaration, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 26 to M. Yip Declaration, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 27 to M. Yip Declaration, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 28 to M. Yip Declaration, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 29 to M. Yip Declaration, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 30 to M. Yip Declaration, # 33 Exhibit Ex. 31 to M. Yip Declaration, # 34 Exhibit Ex. 32 to M. Yip Declaration, # 35 Exhibit Ex. 33 to M. Yip Declaration, # 36 Exhibit Ex. 34 to M. Yip Declaration, # 37 Exhibit Ex. 35 to M. Yip Declaration, # 38 Exhibit Ex. 36 to M. Yip Declaration, # 39 Exhibit Ex. 37 to M. Yip Declaration, # 40 Exhibit Ex. 38 to M. Yip Declaration, # 41 Exhibit Ex. 39 to M. Yip Declaration, # 42 Exhibit Ex. 40 to M. Yip Declaration, # 43 Exhibit Ex. 41 to M. Yip Declaration, # 44 Exhibit Ex. 42 to M. Yip Declaration, # 45 Exhibit Ex. 43 to M. Yip Declaration, # 46 Exhibit Ex. 44 to M. Yip Declaration, # 47 Exhibit Ex. 45 to M. Yip Declaration, # 48 Exhibit Ex. 46 to M. Yip Declaration, # 49 Exhibit Ex. 47 to M. Yip Declaration, # 50 Exhibit Ex. 48 to M. Yip Declaration, # 51 Exhibit Ex. 49 to M. Yip Declaration, # 52 Exhibit Ex. 50 to M. Yip Declaration, # 53 Exhibit Ex. 51 to M. Yip Declaration, # 54 Exhibit Ex. 52 to M. Yip Declaration, # 55 Exhibit Ex. 53 to M. Yip Declaration, # 56 Exhibit Ex. 54 to M. Yip Declaration, # 57 Exhibit Ex. 55 to M. Yip Declaration, # 58 Exhibit Ex. 56 to M. Yip Declaration, # 59 Exhibit Ex. 57 to M. Yip Declaration, # 60 Exhibit Ex. 58 to M. Yip Declaration, # 61 Exhibit Ex. 59 to M. Yip Declaration, # 62 Exhibit Ex. 60 to M. Yip Declaration, # 63 Exhibit Ex. 61 to M. Yip Declaration)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified on 8/12/2015 (KMM).
August 12, 2015 1191 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 1190 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Overrule Objections to Claims 403, 404, 405, 406, 407, 408, and 477 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 12, 2015 1190 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Overrule Objections to Claims 403, 404, 405, 406, 407, 408, and 477 by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
August 4, 2015 1189 Featured Case ORDER granting 1188 Motion specifically for Possession of Certain Bank Accounts Controlled by Arthur Nadel and Partial Modification of Asset Freeze by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/4/2015. (SKH)
August 4, 2015 1188 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of Certain Bank Accounts Controlled by Arthur Nadel and Partial Modification of Asset Freeze by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca) .(KMM)
July 28, 2015 1187 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1186 the Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Branch Bank and Trust Company. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/28/2015. (CCB)
July 28, 2015 1186 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Branch Banking and Trust Company (BB&T) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 27, 2015 1185 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1184 the Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Donald Rowe, individually and as trustee of the Wall Street Digest Pension Plan, Joyce Rowe, and Carnegie Asset Management, and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-245-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/27/2015. (CCB)
July 27, 2015 1184 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement in Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver v. Rowe, et al. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement Relating to Payment of Judgment)(Lamont, Michael)
June 12, 2015 1183 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1182 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Brian L. Meeker, individually and as trustee of Brian L. Meeker Trust, and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-166-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/12/2015. (CCB)
June 12, 2015 1182 MOTION for Settlement re: Brian L. Meeker, as trustee of the Brian L. Meeker Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 4, 2015 1181 STATUS report The Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Report (11/1/14 - 4/30/15) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 3, 2015 1180 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA re 1178 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 15-12097-A. (Dombovary, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2015 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding Receipt for appeal filing fee re 1178 Notice of interlocutory appeal USCA number: unknown. (KMB)
May 13, 2015 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number tpa30129 re 1178 Notice of appeal filed by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA (ARC)
May 13, 2015 1179 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of interlocutory appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 1178 Notice of appeal. (KMB)
May 12, 2015 1178 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 1174 Order on Motion for Release of Funds by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dkt. 1174 - Order)(Dombovary, Elizabeth) Modified text on 5/13/2015 (KMB).
April 29, 2015 1177 Featured Case ORDER granting 1175 Unopposed Amended Motion for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Sarasota, Sarasota County, Florida. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2015. (SKH)
April 15, 2015 1176 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 1173 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/15/2015. (CCB)
April 15, 2015 1175 Unopposed Amended MOTION for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Sarasota, Sarasota County, Florida by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Appraisal, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Appraisal, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Appraisal, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Receiver's Deed)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified relief and text on 4/15/2015 (KMB).
April 15, 2015 1174 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 1159 Motion for Release of Funds. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/15/2015. (CCB)
April 14, 2015 1173 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Sarasota, Sarasota County, Florida by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Appraisal, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Appraisal, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Appraisal, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Receiver's Deed)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified on 4/15/2015 (KMB).
April 10, 2015 1172 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1171 Motion for Kevin M. Eckhardt to withdraw as attorney by Fulcrum Distressed Opportunities Fund I, LP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/10/2015. (SKH)
April 9, 2015 1171 MOTION for Kevin M. Eckhardt to withdraw as attorney by Fulcrum Distressed Opportunities Fund I, LP. (Eckhardt, Kevin)
April 3, 2015 1169 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1159 MOTION for Release of Funds Turnover of Sale Proceeds - Sur-reply in Further Support of Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
April 2, 2015 1170 Remark correspondence as to Chester Vincentz (EJC)
March 30, 2015 1168 RESPONSE to Motion re 1159 MOTION for Release of Funds Turnover of Sale Proceeds ( BBT's Reply Memorandum on Motion for Turnover of Sale Proceeds of Fairview Property) filed by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA. (Garbett, David)
March 27, 2015 1167 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1162 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/27/2015. (CCB)
March 25, 2015 1166 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1165 Motion for Leave to File Reply on or before March 30, 2015. The Receiver may file a sur-reply of no more than ten (10) pages no later than April 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/25/2015. (CCB)
March 25, 2015 1165 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion for Turnover by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA. (Garbett, David)
March 23, 2015 1164 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 1163 Response in Opposition to Motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 23, 2015 1163 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1159 MOTION for Release of Funds Turnover of Sale Proceeds filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
March 10, 2015 1162 Unopposed MOTION for leave to appeal by Burton W. Wiand. (Smiljanich, Terry)
March 5, 2015 1161 REQUEST for oral argument re 1160 Notice (Other), 1159 MOTION for Release of Funds Turnover of Sale Proceeds by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA. (Garbett, David)
March 5, 2015 1160 NOTICE by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA re 1159 MOTION for Release of Funds Turnover of Sale Proceeds of Filing in Support of DE 1159 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Richard Miller, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration of David Hendrix, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dombovary)(Garbett, David)
March 5, 2015 1159 MOTION for Release of Funds Turnover of Sale Proceeds by Branch Banking & Trust Co. Successor to Colonial Bank NA. (Garbett, David)
February 13, 2015 1158 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1157 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Kathryn V. Lawrence and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-181-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/13/2015. (CCB)
February 12, 2015 1157 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Kathryn Lawrence (8:10-cv-181) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 9, 2015 1156 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1155 Unopposed Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/9/2015. (CCB)
December 22, 2014 1155 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals (July 1, 2014 through October 31, 2014) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 - The Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - The Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Prior Interim Motions for Orders Awarding Fees, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Scoop Receivership - Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Scoop Receivership - Recovery from Investors, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Scoop Receivership - Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Scoop Receivership - Recovery of Commissions, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Scoop Receivership - Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 10 Exhibit 9 - Scoop Receivership - Appeal of R. Schneiderman, et al., # 11 Exhibit 10 - Categorization and Summary of All WGK Costs, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Attorney Fee Schedule, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Scoop Legal Team - Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Scoop Legal Team - Recovery from Investors, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Scoop Legal Team - Recovery of Assets from Moodys, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Scoop Legal Team - Recovery of Commissions, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Scoop Legal Team - Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 18 Exhibit 17 - Scoop Legal Team - Appeal of R. Schneiderman, et al., # 19 Exhibit 18 - PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 20 Exhibit 19 - E-Hounds, Inc., # 21 Supplement 20 - Riverside Financial Group, # 22 Exhibit 21 - The RWJ Group, LLC, # 23 Exhibit 22 - Yip Associates, # 24 Exhibit 23 - Maples and Calder, # 25 Exhibit 24 - Reminger Co., L.P.A., # 26 Exhibit 25 - Schiff Hardin LLP, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Scott Douglass and McConnico LLP, # 28 Exhibit 27 - Law Office of Dick Harris and Ashton Anderson, # 29 Exhibit 28 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 17, 2014 1154 STATUS report The Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Report (7/1/14 - 10/31/14) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B-Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C-Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D-Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 5, 2014 1153 MANDATE of USCA as to 1027 Notice of appeal filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 12/5/14 USCA number: 13-12778-FF. (JNB)
December 3, 2014 1152 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (KMB)
November 18, 2014 1151 Featured Case ORDER granting 1150 Motion for sale of real property in Fairview, Buncombe County, North Carolina. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/18/2014. (SKH)
November 17, 2014 1150 Verified MOTION for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Fairview, Buncombe County, North Carolina by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Appraisal, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Receiver's Deed, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Orders)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified text on 11/18/2014 (KMB).
November 12, 2014 1149 NOTICE by Van Operating, Ltd. re 1029 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice Notice of Mark A. Platt's Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic and E-Mail Notices (Colton, Roberta)
November 12, 2014 1148 Featured Case ORDER granting 1144 Motion for Leave to retain Whitehorse Partners, LLC to Market and Sell Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (Renewed) by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/12/2014. (SKH)
November 12, 2014 1147 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1146 Gregory M. Wilkes' Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/12/2014. (CCB)
November 10, 2014 1146 MOTION for Gregory M. Wilkes to appear pro hac vice by Van Operating, Ltd.. (Colton, Roberta)
November 5, 2014 FEES paid by Van Operating, Ltd. (Filing fee $10.00 receipt number TPA26592) Balance due $Greg Wilkes (AG)
November 4, 2014 1145 Third Interim Report on Quest Energy Management, Inc. (May 24, 2014 to November 4, 2014) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Status of wells, # 2 Exhibit B - Cash Accounting Report)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified text on 11/5/2014 (KMB).
October 28, 2014 1144 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for leave to retain Whitehorse Partners, LLC to Market and Sell Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (Renewed) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Marketing Engagement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Additional materials re WhiteHorse)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 24, 2014 1143 Featured Case ORDER granting 1140 Receiver's Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/24/2014. (SKH)
October 22, 2014 1142 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Austin Rine is relieved of any further responsibility concerning Jeff Downey, Paul Downey, and Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/22/2014. (SKH)
October 21, 2014 1141 MOTION for John A. Rine to withdraw as attorney by Jeff Downey, Paul Downey, Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. (Rine, John)
October 1, 2014 1140 Receiver's Unopposed Seventeenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals (February 1, 2014 through June 30, 2014 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Part 1-Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 2-Part 2-Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Report, # 4 Exhibit 3-Prior Interim Motions for Orders Awarding Fees, # 5 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Rep of Scoop Receivership, # 6 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 7 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from Moodys, # 8 Exhibit 7-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 9 Exhibit 8-Scoop Receivership-Quest Energy Mgmt Group, # 10 Exhibit 9-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 11 Exhibit 10-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 12 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital LLC Receivership, # 13 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 14 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from Moodys, # 15 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 16 Exhibit 15-Scoop Legal Team-Quest Energy Mgmt Group, # 17 Exhibit 16-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 18 Exhibit 17-E-Hounds, Inc., # 19 Exhibit 18 Riverside Financial Group, # 20 Exhibit 19-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 21 Exhibit 20-Yip Associates, # 22 Exhibit 21-Brock & Brock PLLC, # 23 Exhibit 22-Maples, # 24 Exhibit 23-Reminger Co., LPA, # 25 Exhibit 24-Schiff Hardin LLP, # 26 Exhibit 25-Scott, Douglas & McConnico, LLP, # 27 Exhibit 26-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca) Modified text on 10/2/2014 (KMB).
September 26, 2014 1139 PUBLISHED ORDER of USCA: Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Appellee Burton W. Wiand is GRANTED as to 1027 Notice of appeal filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. EOD: 9/26/14; USCA number: 13-12778-FF. (JNB)
September 25, 2014 1138 Featured Case ORDER of USCA: Motion for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Onique E. White is DENIED. [7115039-2]; Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Onique E. White is DENIED as MOOT as to 1027 Notice of appeal filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. EOD: 9/25/14; USCA number: 13-12778-FF. (JNB)
August 19, 2014 1137 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1136 Motion for Permission to Appeal Order in 8:10-cv-245-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/19/2014. (CCB)
August 15, 2014 1136 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Permission to Appeal Order Granting Summary Judgment Regarding Garnished Annuity in the Rowe action by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order entered July 11, 2014 (Doc. 383))(Morello, Gianluca)
August 12, 2014 1135 STATUS report The Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Report (2/1/14 - 6/30/14) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 28, 2014 1134 Featured Case ORDER granting 1133 Motion for Possession of Brokerage Accounts Controlled by Arthur Nadel; Authorization to Relinquish Remaining Brokerage Accounts; and Partial Modification of Asset Freeze. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/28/2014. (SKH)
July 25, 2014 1133 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for (1) Possession of Brokerage Accounts Controlled by Arthur Nadel; (2) Authorization to Relinquish Remaining Brokerage Accounts; and (3) Partial Modification of Asset Freeze by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 21, 2014 1132 JUDGMENT in favor of Burton W. Wiand for the amount of $6,477.30 and against Vernon M. Lee (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN)
July 18, 2014 1131 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 1130 Claimant's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment against Claimant Vernon M. Lee in accordance with the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/18/2014. (CCB)
July 16, 2014 1130 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Overrule re 1119 Declaration of Ganluca Morello in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs by Vernon M. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B pt. 1, # 3 Exhibit B pt. 2, # 4 Exhibit B pt. 3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(BSN)
July 16, 2014 1129 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1128 Motion for Permission to Prosecute Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/16/2014. (CCB)
July 14, 2014 1128 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Permission to Prosecute Appeal of the Schneiderman Action by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 11, 2014 1127 Featured Case ORDER granting 1124 Unopposed Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and his Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/11/2014. (SKH)
June 27, 2014 1126 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 1125 Declaration Certificate of Service (Morello, Gianluca)
June 27, 2014 1125 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 1121 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Attorney Fee Breakdown)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 25, 2014 1124 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals (September 1, 2013 through January 31, 2014) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 - The Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - The Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Prior Interim Motions for Orders Awarding Fees, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Scoop Receivership - Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Scoop Receivership - Recovery from Investors, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Scoop Receivership - Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Scoop Receivership - Recovery of Commissions, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Scoop Receivership - Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 10 Exhibit 9 - Categorization and Summary of Costs Incurred by WGK, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Attorney Fee Schedule, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Scoop Legal Team - Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Scoop Legal Team - Recovery from Investors, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Scoop Legal Team - Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Scoop Legal Team - Recovery of Commissions, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Scoop Legal Team - Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., # 17 Exhibit 16 - PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 18 Exhibit 17 - E-Hounds, Inc., # 19 Exhibit 18 - The RWJ Group, LLC, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Yip Associates, # 21 Exhibit 20 - Kirby Noonan Lance and Hoge, # 22 Exhibit 21 - Reminger Co., L.P.A., # 23 Exhibit 22 - Schiff Hardin LLP, # 24 Exhibit 23 - Brock and Brock, # 25 Exhibit 24 - Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan and Silver, LLC, # 26 Exhibit 25 - Maples, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Scott Douglass and McConnico LLP, # 28 Exhibit 27 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 24, 2014 1123 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 1122 Motion to Vacate Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1121 by Vernon M. Lee. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/24/2014. (SKH)
June 23, 2014 1122 MOTION to Vacate 1121 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Vernon M. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(BSN)
June 18, 2014 1121 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1118 Motion for Order Overruling Objections to Determinations of Claim Numbers 462, 463, 464, 465, 466, and 467 and Awarding Sanctions in the Form of Attorney Fees and Costs. In accordance with attached order, Receiver to file documentation on or before 7/2/2014; Claimant to file response to that documentation no later than 7/17/2014; and Clerk to send copy of attached order to Claimant. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/18/2014. (CCB)
June 4, 2014 1120 NOTICE of supplemental authority re 1118 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order Overruling Objections to Determinations of Claim Numbers 462, 463, 464, 465, 466, and 467 and Awarding Sanctions in the Form of Attorney Fees and Costs , 1119 Declaration by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 11th Circuit Opinion)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 30, 2014 1119 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 1118 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order Overruling Objections to Determinations of Claim Numbers 462, 463, 464, 465, 466, and 467 and Awarding Sanctions in the Form of Attorney Fees and Costs by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 30, 2014 1118 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order Overruling Objections to Determinations of Claim Numbers 462, 463, 464, 465, 466, and 467 and Awarding Sanctions in the Form of Attorney Fees and Costs by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
May 23, 2014 1117 STATUS report re Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (Second Report) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Well Status Report), # 2 Exhibit B (SFAR))(Morello, Gianluca)
May 15, 2014 1116 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice 1115 Motion for Leave to Retain Whitehorse Partners LLC to Market and Sell Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/15/2014. (CCB)
May 14, 2014 1115 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for leave to retain Whitehorse Partners, LLC to Market and Sell Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 24, 2014 1114 Featured Case ORDER granting 1113 Unopposed Motion to Approve Fourth Interim Distribution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/24/2014. (SKH)
April 10, 2014 1113 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Fourth Interim Distribution and Increase Certain Reserves by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B - Reserves, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 10, 2014 1112 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Raymond J. Rotella of Kosto & Rotella P.A. is relieved of any further representation as attorney by First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/10/2014. (SKH)
April 9, 2014 1111 MOTION for Raymond J. Rotella of Kosto & Rotella P.A. to withdraw as attorney by First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge. (Rotella, Raymond)
March 27, 2014 1110 Featured Case ORDER granting 1109 Receiver's Verified Motion for Approval of Private Sale of the Assets of Tradewind, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/27/2014. (SKH)
March 13, 2014 1109 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for approval of private sale of the assets of Tradewind, LLC by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 7, 2014 1108 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1107 the Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Band Gates, PL, and associated with Case no. 8:10-cv-245-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/7/2014. (CCB)
March 7, 2014 1107 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Donald Rowe, et al. (8:10-cv-245), specifically, settlement with Band Gates, P.L. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 7, 2014 1106 STATUS report Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Report (9/1/13 - 1/31/14) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 4, 2014 1105 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting to a limited extent 1101 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/4/2014. (CCB)
February 4, 2014 1104 RESPONSE to Motion re 1101 MOTION for clarification re 1100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
February 4, 2014 1103 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Burton W. Wiand against Choice Direct Mail, Inc., Ty Hardin. See judgment for details. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN)
February 3, 2014 1102 Featured Case ORDER granting 1099 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/3/2014. (SKH)
January 28, 2014 1101 MOTION for clarification re 1100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Harwell, Lacy)
January 15, 2014 1100 Featured Case ORDER granting 1097 Motion for order authorizing the receiver to execute and submit an amended form 1040X income tax return for Arthur Nadel to the IRS. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/15/2014. (MSS)
January 14, 2014 1099 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Donald Rowe, et al. (8:10-cv-245), specifically, settlement with Ty Hardin and Choice Direct Mail, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 2, 2014 1098 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1096 Unopposed Motion for Ana T. Barnett, Esq. to withdraw as attorney by TRSTE, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/2/2014. (DMB)
December 31, 2013 1097 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order (1) Authorizing Receiver to Execute and Submit Amended Tax Return of Arthur Nadel; (2) Directing the IRS to Accept the Tax Return; (3) Directing IRS to Deliver any Tax Return to Receiver; and (4) Authorizing Receiver to Negotiate and Deposit any Tax Refund Payable to Arthur Nadel by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 31, 2013 1096 Unopposed MOTION for Ana T. Barnett, Esq. to withdraw as attorney by TRSTE, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Barnett, Ana)
December 26, 2013 1095 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1094 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with multiple parties. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/26/2013. (CCB)
December 23, 2013 1094 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: (1) Harvey A. Gilbert and Deanne E. Gilbert, as Co-Trustees of the Gilbert Family Trust, (2) Melinda Munson and Mark Munson, (3) Munson Family Partners, Ltd., (4) Peter Roby and Katherine Roby, (5) Rodney Nigel Turner, (6) Louis Wang, (7) Charles Hailey, (8) Paul Swenson, (9) Gregg Weinberg, as Trustee of the Commonwealth Radiology, PC PSP, (10) John D. Whitlock, as Trustee of the W.W. Whitlock PC Pension Trust, and (11) W.W. Whitlock Foundation by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreements)(Lamont, Michael)
December 17, 2013 1093 Featured Case ORDER of USCA: Motion to strike filed by Appellant Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. is DENIED as to 1027 Notice of appeal filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. EOD: 12/13/13; USCA number: 13-12778-FF. (JNB)
November 26, 2013 1092 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 1090 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion regarding the K-2 Hideaway action. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/26/2013. (SKH)
November 26, 2013 1091 Featured Case ORDER granting 1086 Unopposed Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/26/2013. (SKH)
November 26, 2013 1090 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Bart Leereveld, Reinhardt D. Damm, Dencora Services and Management Corporation, and K2 Hideaway, LLC, Case No. 12-3774 CA (20th Jud. Cir.) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 26, 2013 1089 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1088 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Band Weintraub, P.L. and associated with Case no. 8:10-cv-245-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/26/2013. (CCB)
November 25, 2013 1088 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Donald Rowe, et al. (8:10-cv-245), specifically, settlement with Band Weintraub, P.L. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 22, 2013 1087 Featured Case ORDER granting 1085 Receiver's Motion to Approve Third Interim Distribution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/22/2013. (SKH)
November 14, 2013 1086 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs To Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Part 1 of 2-Receiver's 14th Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 2-Part 2 of 2-Receiver's 14th Interim Report, # 4 Exhibit 3-Listing of Prior Interim Motions for Fees and Costs, # 5 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 6 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 7 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from C. and N. Moody, # 8 Exhibit 7-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 9 Exhibit 8-Scoop Receivership-Quest Energy, # 10 Exhibit 9-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 11 Exhibit 10-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 12 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC, # 13 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 14 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from C. and N. Moody, # 15 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 16 Exhibit 15-Scoop Legal Team-Quest Energy, # 17 Exhibit 16-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 18 Exhibit 17-Riverside Financial Group, # 19 Exhibit 18-E-Hounds, Inc., # 20 Exhibit 19-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 21 Exhibit 20-Yip Associates, # 22 Exhibit 21-EIM Consulting, LLC, # 23 Exhibit 22-The Taylor Law Offices, PC, # 24 Exhibit 23-Wheeler Fairman & Kelley, CPA, # 25 Exhibit 24-Allen Dell, PA, # 26 Exhibit 25-Kirby Noonan Lance & Hoge, LLP, # 27 Exhibit 26-Klar & Associates, # 28 Exhibit 27-Reminger & Co, LPA, # 29 Exhibit 28-Briggs and Morgan, PA, # 30 Exhibit 29-Brock & Brock, PLLC, # 31 Exhibit 30-Goetz Baldwin and Geddes, # 32 Exhibit 31-Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser PA, # 33 Exhibit 32-Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP, # 34 Exhibit 33-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 6, 2013 1085 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Third Interim Distribution, (2) Increase Certain Reserves, and (3) Release Certain Other Reserves by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B-Reserves, # 3 Exhibit C-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 4, 2013 1084 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 1076 Motion for Partial Relief from Stay to File Lien. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/4/2013. (CCB)
November 1, 2013 1083 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1076 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Partial Relief from Stay MOTION for leave to file to Permit Filing of a Lien in Public Records filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
October 25, 2013 1082 CERTIFICATE OF readiness to USCA: Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: 1027 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of pleadings (SEALED): 1. USCA number: 13-12778-FF (BSN)
October 23, 2013 1081 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1079 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Donald Rowe et al. and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-245-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/23/2013. (CCB)
October 23, 2013 1080 Featured Case ORDER granting 1078 Motion for Settlement between the Receiver and Marianne Bollaci Siegal as trustee of the Hardin Family Irrevocable Trust. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/23/2013. (SKH)
October 22, 2013 1079 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Donald Rowe, et al. (8:10-cv-245), specifically, settlement with SRB Associates, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 22, 2013 1078 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Wiand, as Receiver v. Donald Rowe, et al. (8:10-cv-245), specifically, settlement with Marianne Bollaci Siegal, as trustee of the Hardin Family Irrevocable Trust u/a/d January 21, 2013 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 17, 2013 1077 STATUS report Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Report (March 1, 2013 - August 31, 2013) by Burton W. Wiand as to Scoop Real Estate, L.P., E. John Lopez, Victory IRA Fund, Ltd., Marty Huppert, Victory Fund, Ltd., Carrelage Multi-Strategy Offshore Fund, Ltd., Anne Nadel-Walbridge, Viking IRA Fund, LLC, Viking Management, LLC, Kelvin V. Lee, Viking Fund, LLC, Scoop Management, Inc., Valhalla Management, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A., Valhalla Investment Partners, L.P., Arthur Nadel, Scoop Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B-Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C-Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D-Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 15, 2013 1076 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Partial Relief from Stay , MOTION for leave to file to Permit Filing of a Lien in Public Records by La Bellasara Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Carroll, Hunter)
October 1, 2013 1075 Featured Case ORDER granting 1074 Motion to Approve Sale of the Assets of Respiro, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/1/2013. (SKH)
September 30, 2013 1074 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Sale of the Assets of Respiro, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Purchase Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Orders)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 27, 2013 1073 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 1065 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/27/2013. (CCB)
September 25, 2013 1072 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1071 the Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Daniel A Zak, individually and as Trustee, and Marion Zak as Trustee, and associated with Case Nos. 8:10-cv-161-T-17MAP and 8:10-cv-170-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/25/2013. (CCB)
September 25, 2013 1071 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: Daniel A. Zak, individually and as Trustee of the EPMG-NW P.C. MPP & PS Trust and Marian Zak, as Trustee of the Marvin Zak and Marian Lyle Zak Bypass Trust u/d dtd October 16, 1998 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 23, 2013 1070 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1065 MOTION to intervene and to Allow First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge to go Free of the Stay to Enforce its Security Interest in Assets of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., and Motion for Immediate Accounting and Memorandum of Law in Suppo filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 19, 2013 1069 RESPONSE to Motion re 1065 MOTION to intervene and to Allow First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge to go Free of the Stay to Enforce its Security Interest in Assets of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., and Motion for Immediate Accounting and Memorandum of Law in Suppo - filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert)
September 17, 2013 1068 Featured Case ORDER of USCA: Appellee's motion to dismiss the appeal for violation of injunction and lack of jurisdiction is CARRIED WITH THE CASE filed by Appellee Burton W. Wiand. as to 1027 Notice of appeal filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. EOD: 9/17/13; USCA number: 13-12778-FF. (JNB)
September 6, 2013 1067 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1066 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with the Carrswold Partnership and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-212-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/6/2013. (CCB)
September 5, 2013 1066 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement re: The Carrswold Partnership by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 5, 2013 1065 MOTION to intervene and to Allow First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge to go Free of the Stay to Enforce its Security Interest in Assets of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., and Motion for Immediate Accounting and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion by First National Bank of Albany/Breckenridge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rotella, Raymond) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
September 4, 2013 1064 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 1062 Motion to Intervene as stated on the record in open court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/4/2013. (MSS)
September 4, 2013 1063 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/4/2013. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Provenzano (MSS)
September 3, 2013 1062 MOTION to intervene and/or to file amicus curiae memorandum by Jeff Downey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rine, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
August 29, 2013 1061 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED overruling objection to and affirming denial of Claim 445. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/29/2013. (CCB)
August 28, 2013 1060 NOTICE of compliance re 1059 Order pdf by Burton W. Wiand (Morello, Gianluca)
August 28, 2013 1059 Featured Case ORDER regarding appearances at Status Conference scheduled Wednesday, September 4, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. The Receiver is directed to post this Order on the Receivership's informational website so that interested parties may be informed of the date, time, and place of the Status Conference if they wish to attend, whether personally or via teleconferencing as set forth. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/28/2013. (SKH)
August 28, 2013 1058 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 9/5/2013 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Status Conference reset for WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 4, 2013, at 9:00 a.m., in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (SKH)
August 28, 2013 1057 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1056 Motion to Continue Status Conference scheduled September 5, 2013. Status Conference rescheduled to WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 4, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/28/2013. (SKH)
August 27, 2013 1056 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Status Conference of September 5, 2013 by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenson, Robert)
August 27, 2013 1055 Featured Case ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING scheduling Status Conference on THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 5, 2013, at 10:30 a.m., in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. The Receiver and counsel for the SEC should be prepared to discuss with the Court whether it is financially in the best interest of the Receivership and the defrauded investors to maintain Quest as a receivership entity. The Receiver is directed to post this order on the Receivership's informational website so that interested parties may be informed of the date, time, and place of the Status Conference if they wish to attend. (SKH)
August 26, 2013 1054 STATUS report Receiver's Interim Report on Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (May 24, 2013 to August 26, 2013) by Burton W. Wiand as to Scoop Real Estate, L.P., Jeff Downey, E. John Lopez, Victory IRA Fund, Ltd., Marty Huppert, Victory Fund, Ltd., Carrelage Multi-Strategy Offshore Fund, Ltd., Anne Nadel-Walbridge, Viking IRA Fund, LLC, Viking Management, LLC, Kelvin V. Lee, Viking Fund, LLC, Scoop Management, Inc., Valhalla Management, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A., Valhalla Investment Partners, L.P., Arthur Nadel, Scoop Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wheeler's Preliminary Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Order, # 3 Exhibit C - September 2011 letter, # 4 Exhibit D - Status Update Memoranda dated September 24, 2012 and October 16, 2012)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 23, 2013 1053 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1052 Motion for Clarification and permitting counsel to attend the deposition of the Receiver as set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/23/2013. (CCB)
August 23, 2013 1052 Unopposed MOTION for clarification re 822 Order on Motion to Disqualify by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
August 20, 2013 1051 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 1048 Memorandum in support - Receiver's memorandum re. affirming denial of Claim 445 filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
August 13, 2013 1050 Featured Case ORDER granting 1049 Motion to Approve Sale of 2009 BMW 535i. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/13/2013. (SKH)
August 12, 2013 1049 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Approve the sale of 2009 BMW 5351 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 31, 2013 1048 MEMORANDUM in support re 1034 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Fulcrum Distressed Opportunities Fund I, LP. (Eckhardt, Kevin)
July 29, 2013 1047 Featured Case ORDER granting 1037 Unopposed Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/29/2013. (see order) (MSS)
July 26, 2013 1046 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1045 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Walter Schwab, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-185-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/26/2013. (CCB)
July 25, 2013 1045 MOTION for Settlement re: Walter Schwab, et al. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 18, 2013 1044 Featured Case ORDER granting 1042 Motion for approval of sale of real property located in in Sarasota, Sarasota Florida. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/18/2013. (see order) (MSS)
July 18, 2013 1043 Featured Case ORDER granting 1041 Motion for approval of sale of real property located in Evergreen Jefferson County, Colorado. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/18/2013. (see order) (MSS)
July 17, 2013 1042 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Sarasota, Sarasota County, Florida by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 16, 2013 1041 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Evergreen, Jefferson County, Colorado by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 3, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Part 2 of 3, # 8 Exhibit 4 - Part 3 of 3, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 16, 2013 1040 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 1039 Motion to Intervene and Motion for Immediate Accounting. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/16/2013. (CCB)
July 15, 2013 1039 MOTION to intervene and for Immediate Accounting by Jeff Downey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rine, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
July 11, 2013 1038 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 1034 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice of Filing Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts Relating to Objection to Determination of Claim Number 445 (Attachments: # 1 Main Document Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts Relating to Objection to Determination of Claim Number 445, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 9, 2013 1037 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2a-Rec's 13th Interim Report-Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2b-Rec's 13th Interim Report-Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3-Prior Interim Motions for Fees and Costs, # 5 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Rep of Scoop Receivership, # 6 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 7 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 8 Exhibit 7-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 9 Exhibit 8-Scoop Receivership-Holland & Knight, # 10 Exhibit 9-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 11 Exhibit 10-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 12 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC, # 13 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 14 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 15 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 16 Exhibit 15-Scoop Legal Team-Holland & Knight, # 17 Exhibit 16-James Hoyer et al., # 18 Exhibit 17-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 19 Exhibit 18-E-Hounds, Inc., # 20 Exhibit 19-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 21 Exhibit 20-Yip Levi, # 22 Exhibit 21-EIM Consulting, LLC, # 23 Exhibit 22-Allen Dell PA, # 24 Exhibit 23- Jones & Keller PC, # 25 Exhibit 24-Briggs and Morgan PA, # 26 Exhibit 25-Goetz, Baldwin et al., # 27 Exhibit 26-Stichter, Riedel et al., # 28 Exhibit 27-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 9, 2013 1036 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1035 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Anne Nadel Walbridge associated with case no. 8:12-cv-2532-T-23TGW. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/9/2013. (CCB)
July 9, 2013 1035 MOTION for Settlement re: Anne Nadel Walbridge by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 3, 2013 1034 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1033 Motion for Establishing Procedure to Resolve Objection to Claim Number 445 (see attached order for details of procedure). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/3/2013. (CCB)
July 2, 2013 1033 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for establishing procedure to resolve objection to claim number 445 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 27, 2013 1032 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 1031 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and The Carrswold Partnership. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/27/2013. (SKH)
June 26, 2013 1031 MOTION for Settlement re: The Carrswold Partnership - AAA Arbitration by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 20, 2013 1030 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Platt on behalf of Van Operating, Ltd. (Platt, Mark)
June 20, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding receipt #TPA-17990 re 1027 Notice of appeal (RFK)
June 20, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa17990 re 1027 Notice of appeal filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (ARC)
June 20, 2013 1029 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1028 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/20/2013. (CCB)
June 19, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Mark A. Platt, appearing on behalf of Van Operating, Ltd. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA17983.). (JNB)
June 19, 2013 1028 MOTION for Mark A. Platt to appear pro hac vice by Van Operating, Ltd.. (Colton, Roberta)
June 14, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 1027 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (BSN)
June 14, 2013 1027 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1024 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rine, John)
June 5, 2013 1026 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1025 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Ellen Schwab associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-130-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/5/2013. (CCB)
June 5, 2013 1025 MOTION for Settlement re: Ellen Schwab by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 24, 2013 1024 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 993 Motion to Expand Scope of Receivership regarding Quest. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/24/2013. (CCB)
May 24, 2013 1023 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 1022 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/24/2013. (CCB)
May 23, 2013 1022 MOTION for leave to file Sur-reply by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. (Rine, John)
May 22, 2013 1021 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1020 Motion to Prosecute Limited Cross-Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/22/2013. (CCB)
May 22, 2013 1020 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically PERMISSION TO PROSECUTE LIMITED CROSS-APPEAL by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 14, 2013 1019 NOTICE of Appearance by John Austin Rine on behalf of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (Rine, John)
May 14, 2013 1018 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED striking 1017 Motion to Extend Time to Retain Attorney. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/14/2013. (CCB)
May 13, 2013 1017 ***STRICKEN PER 1018 ORDER*** MOTION to extend time to retain attorney by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (JNB) Modified on 5/15/2013 (JNB).
May 8, 2013 1016 Featured Case ORDER granting 1011 Motion for Order of Sale. Any and all claims relating to the real properties that is the subject of this order shall be extinguished at the time of its sale by the receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2013. (MSS)
May 7, 2013 1015 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1013 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Edward Steinhauser and Diane Schwab associated with Case no. 8:10-cv-157-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/7/2013. (CCB)
May 7, 2013 1014 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1012 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Dominique Schmidt and Caroline Schwab associated with Case no. 8:10-cv-223-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/7/2013. (CCB)
May 7, 2013 1013 MOTION for Settlement re: Edward Steinhauser and Diane Schwab by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 7, 2013 1012 MOTION for Settlement re: Dominique Schmidt and Caroline Schwab by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 6, 2013 1011 Unopposed MOTION for Order of Sale of Unencumbered Real Property Located in Thomasville, Thomas County, Georgia by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 29, 2013 1010 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER: Former counsel for Quest Energy Management Group, Inc., shall furnish a copy of the Court's order allowing counsel to withdraw to Quest no later than the close of business Tuesday, April 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2013. (CCB)
April 29, 2013 1009 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 1008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Quest. Attorneys James E. Felman and Katherine Earle Yanes terminated. Quest shall have until 5/14/2013 for new counsel to enter appearance. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2013. (CCB)
April 29, 2013 1008 MOTION for Kynes, Markman & Felman; James E. Felman; and Katherine Earle Yanes to withdraw as attorney by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. (Yanes, Katherine)
April 26, 2013 1007 REPLY to Response to Motion re 993 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 17, 2013 1006 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Levenson on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Levenson, Robert)
April 17, 2013 1005 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 1004 Motion for Leave to File Reply on or before April 26, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/17/2013. (CCB)
April 17, 2013 1004 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.'s Opposition to the Receiver's Motion to Expand The Scope of Receivership by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
April 15, 2013 1003 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 993 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yanes, Katherine)
April 12, 2013 1002 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 980 Motion to Modify. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/12/2013. (CCB)
April 8, 2013 1001 STATUS report Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Report (October 1, 2012 - February 28, 2013) by Burton W. Wiand as to Scoop Real Estate, L.P., E. John Lopez, Victory IRA Fund, Ltd., Marty Huppert, Victory Fund, Ltd., Carrelage Multi-Strategy Offshore Fund, Ltd., Anne Nadel-Walbridge, Viking IRA Fund, LLC, Viking Management, LLC, Kelvin V. Lee, Viking Fund, LLC, Scoop Management, Inc., Valhalla Management, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A., Valhalla Investment Partners, L.P., Arthur Nadel, Scoop Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 4, 2013 1000 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 999 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 993 Motion to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. Response due on or before 4/15/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/4/2013. (CCB)
April 4, 2013 999 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 993 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. by Quest Energy Management Group, Inc.. (Felman, James)
April 4, 2013 998 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Katherine Earle Yanes on behalf of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (Yanes, Katherine)
April 4, 2013 997 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by James E. Felman on behalf of Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. (Felman, James)
March 28, 2013 996 Featured Case ORDER deferring ruling on 979 Receiver's Motion to Enjoin Court Proceedings subject to being reopened after Judge Scriven rules on the motions for summary judgment in case 8:11-cv-516-MSS-EAJ. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/28/2013. (SKH)
March 26, 2013 995 REPLY to Response to Motion re 979 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to enjoin the R. Formica et al. v. D. Rowe et al., Case No. 8:11-cv-516 (M.D. Fla.) and J. Bell, II et al. v. D. Rowe et al., Case No. 2009 CA 4925 NC (Sarasota Cty Cir. Ct.) filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
March 21, 2013 994 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 993 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 21, 2013 993 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Quest Energy Management Group, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 19, 2013 992 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing the Receiver to respond to The Formicas' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Receiver's Motion to Enjoin Court Proceedings. Responses due by 3/26/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/19/2013. (SKH)
March 18, 2013 991 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 990 Response in Opposition to Motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 18, 2013 990 RESPONSE in Opposition re 980 MOTION to modify Order Disallowing Claim by Elendow LLC filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
March 15, 2013 989 Featured Case ORDER granting 988 Motion for Approval to Transfer Vehicles' Titles. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/15/2013. (SKH)
March 15, 2013 988 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval to Transfer Vehicle Titles by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Limited Power of Attorney)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 14, 2013 987 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 979 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Richard Formica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Barker, Chris)
March 11, 2013 986 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED enjoining J. Bell, II, et al. v. D. Rowe, et al., No. 2009 CA 4925 pending in the Twelfth Judicial Circuit, and directing Plaintiffs' counsel to notify presiding judge. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/11/2013. (CCB)
March 11, 2013 985 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 979 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to enjoin the R. Formica et al. v. D. Rowe et al., Case No. 8:11-cv-516 (M.D. Fla.) and J. Bell, II et al. v. D. Rowe et al., Case No. 2009 CA 4925 NC (Sarasota Cty Cir. Ct.) (Morello, Gianluca)
March 7, 2013 984 Featured Case ORDER granting 983 Motion to Appoint Receiver.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/7/2013. (SKH)
March 6, 2013 983 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Sixth Motion for Reappointment of Receiver) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 5, 2013 982 Featured Case ORDER granting 981 Receiver's Motion for Permission to Prosecute Cross-Appeals 981 . Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/5/2013. (SKH)
March 4, 2013 981 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Permission to Prosecute Limited Cross-Appeals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - (Lee) Report and Recommendation, # 2 Exhibit B - (Lee) Order adopting Report and Recommendation, # 3 Exhibit C - (Dancing $) Report and Recommendation, # 4 Exhibit D - (Dancing $) Order adopting Report and Recommendation)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 1, 2013 980 MOTION to modify Order Disallowing Claim by Elendow LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Claimant Ellendow, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of Cliam, # 2 Affidavit in Support of Claimant Elendwo LLC's Motion to Modify Oder Disallowing Claim)(Bleil, Joshua)
February 28, 2013 979 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to enjoin the R. Formica et al. v. D. Rowe et al., Case No. 8:11-cv-516 (M.D. Fla.) and J. Bell, II et al. v. D. Rowe et al., Case No. 2009 CA 4925 NC (Sarasota Cty Cir. Ct.) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Formica v. Rowe Operative Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Bell v. Rowe Operative Complaint)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 21, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Mark A. Rogers, appearing on behalf of World Opportunity Fund, L.P. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA15986.). (JNB)
February 21, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James E. Connelly, appearing on behalf of World Opportunity Fund, L.P. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA15986.). (JNB)
February 20, 2013 978 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED regarding Order entered at docket 976. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/20/2013. (CCB)
February 20, 2013 977 NOTICE cancelling Motion Hearing hearing scheduled for 2/21/2013 at 9:00 a.m. (SKH)
February 20, 2013 976 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 966 Motion to Clarify Settlement Orders and cancelling hearing scheduled Thursday, February 21, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/20/2013. (SKH)
February 19, 2013 975 RESPONSE in Opposition re 966 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to clarify certain settlement orders and JOINDER re 973 World Opportunity Fund's Objection to Receiver's Motion "To Clarify Certain Settlement Orders" filed by Peter Roby, Katherine Roby, Charles A. Hailey, Gregg Weinberg, Louis Wang, John D. Whitlock, Rodney Nigel Turner, W.W. Whitlock Foundation, Paul Swenson, Harvey A. Gilbert, Deanne E. Gilbert, Thomas Luck, Mark Munson, Melinda Munson, Munson Family Partners, Ltd.. (Warren, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2013 974 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 972 James E. Connelly and Mark A. Rogers' motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/19/2013. (SKH)
February 19, 2013 973 RESPONSE to Motion re 966 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to clarify certain settlement orders filed by World Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rogers, Mark)
February 19, 2013 972 Unopposed MOTION for James E. Connelly and Mark A. Rogers to appear pro hac vice by World Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Schrils, Frederick)
February 15, 2013 971 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 966 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to clarify certain settlement orders Notice of Filing Amended Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification (Lamont, Michael)
February 15, 2013 970 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 966 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to clarify certain settlement orders Notice of Filing Amended Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification (Lamont, Michael)
February 15, 2013 969 NOTICE of hearing on 966 Motion to Clarify Certain Settlement Orders set for 2/21/2013 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
February 15, 2013 968 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED directing World Opportunity Fund, L.P. to respond to 966 Motion to Clarify Certain Settlement Orders on or before 2/19/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/15/2013. (CCB)
February 14, 2013 967 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 966 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to clarify certain settlement orders by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
February 14, 2013 966 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to clarify certain settlement orders by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - profiteer's brief, # 2 Exhibit B - settlement orders, # 3 Exhibit C - proposed order)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 8, 2013 965 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 964 Receiver's Motion to Approve Agreement with Samuel R. Morgan, III, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-205-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/8/2013. (CCB)
February 8, 2013 964 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Agreement Relating to Payment of Judgment re: Samuel Ross Morgan, III by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 5, 2013 963 Featured Case ATTACHED ORDER granting 960 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Joyce and Donald Rowe associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-245-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/5/2013. (CCB)
February 4, 2013 962 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 961 Receiver's Motion for Settlement with Henry M. Buhl associated with Case No. 10-cv-75-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/4/2013. (CCB)
February 4, 2013 961 MOTION for Settlement re: Henry M. Buhl by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 4, 2013 960 MOTION for Settlement re: Donald Rowe, individually and as Trustee of the Wall Street Digest Defined Benefit Pension Plan, Joyce Rowe, and Carnegie Asset Management, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 31, 2013 959 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff's disgorgement claims against the Relief Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/31/2013. (SKH)
January 30, 2013 958 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of its Disgorgement Claims Against Relief Defendants (Masel, Scott)
January 23, 2013 957 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 956 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Steve Ellis associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-233-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/23/2013. (CCB)
January 22, 2013 956 MOTION for Settlement re: Steve Ellis by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 17, 2013 955 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED deferring ruling on the motion at docket 740 pending resolution of Case No. 8:12-cv-557-T-27EAJ. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/17/2013. (CCB)
December 20, 2012 954 FINAL JUDGMENT as to defendants Scoop Capital, LLC and Scoop Management, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/19/2012. (CEK)
December 19, 2012 953 Featured Case ORDER granting 952 Motion for Final Judgment as to Defendants Scoop Capital, LLC, and Scoop Management, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/19/2012. (SKH)
December 18, 2012 952 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Final Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief and Notice of Filing Consent of Defendants Scoop Capital, LLC, and Scoop Management, Inc. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Consent of Defendants Scoop Capital, LLC, and Scoop Management, Inc., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Masel, Scott)
December 14, 2012 951 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 950 Unopposed Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and his Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/14/2012. (SKH)
December 5, 2012 950 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Part 1-Receiver's Twelfth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 2-Part 2-Receiver's Twelfth Interim Report, # 4 Exhibit 3-Scoop Receivership-Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 5 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 6 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from Moodys, # 7 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 8 Exhibit 7-Scoop Receivership-Holland & Knight, # 9 Exhibit 8-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 10 Exhibit 9-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 11 Exhibit 10-Part 1-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC, # 12 Exhibit 10-Part 2-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC, # 13 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 14 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from Moodys, # 15 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 16 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Holland & Knight, # 17 Exhibit 15-Nadel Receivership-Wells Fargo, # 18 Exhibit 16-James Hoyer, # 19 Exhibit 17-Part 1-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 20 Exhibit 17-Part 2-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 21 Exhibit 18-Riverside Financial Group, # 22 Exhibit 19-E-Hounds, Inc., # 23 Exhibit 20-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 24 Exhibit 21-Yip Levi, # 25 Exhibit 22-John M. Fedders, # 26 Exhibit 23-The Taylor Law Offices, P.C., # 27 Exhibit 24-EIM Consulting LLC, # 28 Exhibit 25-Orrick, # 29 Exhibit 26-Kirby Noonan Lance & Hoge LLP, # 30 Exhibit 27-Cheney, Brock & Saudek, P.C., # 31 Exhibit 28-Jones & Keller, P.C., # 32 Exhibit 29-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 30, 2012 949 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 936 Motion for possession of title of real estate as stated on the record in open court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/30/2012. (MSS)
November 30, 2012 948 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2012 re 936 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT filed by Burton W. Wiand. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
November 28, 2012 947 RESPONSE in opposition re 936 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT filed by Anne Nadel-Walbridge. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Farmer, Matthew)
November 16, 2012 946 Featured Case ORDER granting 945 Motion to approve second interim distribution, to approve revisions to certain claim determinations, to increase certain reserved and to release certain other reserves. (see order). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/16/2012. (MSS)
November 14, 2012 945 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically (1) Approve Second Interim Distribution, (2) Approve Revisions to Certain Claim Determinations, (3) Increase Certain Reserves, and (4) Release Certain Other Reserves by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B - Reserves, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 13, 2012 944 NOTICE of Hearing on 936 Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT continued to 11/30/2012 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
November 13, 2012 943 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 942 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT on or before 11/28/2012 and granting 942 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/13/2012. (CCB)
November 13, 2012 942 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 936 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT, Unopposed MOTION to continue Hearing by Anne Nadel-Walbridge. (Farmer, Matthew)
November 13, 2012 941 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Farmer on behalf of Anne Nadel-Walbridge (Farmer, Matthew)
November 5, 2012 940 NOTICE of compliance re 938 Order directing response to motion Receiver's Notice of Providing Court Filings to Anne Nadel by Burton W. Wiand (Morello, Gianluca)
November 1, 2012 939 NOTICE of Hearing on 936 Motion for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT set for 11/15/2012 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
November 1, 2012 938 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED directing to Anne Nadel to respond to 936 Motion for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT, on or before 11/13/2012. The Clerk and the Receiver are directed to send notice in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/1/2012. (CCB)
October 31, 2012 937 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 936 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 31, 2012 936 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Possession of and Title to Real Property Located in Marshfield, VT by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Anne Nadel letter)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 29, 2012 935 Featured Case ORDER granting 934 Motion to Reappoint Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/29/2012. (SKH)
October 29, 2012 934 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Reappoint Receiver by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 26, 2012 933 Featured Case ORDER granting 931 Motion to dismiss with prejudice; granting 931 Motion authorizing the Receiver to deposit into the receivership estate tax refunds made payable to defendant Nadel. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/26/2012. (MSS) Modified on 10/29/2012 (CEK).
October 26, 2012 932 Featured Case ORDER granting 930 Motion for leave to pay Arbitrators' hourly fees from Receivership Estate. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/26/2012. (MSS) Modified on 10/29/2012 (CEK).
October 25, 2012 931 Unopposed MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Disgorgement and Civil Penalty Claims as to Defendant Nadel, Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for an Order Authorizing the Receiver to Deposit into the Receivership Estate Tax Refunds Made Payable to Defendant Nadel by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masel, Scott)
October 25, 2012 930 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for leave to pay arbitrators' hourly fees directly from Receivership Estate by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
October 23, 2012 929 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Twelfth Interim Report (4/1/12 - 9/30/12) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets, # 4 Exhibit D - Neil Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 23, 2012 928 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 927 E. Zack's Motion for relief from receivership. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/23/2012. (CCB)
October 23, 2012 927 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to intervene as a victim seeking relief from the receivership by Emelie Zack. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(BSN)
October 8, 2012 926 NOTICE of Apperance Appearance by Paul B. Thanasides on behalf of Vernon M. Lee (Thanasides, Paul)
October 8, 2012 925 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Lorien Smith Johnson on behalf of Vernon M. Lee (Johnson, Lorien)
October 4, 2012 924 JUDGMENT granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlment (Doc. 898 ) between Receiver and Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (CEK)
October 2, 2012 923 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 920 Motion to Approve Settlement with Catholic Charities, Diocese of Venice, Inc., et al., associated with Case nos. 8:10-cv-247-T-17MAP and 8:10-cv-246-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/2/2012. (CCB)
October 2, 2012 922 Featured Case ORDER granting 898 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement between the Receiver and Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/2/2012. (SKH)
October 2, 2012 921 Featured Case ORDER re Receiver's motion to approve settlement with the law firm of Holland & Knight LLP. The Court is of the opinion that the analysis and rationale of the Court's order approving the settlement with Goldman Sachs should apply to the resolution of the pending motion to approve the settlement with H&K and MacLeod. Therefore, based on that analysis and rationale, the objection to the Receiver's motion is overruled, and the Court will grant the motion by entering, by separate docket entry, the order proposed by the Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/2/2012. (SKH)
October 2, 2012 920 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Catholic Charities, Diocese of Venice, Inc. and Bishop Frank J. Dewane, as Corporation Sole of the Diocese of Venice in Florida and Diocese of Venice in Florida, an unincorporated religious organization by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
October 1, 2012 919 OBJECTION re 898 MOTION to Approve Settlement with Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod. (Thanasides, Paul)
September 27, 2012 918 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 917 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Sarasota Opera Association, Inc., in connection with 8:10-cv-248-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/27/2012. (CCB)
September 27, 2012 917 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Sarasota Opera Association, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 21, 2012 916 Featured Case ORDER granting 904 Motion to expand the scope of receivership to include Respiro, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/21/2012. (see order) (MSS)
September 21, 2012 915 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2012 re 904 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Respiro, Inc. filed by Burton W. Wiand. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
September 13, 2012 914 Featured Case ORDER granting 897 Unopposed receiver's twelfth interim Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/13/2012. (see order) (MSS)
September 12, 2012 913 NOTICE of compliance re 907 Order directing response to motion by Burton W. Wiand (Morello, Gianluca)
September 12, 2012 912 PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Burton W. Wiand. Newspaper: The Wall Street Journal and the Sarasota Herald Tribune Date(s) of publication August 31, 2012 and September 4, 2012 re settlement with Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Guy M. Burns, Esq. with Proof of Publications)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 12, 2012 911 Featured Case ORDER granting 909 Motion to Expand Receivership to include Summer Place Development Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/12/2012. (SKH)
September 11, 2012 910 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 909 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand Receivership to Include Summer Place Development Corporation by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 11, 2012 909 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand Receivership to Include Summer Place Development Corporation by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 10, 2012 908 NOTICE of Hearing on 904 Motion to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Respiro, Inc., set for 9/21/2012 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
September 10, 2012 907 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED directing response to 904 Motion to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Respiro, Inc., on or before 9/19/2012, with directions to the Clerk and to Counsel for the Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/10/2012. (CCB)
September 7, 2012 906 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher D. Moody re: 904 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Respiro, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
September 7, 2012 905 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 904 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Respiro, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 7, 2012 904 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Expand the Scope of Receivership to Include Respiro, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
August 31, 2012 903 Featured Case ORDER granting 902 Receiver's Unopposed Verified Motion for Approval of Agreement Regarding Sale of Securities of Endai Marketing Growth. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/31/2012. (SKH)
August 31, 2012 902 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Agreement Regarding Sale of Securities of Endai Marketing Growth, Inc. Verified by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 29, 2012 901 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 900 Motion to Approve Proposed Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/29/2012. (CCB)
August 28, 2012 900 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve proposed notice of settlement with Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice of Settlement)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 28, 2012 899 AFFIDAVIT of Burton W. Wiand re: 898 MOTION to Approve Settlement with Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
August 28, 2012 898 MOTION to Approve Settlement with Holland & Knight LLP and Scott R. MacLeod by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 28, 2012 897 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Twelfth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs To Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Receiver's Eleventh Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 3-Scoop Receivership-Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 4 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 5 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from Moodys, # 6 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Holland & Knight, # 7 Exhibit 7-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 8 Exhibit 8-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 9 Exhibit 9-Scoop Legal Team - Scoop Capital LLC Receivership, # 10 Exhibit 10-Scoop Legal Team - Recovery from Investors, # 11 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team - Recovery from Moodys, # 12 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team - Recovery of Commissions, # 13 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team - Holland & Knight, # 14 Exhibit 14-Litigation Involving Wells Fargo, # 15 Exhibit 15-James, Hoyer, et al., # 16 Exhibit 16-de la Parte & Gilbert, P.A., # 17 Exhibit 17-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 18 Exhibit 18-Riverside Financial Group, # 19 Exhibit 19-E-Hounds, Inc., # 20 Exhibit 20-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 21 Exhibit 21-Yip Levi, # 22 Exhibit 22-Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe (Europe) LLP, # 23 Exhibit 23-Kirby Noonan Lance & Hoge LLP, # 24 Exhibit 24-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 23, 2012 896 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 895 Motion to Approve Settlement with Richard E. Russell, individually and as Trustee of the Richard E. Russell Revocable Living Trust, and associated with Case 8:10-cv-176-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/23/2012. (CCB)
August 23, 2012 895 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Richard E. Russell, individually and as Trustee of the Richard E. Russell Revocable Living Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
August 13, 2012 894 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byWells Fargo Bank, N.A. from August 22, 2012 to September 3, 2012. (Shaheen, Louis)
August 13, 2012 893 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byWells Fargo Bank, N.A. from August 21, 2012 to September 4, 2012. (Wirth, Steven)
August 2, 2012 892 Featured Case ORDER granting 891 Unopposed Motion to approve sale of Yamaha Baby Grand Piano. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/2/2012. (MSS)
August 1, 2012 891 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve the sale of a Yamaha Baby Grand Piano by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 20, 2012 890 MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on 07/19/2012 Hearing outcome: adjourned(Cohen, Jonathan)
July 19, 2012 889 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 888 Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/19/2012. (CCB)
July 19, 2012 888 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: EFG Bank f/k/a EFG Private Bank SA and D&E Unit Trust Associates by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 17, 2012 887 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 886 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/17/2012. (SKH)
July 17, 2012 886 MOTION for clarification re 884 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 12, 2012 885 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 882 Motion to Approve Settlement between the Receiver and Geofco Holdings, Inc., Michael G. Edgecombe, and Barbara Edgecombe, in the amount of and within the time period provided for in the agreement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/12/2012. (SKH) Modified on 7/12/2012 (SKH).
July 12, 2012 884 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 871 Motion for relief from freeze of assets. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/12/2012. (MSS)
July 12, 2012 883 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2012 re 871 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically of non-party Marguerite J. Nadel for relief from freeze on assets (oral hearing requested). Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
July 12, 2012 882 MOTION to Approve Settlement by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 6, 2012 881 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 880 Motion to Approve Settlement with Girls, Inc. of Sarasota County. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/6/2012. (CCB)
July 5, 2012 880 MOTION to Approve Settlement by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 3, 2012 879 RESPONSE in opposition re 871 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically of non-party Marguerite J. Nadel for relief from freeze on assets (oral hearing requested) Verified Opposition filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - G. Morello Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - B. Wiand Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 - W. Price Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Indictment and Nadel's agreement to plead guilty)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 29, 2012 878 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 877 Motion for Leave to Pay Arbitration Filing Fees Directly From Receivership Estate. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/29/2012. (CCB)
June 29, 2012 877 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to pay filing fees for arbitration proceedings directly from funds in the Receivership Estate by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
June 26, 2012 876 NOTICE of Hearing on 871 Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically of non-party Marguerite J. Nadel for relief from freeze on assets. (Hearing on July 6th 873 cancelled and rescheduled.) Hearing SET for Thursday, July 12, 2012 at 09:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this notice to Marguerite Nadel.(CCB)
June 25, 2012 875 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Provenzano (SKP)
June 25, 2012 874 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 05/15/12 before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sandra K. Provenzano,Telephone number 813/301-5699. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/16/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2012. (SKP)
June 22, 2012 873 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 871 for miscellaneous relief, specifically of non-party Marguerite J. Nadel, for relief from freeze on assets: Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (SKH)
June 22, 2012 872 Featured Case ORDER directing response and scheduling hearing on Marguerite Nadel's Motion for Relief from Freeze on Assets. The receiver shall file a response on or before 7/3/2012. Hearing scheduled 7/6/2012 at 11:30 a.m., before the undersigned, in Courtroom 15B. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/22/2012. (SKH)
June 21, 2012 871 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically of non-party Marguerite J. Nadel for relief from freeze on assets (oral hearing requested). (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
June 6, 2012 870 Featured Case ORDER appointing Howard A. Tescher as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference scheduled for July 19-20, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. each day. Said mediation shall not be cancelled/continued without leave of Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/6/2012. (SKH)
June 5, 2012 869 Featured Case ORDER granting 868 Motion to extend time to complete mediation. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/5/2012. (SKH)
June 5, 2012 868 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to complete mediation by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jonathan)
June 5, 2012 867 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 19 and 20, 2012 at 9:30 A.M. before Howard A. Tescher. (Cohen, Jonathan)
June 1, 2012 866 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED directing parties to file notice of mediation within 7 days in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/1/2012. (CCB)
June 1, 2012 865 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 864 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Benjamin Linstead. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/1/2012. (CCB)
May 31, 2012 864 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Benjamin Linstead by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 31, 2012 863 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Eleventh Interim Report (12/1/11 - 3/31/12) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Receivership Assets Sold or Otherwise Disposed, # 3 Exhibit C - Chris Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 24, 2012 862 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) 861 Motion for Relief from Freeze on Assets. The movant and Receiver are directed to confer within 7 days. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/24/2012. (CCB)
May 24, 2012 860 Featured Case ORDER granting 859 Unopposed Receiver's Eleventh Interim Motion for awarding fees, costs and reimbursement of costs to receiver and his professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/24/2012. (see order) (MSS)
May 22, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 840 Order, 806 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail NO LONGER TO BE RESENT to Arthur Nadel. (SAH)
May 22, 2012 861 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically non-party for relief from freeze on assets by Marguerite J. Nadel. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Mailing Envelope)(SAH)
May 18, 2012 859 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Eleventh Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Receiver's Tenth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 3-Scoop Receivership-Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 4 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 5 Exhibit 5Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 6 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 7 Exhibit 7-Categorization and Summary of All Costs Incurred by WGK, # 8 Exhibit 8-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 9 Exhibit 9-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 10 Exhibit 10-Fowler White Boggs, # 11 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 12 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 13 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 14 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Holland & Knight, # 15 Exhibit 15-PDR Certified Public Accountants, # 16 Exhibit 16-Riverside Financial Group, # 17 Exhibit 17-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 18 Exhibit 18-Orrick, # 19 Exhibit 19-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 17, 2012 858 Featured Case ORDER granting 857 Motion to approve first interim distribution and approval revisions to certain claim determinations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/17/2012. (see order) (MSS)
May 15, 2012 857 Supplemental MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Unopposed Motion to Approve First Interim Distribution and Approve Revisions to Certain Claim Determinations by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 15, 2012 856 NOTICE by LandMark Bank of Florida of Attorney Hoeck's Request to be Removed from Mailing Matrix (Hoeck, Kathryn)
May 15, 2012 855 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 853 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/15/2012. (CCB)
May 15, 2012 854 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Status Conference held on 5/15/2012. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Provenzano (MSS)
May 14, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable (Defendant deceased) re: 824 OrderOrder directing response to motion. Mail NO LONGER TO BE RESENT to Arthur Nadel. (BSN)
May 14, 2012 853 Emergency MOTION for reconsideration re 840 Order, 842 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Limited Emergency Motion) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wirth, Steven)
May 14, 2012 852 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/15/2012 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
May 14, 2012 851 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER: In view of the two Notices filed by the Receiver at dockets 843 and 850 with regard to the sale of the "Rite Aid Property," counsel for the Receiver and counsel for Wells Fargo are directed to appear before the Court for an expedited status conference on Tuesday, May 15, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/14/2012. (CCB)
May 14, 2012 850 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 843 Notice (Other)Notice (Other) Notice Of Additional Factual Development Regarding Sale Of Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina (Cohen, Jonathan)
May 14, 2012 849 NOTICE canceling hearing scheduled for June 1, 2012. (CCB)
May 14, 2012 848 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER: The motion for referral of mediation at docket 845 is denied as moot. In view of the Court's order referring the parties to mediation, the hearing scheduled for Friday June 1, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. is cancelled. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/14/2012. (CCB)
May 14, 2012 847 Featured Case ORDER granting 846 Amended Motion for referral to mediation. The Receiver and Wells Fargo are directed to select and agreed-upon mediator, date, time and location to occur withint 45 days. Parties are to appear at the mediation personally by counsel and corporate officers. The receiver is directed to notify the Court of the selected mediator, date, time and location of the medication. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/14/2012. (see order) (MSS)
May 14, 2012 846 Amended MOTION for referral to mediation Receiver's Corrected And Unopposed Motion For Order Directing Mediation by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jonathan)
May 14, 2012 845 Unopposed MOTION for referral to mediation Receiver's Unopposed Motion For Order Directing Mediation by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jonathan)
May 14, 2012 844 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Late Claims (Dkt. 740) set for 6/1/2012 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
May 11, 2012 843 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 840 Order, 842 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice Of Factual Development Regarding Sale Of Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Jonathan)
May 8, 2012 842 Featured Case ORDER granting 823 Receiver's Verified Motion to Approve the Sale of Real Property Located in Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2012. (SKH)
May 8, 2012 841 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 719 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2012. (CCB)
May 8, 2012 840 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED regarding the sale of the Graham, North Carolina (Rite-Aid) property referenced at docket 823. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2012. (CCB)
May 7, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 822 Order on motion to disqualify. Mail not resent to Arthur Nadel, 820 suggestion of death. (SAH)
May 7, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 819 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail not resent to Arhur Nadel, 820 suggestion of death. (SAH)
May 7, 2012 839 Featured Case ORDER granting 825 Unopposed Motion to approve first interim distribution, establish reserved and approve revision to certain claim determinations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/7/2012. (see order) (MSS)
May 7, 2012 838 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED regarding approval of first interim distribution referenced at docket 825. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/7/2012. (CCB)
May 4, 2012 837 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of Filing April 24, 2012, Order Entered in United States v. A. Nadel, Case No. 09-cr-433 (JGK) (S.D.N.Y.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 4, 2012 836 RESPONSE re 831 Objection Receivers Reply To Limited Objection Of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. In Opposition To ReceiversUnopposed Motion To (1) Approve First Interim Distribution, (2) Establish Reserves, And (3)Approve Revisions To Certain Claims Determinations filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
May 4, 2012 835 Featured Case ORDER granting 803 Motion to Approve Settlement regarding Shoreline Trading Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/4/2012. (SKH)
May 4, 2012 834 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 833 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Wells Fargo Bank's Limited Objection at docket 831 on or before 5:00 p.m. today, May 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/4/2012. (CCB)
May 4, 2012 833 MOTION for leave to file Reply Receivers Opposed Motion For Leave To Reply To Limited Objection Of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.In Opposition To Receivers Unopposed Motion To (1) Approve First Interim Distribution, (2) Establish Reserves, And (3) Approve Revisions To Certain Claims Determinations by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
May 2, 2012 832 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 823 Motion for miscellaneous relief filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Carol Lomax Fortenberry, MAI, # 2 Exhibit B - Standard & Poors, Ratings for Rite Aid Corp.)(Wirth, Steven)
May 2, 2012 831 OBJECTION re 825 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve First Interim Distribution, (2) Establish Reserves, and (3) Approve Revisions to Certain Claim DeterminationsUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve First Interim Distribution, (2) Establish Reserves, and (3) Approve Revisions to Certain Claim Determinations (LIMITED OBJECTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
May 1, 2012 830 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 829 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with John V. Cloud and Catherine S. Cloud associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-165-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/1/2012. (CCB)
May 1, 2012 829 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: John V. Cloud and Catherine S. Cloud, as Co-Trustees of the Mary Anne Cloud Revocable Trust dtd 03/13/1987 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 30, 2012 828 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of (1) Publication of Receiver's Court-Approved Notice of Sale and (2) That No Additional Offer to Purchase Real Property Located in Tazewell, TN Has Been Received (Morello, Gianluca)
April 30, 2012 827 NOTICE by General Electric Capital Corporation, VFS Financing, Inc. Notice of Request to be Removed from Mailing Matrix (Kasten, Arthur)
April 27, 2012 826 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing expedited response by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 825 Unopposed Motion to (1) Approve First Interim Distribution, (2) Establish Reserves, and (3) Approve Revisions to Certain Claim Determinations. Response due on or before 5/2/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/27/2012. (CCB)
April 27, 2012 825 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve First Interim Distribution, (2) Establish Reserves, and (3) Approve Revisions to Certain Claim Determinations by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Distribution Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B - Reserves, # 3 Exhibit C - Revisions to Certain Claim Determinations, # 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 27, 2012 824 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing expedited response by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to respond to 823 Receiver's Verified Renewed Motion To Approve The Sale Of Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina. Response due on or before 5/2/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/27/2012. (CCB)
April 26, 2012 823 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Approve The Sale Of Real Property Receivers Verified Renewed Motion To Approve The Sale Of Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 Agreement of Sale and Purchase, # 3 Exhibit 3 CBRE Appraisal, # 4 Exhibit 4 Grubb & Ellis Appraisal, # 5 Exhibit 5 Fortenberry Appraisal, # 6 Exhibit 6 Publication - Notice of Sale, # 7 Exhibit 7 SEC v Mutual Benefits, # 8 Exhibit 8 Email July 22, 2009)(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 25, 2012 822 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 766 Motion to Disqualify in all respects. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/25/2012. (CCB)
April 19, 2012 821 NOTICE by William Gordon and Brian Gordon on SEC Receivership Action (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(SAH)
April 19, 2012 820 SUGGESTION of Death of Defendant Arthur Nadel bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Masel, Scott)
April 17, 2012 819 Featured Case ORDER granting 817 Motion for Order Approving Sale of Property located in Raleigh, Wake County, North Carolina, to Tri-Arc Food Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/17/2012. (SKH)
April 17, 2012 818 RESPONSE in opposition re 766 MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel The Receivers Corrected Response In Opposition to Motion To Disqualify Receiver filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 16, 2012 817 Verified MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for an order approving the sale of Property To Tri-Arc by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 13, 2012 816 Featured Case ORDER granting 813 Receiver's Unopposed Verified Motion for Approval of Agreement Regarding Repayment of Debt, Termination of Rights, and Repurchase of Securities Relating to Bond.com. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/13/2012. (SKH)
April 11, 2012 815 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of Publication of Receiver's Court-Approved Notice of Settlement with Shoreline Trading Group, LLC (Morello, Gianluca)
April 10, 2012 814 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver re 813 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Agreement Regarding Repayment of Debt, Termination of Rights and Repurchase of Securities Relating to Bonds.com by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 10, 2012 813 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Agreement Regarding Repayment of Debt, Termination of Rights and Repurchase of Securities Relating to Bonds.com by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 10, 2012 812 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand Notice Of Filing Appraisals Of Receivership Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jeffrey Skeahan Rite Aid Appraisal, # 2 Exhibit B - Roscoe Shiplett Rite Aid Appraisal)(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 5, 2012 811 Featured Case ORDER granting 810 Motion for Approval of Sale of Real Property. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/5/2012. (SKH)
April 4, 2012 810 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Unopposed Verified Motion for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located in Tazewell, TN by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Summary Appraisal Report, # 3 Exhibit Search Results, # 4 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, # 5 Exhibit Composite Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit Notice of Sale)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 3, 2012 809 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 806 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - Notice of Receiver's Mailing of Court-Approved Notice of Settlement With Shoreline Trading Group, LLC (Morello, Gianluca)
April 2, 2012 808 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 807 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with the YMCA Foundation of Sarasota, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/2/2012. (CCB)
March 30, 2012 807 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement re: YMCA Foundation of Sarasota, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 30, 2012 806 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 805 Motion to Approve Proposed Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/30/2012. (CCB)
March 29, 2012 805 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve proposed notice of settlement relating to Docket 803 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 29, 2012 804 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 803 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Shoreline Trading Group, LLC ("Shoreline")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Shoreline Trading Group, LLC ("Shoreline") by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
March 29, 2012 803 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Shoreline Trading Group, LLC ("Shoreline") by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - CFTC v. Equity Fin. Grp., Rec's Memo of Law, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 20, 2012 802 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SJ)
March 20, 2012 801 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/2/12 before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. Court Reporter Sherrill L. Jackson, FPR, RPR,Telephone number 813/301-5041. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/10/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2012. (SJ)
March 16, 2012 800 RESPONSE re 798 Notice to the Courts to take judicial notice filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 16, 2012 799 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 794 Motion for leave to file Reply to Opposition of Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/16/2012. (SKH)
March 15, 2012 798 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding actual docketed court filings characterized in the Receiver's Response in Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion for Leave to Reply by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A)(Wirth, Steven)
March 15, 2012 797 RESPONSE in opposition (AMENDED) to Wells Fargo Motion Docket No. 794 filed by Burton W. Wiand, Wiand Guerra King P.L.. (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 15, 2012 796 RESPONSE in opposition to Wells Fargo Bank's Motion for Leave to File Reply filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Masel, Scott)
March 15, 2012 795 RESPONSE in opposition to Wells Fargo Motion Docket No. 794 filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 15, 2012 794 MOTION for leave to file (To File Reply To Opposition of Receiver, Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and The Securities and Exchange Commission to Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (I) To Disqualify Receiver, (II) To Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) To Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
March 15, 2012 793 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 791 Motion for extension of time to file response. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/15/2012. (SKH)
March 15, 2012 792 RESPONSE in opposition re 766 MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel (Corrected Version) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Masel, Scott)
March 15, 2012 791 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 790 Memorandum in opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion to Disqualify Receiver, Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, and Disallow All Fees for Receiver and His Counsel by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Masel, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 15, 2012 790 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 766 Motion to disqualify Receiver and Wiand Guerra King filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Masel, Scott)
March 14, 2012 789 DECLARATION of George L. Guerra re 788 Memorandum in opposition by Wiand Guerra King P.L.. (McNamara, Patrick)
March 14, 2012 788 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 766 Motion to disqualify filed by Wiand Guerra King P.L.. (McNamara, Patrick)
March 14, 2012 787 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 786 Response in opposition to motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 14, 2012 786 RESPONSE in opposition re 766 MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Hearing Transcript March 2, 2012)(Cohen, Jonathan)
March 9, 2012 785 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand that Receiver has Provided Notice of Approval of Receiver's Claims Determination Motion (Morello, Gianluca)
March 9, 2012 784 Featured Case ORDER appointing additional appraisers for property located at 841 South Main Street, Graham, North Carolina. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/9/2012. (SKH)
March 8, 2012 783 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of Submission of Appraiser (Wirth, Steven)
March 8, 2012 782 Featured Case ORDER granting 780 Motion to Approve Public Sale of Unencumbered Real Property Located in Raleigh, Wake County, North Carolina. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/8/2012. (SKH)
March 8, 2012 781 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 775 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on motion to continue The Receivers Notice Of Selection Of Appraiser Pursuant To Court Order Dated March 2, 2012 (Smiljanich, Terry)
March 7, 2012 780 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Public Sale of Unencumbered Real Property Located in Raleigh, Wake County, North Carolina by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Sale, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Engagement Letter)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 7, 2012 779 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 778 Motion for extension of time to file response to Motion to Disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel. Deadline extended to 3/14/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/7/2012. (SKH)
March 7, 2012 778 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 766 MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel by Wiand Guerra King P.L., The Securities and Exchange Commission, and by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 2, 2012 777 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Withdrawal of Government Counsel (Cream, Anita)
March 2, 2012 776 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 675 Motion to Approve Determination and Priority of Claims, etc., as provided in the attached order. Ruling reserved on [719 & 740] Motion for Relief from Injunction and Motion regarding filing Proofs of Claim. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/2/2012. (CCB)
March 2, 2012 775 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting in part 739 Motion to Appoint Appraisers and directing filings on 3/9/2012, and denying 765 Motion to Continue Hearing. Responses to 766 Motion to Disqualify due on or before 3/9/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/2/2012. (CCB)
March 2, 2012 774 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2012. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (MSS)
March 1, 2012 773 RESPONSE re 733 Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cream, Anita)
March 1, 2012 772 RESPONSE in opposition re 765 MOTION to continue Hearing Scheduled for March 2, 2012 on Pending Motions filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Masel, Scott)
March 1, 2012 771 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 766 MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel (Of Filing Replacement Exhibit E) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E)(Shaheen, Louis)
March 1, 2012 770 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on Wells Fargo's Motion to Continue on Friday, March 2, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/1/2012. (CCB)
March 1, 2012 769 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Vacate, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Cream, Anita)
March 1, 2012 768 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 757 Response Notice of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Governments Application for an Order Vacating the Preliminary Order of Forfeiture)(Cohen, Jonathan)
March 1, 2012 767 RESPONSE in opposition re 765 MOTION to continue Hearing Scheduled for March 2, 2012 on Pending Motions filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Smiljanich, Terry)
February 29, 2012 766 MOTION to disqualify (I) Receiver, (II) Disqualify Wiand Guerra King, P.L. and (III) Disallow All Fees Payable to the Receiver and His Counsel by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Shaheen, Louis)
February 29, 2012 765 MOTION to continue Hearing Scheduled for March 2, 2012 on Pending Motions by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Shaheen, Louis)
February 29, 2012 764 Featured Case ORDER granting 763 Motion to allow laptop computer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/29/2012. (SKH)
February 28, 2012 763 Unopposed MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically laptop computer for the hearing scheduled on March 2, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
February 28, 2012 762 RESPONSE To Opposition to Late Claim Motion filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
February 28, 2012 761 NOTICE by LandMark Bank of Florida of Intent to Rely on Briefs (Hoeck, Kathryn)
February 27, 2012 760 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 759 Motion for Leave to File on or before Tuesday, February 28, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/27/2012. (CCB)
February 27, 2012 759 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file To File Reply To Receiver's Opposition (Doc. No. 755) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
February 24, 2012 758 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Davis on behalf of Burton W. Wiand (Davis, Megan)
February 23, 2012 757 RESPONSE re 733 Order Receiver's Memorandum on Jurisdiction and Response to Wells Fargo Bank and Trste's Memorandum on Jurisdiction filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Cohen, Jonathan)
February 23, 2012 756 DECLARATION of of Jonathan Cohen in Support of the Receiver's Opposition to Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (I) for Determination That the Filing of Proofs of Claim Herein Is Not Necessary to Preserve Secured Creditors' Valid State Law Security Interests In, and Claims Against, Collateral in the Receiver's Possession, or in the Alternative, (II) for Leave to File Late Claims re 755 Response in opposition to motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Cohen, Jonathan)
February 23, 2012 755 RESPONSE in opposition to Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (I) for Determination re Proofs of Claims filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2)(Cohen, Jonathan)
February 23, 2012 754 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 751 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Neil V. Moody in connection with 8:10-cv-249-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/23/2012. (CCB)
February 23, 2012 753 RESPONSE re 745 Response, 733 Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Masel, Scott)
February 23, 2012 752 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 750 Motion to extend time to file memo. Deadline extended to 3/1/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/23/2012. (SKH)
February 22, 2012 751 MOTION to Approve Settlement by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 22, 2012 750 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file Memorandum by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Cream, Anita)
February 22, 2012 749 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Cream on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Cream, Anita)
February 14, 2012 748 NOTICE of compliance re 741 Order and Counter-Submission of Appraisers by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite A)(Wirth, Steven)
February 14, 2012 747 NOTICE of compliance re 739 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Appoint Appraisers Receivers Motion to Appoint AppraisersPursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2001 to Appraise Receivership Real Property In Graham, North Carolina, 741 Order Local Rule 3.01(G) Certification For Docket Entry #739 by Burton W. Wiand (Keefe, Sean)
February 13, 2012 746 LETTER to the Court dated 2/7/12from Diane Pezick (JLH)
February 13, 2012 745 RESPONSE re 733 Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Barnett, Ana)
February 13, 2012 744 JUDGMENT per settlement agreement order at doc. 742. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLH)
February 10, 2012 743 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED directing the Receiver to Respond to docket 740 on or before 2/23/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/10/2012. (CCB)
February 10, 2012 742 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 679 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement With Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. See written order for complete details. Clerk is directed to enter the order as a final judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/10/2012. (DMB)
February 9, 2012 741 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED regarding obligations of attorneys with regard to motion to appoint appraisers at docket 739. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/9/2012. (CCB)
February 8, 2012 740 MOTION for leave to file To File Late Claims (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (1) For Determination that the filing of Proofs of Claim Herein is not Necessary to Preserve Secured Creditors' Valid State Law Security Interests In, and Claims against, Collateral In the Receiver's Possession or, In the Alternative, (ii) For Leave to File Late Claims Pursuant to FRCP 60(b) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Composite Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Composite Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Comosite Exh. D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Wirth, Steven)
February 8, 2012 739 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Appoint Appraisers pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2001 to Appraise Receivership Real Property In Graham, North Carolina by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Qualifications of Thomas J. Skeahan, # 2 Exhibit B - Qualifications of Roscoe W. Shiplett, # 3 Exhibit C - Qualifications of Mark A. Morgan)(Keefe, Sean)
February 7, 2012 738 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Sean P. Keefe on behalf of Burton W. Wiand (Keefe, Sean)
February 7, 2012 737 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Jonathan Betten Cohen on behalf of Burton W. Wiand (Cohen, Jonathan)
February 6, 2012 736 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Terry Alan Smiljanich on behalf of Burton W. Wiand (Smiljanich, Terry)
February 6, 2012 735 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED setting all objections to docket 675 for oral argument on March 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/6/2012. (CCB)
February 3, 2012 734 NOTICE of Hearing on 675 Unopposed Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, and (4) Establish Objection Procedure, set for 3/2/2012 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
February 3, 2012 733 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED setting hearing on docket 675 and ordering briefing schedule. The Clerk is directed to serve copies of this order in accordance with the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/3/2012. (CCB)
February 2, 2012 732 AFFIDAVIT of Burton W. Wiand re: 731 Reply to response to motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
February 2, 2012 731 REPLY to response to motion re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 2, 2012 730 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of Filing letter from the Receiver to the Court relating to matters between the Receivership in this case and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Morello, Gianluca)
February 1, 2012 729 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand re 728 Response in opposition to motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
February 1, 2012 728 RESPONSE in opposition re 719 MOTION to compel (Receiver to Abandon The Property Located at 841 South Main Street, Graham, North Carolina) filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 24, 2012 727 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing Receiver to file an expedited response to 719 Motion to Compel Receiver to Abandon The Property Located at 841 South Main Street, Graham, North Carolina)on or before 2/1/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/24/2012. (CCB)
January 24, 2012 726 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 706 Verified Motion to Approve the Sale of Real Property in Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/24/2012. (CCB)
January 23, 2012 725 NOTICE of compliance re 698 Order by Securities and Exchange Commission (Masel, Scott)
January 23, 2012 724 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 723 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/23/2012. (CCB)
January 23, 2012 723 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file to respond to objections to motion to approve settlement (Doc. 679) with Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
January 23, 2012 722 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting [720 & 721] Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/23/2012. (CCB)
January 20, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Howard Schiffman appearing on behalf of Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA9312.) (JNB)
January 20, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Eric A. Bensky appearing on behalf of Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA9312.) (JNB)
January 20, 2012 721 MOTION for Eric A. Bensky to appear pro hac vice by Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.. (Weber, Janelle)
January 20, 2012 720 MOTION for Howard Schiffman to appear pro hac vice by Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.. (Weber, Janelle)
January 19, 2012 719 MOTION to compel (Receiver to Abandon The Property Located at 841 South Main Street, Graham, North Carolina) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exh. A)(Shaheen, Louis)
January 19, 2012 718 OBJECTION re 706 Verified MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve the Sale of Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shaheen, Louis)
January 18, 2012 717 Featured Case ORDER granting 697 Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/18/2012. (see order for details) (MSS)
January 18, 2012 716 RESPONSE in opposition re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") filed by Marty Huppert. (Hightower, John)
January 17, 2012 715 RESPONSE in opposition re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") filed by Vernon M. Lee, Brian L. Meeker, Samuel Ross Morgan III. (Hightower, John)
January 17, 2012 714 REPLY to response to motion re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure Reply to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Objection to Receiver's Motion to Approve Determination and Priority of Claims (Doc. 689) filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 17, 2012 713 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 712 Reply to response to motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Part 1 of 2, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Part 2 of 2, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 17, 2012 712 REPLY to response to motion re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure Reply to TRSTE, Inc.'s and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Objection and Opposition to Receiver's Motion to Approve Determination and Priority of Claims (Doc. 690) filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
January 17, 2012 711 OBJECTION re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") by Tyna Gaylor. (JLH)
January 17, 2012 710 OBJECTION re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") by Diane Pezick. (JLH)
January 17, 2012 709 OBJECTION re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") by Kelvin V. Lee, Trustee, Nancy Lee Trust (JLH)
January 17, 2012 708 OBJECTION re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") by Kelvin V. Lee. (JLH)
January 9, 2012 707 OBJECTION re 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") filed by Barbara Meeker. (JLH)
January 6, 2012 706 Verified MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve the Sale of Real Property Located In Graham, Alamance County, North Carolina by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2-Agreement of Sale of Purchase, # 3 Exhibit 3-SEC v. Mutual Benefits Corp. Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
January 5, 2012 705 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Kalish on behalf of YMCA Foundation of Sarasota, Inc. (Kalish, Carol)
January 5, 2012 704 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Michael Eckhardt on behalf of Fulcrum Distressed Opportunities Fund I, LP (Eckhardt, Kevin)
January 5, 2012 703 NOTICE of compliance re 698 Order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A. (Berkowitz, Julie)
January 4, 2012 702 NOTICE of compliance re 698 Order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A. (Barnett, Ana)
January 4, 2012 701 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fishman Berkowitz on behalf of TRSTE, Inc. (Berkowitz, Julie)
January 4, 2012 700 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fishman Berkowitz on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A. (Berkowitz, Julie)
January 3, 2012 699 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of Publication of Receiver's Court-Approved Notice of Settlement with GSEC (Morello, Gianluca)
January 3, 2012 698 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER ENDORSED ORDER that pursuant to the USDC - Middle District of Florida's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases, Section I(A) "... all documents filed in civil and criminal cases in this District... shall be filed electronically." Therefore, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that counsel of record in this case shall register for CM/ECF, enter an email address in their CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order within 30 days. Failure to comply with this Order as directed will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. If counsel is an out of state attorney who needs to apply to be admitted pro hac vice in this case, the motion to appear pro hac vice and designation of local counsel (pursuant to Local Rule 2.02), the special admission form and appropriate fee shall be submitted to the Court before CM/ECF access will be granted. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/3/2012. (DMB)
December 28, 2011 697 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Unopposed Tenth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Receiver's Tenth Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 3-Scoop Receivership-Rep of Scoop Receivership, # 4 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-HFH v. B. Bishop, # 5 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 6 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 7 Exhibit 7-Scoop Receivership-Holland & Knight, # 8 Exhibit 8-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 9 Exhibit 9-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 10 Exhibit 10-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 11 Exhibit 11-Fowler White, # 12 Exhibit 12-Scoop Legal Team-HFH v. B. Bishop, # 13 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-Carolina Mtn Land Conservancy, # 14 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 15 Exhibit 15-Johnson, Pope, # 16 Exhibit 16-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 17 Exhibit 17-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 18 Exhibit 18-Scoop Legal Team-Holland & Knight, # 19 Exhibit 19-PDR, # 20 Exhibit 20-Riverside Financial Group, # 21 Exhibit 21-E-Hounds, Inc., # 22 Exhibit 22-RWJ Group, LLC, # 23 Exhibit 23-Wheeler, Fairman & Kelley, # 24 Exhibit 24-Leonard Starr, PC, # 25 Exhibit 25-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 27, 2011 696 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 691 Motion to Retain the James Hoyer law firm. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/27/2011. (CCB)
December 27, 2011 695 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting [693 & 694] Motion for Leave to File Reply on or before January 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/27/2011. (CCB)
December 23, 2011 694 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply To TRSTE, Inc.'s And Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s (As Successor To Wachovia Bank, N.A.) Objection Relating To Laurel Mountain, N.C., Property by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 23, 2011 693 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply To Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s (as Successor To Wachovia Bank, N.A.) Objection Relating To Claim Relating To Loan On Graham, N.C. Building by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 22, 2011 692 RESPONSE re 677 Objection filed by LandMark Bank filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 22, 2011 691 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for leave to retain the James Hoyer law firm to pursue claims against Wachovia Bank, N.A. n/k/a Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Contingency Fee Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 21, 2011 690 RESPONSE in opposition re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure Objection and Opposition to Receiver's Motion to Approve Determination and Priority of Claims and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by TRSTE, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of TRSTE, Inc. records custodian, # 2 Exhibit Receiver's February 6, 2009 letter, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Mayda Nahhas, # 4 Exhibit SDNY Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Final Order of Forfeiture, # 5 Exhibit SDNY Indictment, # 6 Exhibit Declaration of W. Samuel Woodard, Esq.)(Barnett, Ana)
December 21, 2011 689 OBJECTION re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure (Objection and Memorandum of Law) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wirth, Steven)
December 21, 2011 688 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana T. Barnett on behalf of TRSTE, Inc. (Barnett, Ana)
December 20, 2011 687 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana T. Barnett on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor by merger to Wachovia Bank, N.A. (Barnett, Ana)
December 16, 2011 686 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand Of Mailing Court-Approved Notice Of Settlement With GSEC (Morello, Gianluca)
December 15, 2011 685 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Tenth Interim Report (5/1/11 - 11/30/11) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Standardized Fund Accounting Report (5/1/11 to 8/31/11), # 2 Exhibit B-Standardized Fund Accounting Report (9/1/11-11/30/11), # 3 Exhibit C-C. Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 15, 2011 684 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 683 Motion for Leave to File Response to Landmark Bank's Objection within seven (7) days. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/15/2011. (CCB)
December 15, 2011 683 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file to Respond to LandMark Bank's Objection to Proposed Objection Procedure by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 14, 2011 682 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 681 Motion to Approve Proposed Notice of Settlement. The proposed Notice to Investors and Others attached as Exhibit A to the motion, the procedures outlined in the exhibit and motion, and the proposed Short Form Notice are hereby approved, and the Receiver may provide notice accordingly. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/14/2011. (CCB)
December 14, 2011 681 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve proposed notice of settlement relating to Docket 679 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 14, 2011 680 AFFIDAVIT of Burton W. Wiand re: 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC")Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 14, 2011 679 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement regarding Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P. ("GSEC") by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - CFTC v. Equity Fin. Grp., Rec's Memo of Law, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 13, 2011 678 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure Of Mailing Letters To Claimants Providing Notice Of Motion And Other Claims Information (Morello, Gianluca)
December 13, 2011 677 OBJECTION re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure. (Hoeck, Kathryn)
December 9, 2011 676 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection ProcedureUnopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure of Filing Amended Exhibits B & I (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Doc. 675 - Amended Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit 675 - Amended Exhibit I)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 8, 2011 Sealed document S-4. (BSN)
December 7, 2011 675 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Determination And Priority Of Claims, (2) Pool Receivership Assets And Liabilities, (3) Approve Plan Of Distribution, And (4) Establish Objection Procedure by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Blank Proof of Claim Form, # 2 Exhibit B - Investor Claims - Allowed, # 3 Exhibit C - Tax Lien Claims - Allowed, # 4 Exhibit D - Investor Claims - Allowed In Part, # 5 Exhibit E - Non-Investor Secured Claims - Allowed In Part, # 6 Exhibit F -Non-Investor Unsecured Claims - Allowed And Allowed In Part, # 7 Exhibit G - Investor Claims - Denied, # 8 Exhibit H - Secured and Unsecured Non-Investor Claims - Denied, # 9 Exhibit I - Investor Claims - Waived, # 10 Exhibit J - Non-Investor Claims - Waived, # 11 Exhibit K - SEC v. Mutual Benefits Corp. Order 10-23-08, # 12 Exhibit L - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 30, 2011 674 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 673 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/30/2011. (CCB)
November 30, 2011 673 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document specifically, to seal document containing identity of claimants by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
November 22, 2011 672 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 671 Receiver's Motion for Permission to Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/22/2011. (CCB)
November 22, 2011 671 Second MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Permission to Appeal by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Munson Order (206), # 2 Exhibit B - Munson Family Ptrs Order (221), # 3 Exhibit C - Wang Order (112), # 4 Exhibit D - Rec's Obj to Pizzo's R&R)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 21, 2011 670 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of No Objection to the Receiver Taking an Appeal of the September 29, 2011 Arbitration Order (Masel, Scott)
October 31, 2011 669 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 668 Motion for Permission to Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/31/2011. (SKH)
October 31, 2011 668 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Permission to Appeal by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, # 2 Exhibit B-Case List, # 3 Exhibit C-Receiver's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation)(Morello, Gianluca)
October 26, 2011 667 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Status Conference held on 10/26/2011. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
October 24, 2011 666 NOTICE of Status Conference set for 10/26/2011 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. Counsel for the SEC may appear telephonically. (CCB)
October 20, 2011 665 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 664 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/20/2011. (CCB)
October 20, 2011 664 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages in connection with the Claims Determination Motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
October 18, 2011 663 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 662 Receiver's Second Motion to Approve Settlement with Steven Settlage associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-136-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/18/2011. (CCB)
October 18, 2011 662 Second MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Steven Settlage by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
October 18, 2011 661 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 660 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Barbara Davis associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-2152-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/18/2011. (CCB)
October 18, 2011 660 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Barbara Davis et al. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
October 6, 2011 659 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 658 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Steven Settlage and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-136-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/6/2011. (CCB)
October 5, 2011 658 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Steven Settlage by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 23, 2011 657 Featured Case ORDER granting 652 Unopposed Receiver's Ninth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and his Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/23/2011. (SKH)
September 22, 2011 656 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 655 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Jewish Family and Children's Service of Sarasota-Manatee, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/22/2011. (CCB)
September 22, 2011 655 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Jewish Family and Children's Service of Sarasota-Manatee, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 21, 2011 654 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 653 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with EFG Bank and associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-242-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/21/2011. (CCB)
September 21, 2011 653 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: EFG Bank and John or Jane Doe by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 14, 2011 652 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Unopposed Ninth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Receiver's 9th Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 3-Scoop Receivership-Rep of Scoop Receivership, # 4 Exhibit 4-Scoop Receivership-Carolina Mtn Land Conservancy, # 5 Exhibit 5-Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 6 Exhibit 6-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 7 Exhibit 7-Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 8 Exhibit 8-Scoop Receivership-Holland & Knight, # 9 Exhibit 9-Categorization and Summary of WGK Costs, # 10 Exhibit 10-Attorney Fee Schedule, # 11 Exhibit 11-Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 12 Exhibit 12-Fowler White, # 13 Exhibit 13-Scoop Legal Team-HFH v. B. Bishop, # 14 Exhibit 14-Scoop Legal Team-Carolina Mtn Land Conservancy, # 15 Exhibit 15-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 16 Exhibit 16-Johnson, Pope, # 17 Exhibit 17-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from N. and C. Moody, # 18 Exhibit 18-Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 19 Exhibit 19-Scoop Legal Team-Holland & Knight, # 20 Exhibit 20-PDR, # 21 Exhibit 21-E-Hounds, # 22 Exhibit 22-The RWJ Group, LLC, # 23 Exhibit 23-Cheney, Brock & Saudek, P.C., # 24 Exhibit 24-Goosmann Rose Colvard & Cramer, P.A., # 25 Exhibit 25-Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 6, 2011 651 Featured Case ORDER granting 650 Unopposed Verified Motion for approval of sale of real property located in Lorain County, Ohio. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/6/2011. (MSS)
September 2, 2011 650 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Sale of Real Property Located in Lorain County, Ohio by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Quit-Claim Deed, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Purchase and Sale Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 12, 2011 649 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 648 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Betty Bry Schwab, Roger Schwab, Mayfair Associates, Inc. et al., associated with case nos. 8:10-cv-179-T-17MAP and 8:10-cv-226-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/12/2011. (CCB)
August 12, 2011 648 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Mayfair Associates (179) and Betty Bry Schwab, as Trustee of the Betty Bry Schwab Revocable Trust (226) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 21, 2011 647 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Ninth Interim Report (1/1/11 - 4/30/11) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - C. Moody's Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 8, 2011 646 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 645 Unopposed Receiver's Eighth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/8/2011. (SKH)
June 30, 2011 645 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Unopposed Eighth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 20, 2011 644 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 643 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Renee G. Sheade, as Trustee of the Martin D. Sheade, M.D. Trust (Case No: 8:10-cv-215-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/20/2011. (SKH)
June 20, 2011 643 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Renee G. Sheade, as Trustee of the Martin D. Sheade, M.D. Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 13, 2011 642 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 641 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with David H. Boshart associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-74-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/13/2011. (CCB)
June 13, 2011 641 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: David H. Boshart by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 10, 2011 640 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 639 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Wells Fargo Securities International Ltd. and Carrelage Multi-Strategy Offshore Fund, Ltd. associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-243-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/10/2011. (CCB)
June 9, 2011 639 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Wells Fargo Securities International, Ltd. f/k/a Wachovia Securities International, Ltd. and Carrelage Multi-Strategy Offshore Fund, Ltd. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 9, 2011 638 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 637 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Bradford Black associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-77-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/9/2011. (CCB)
June 8, 2011 637 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Bradford Black by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 3, 2011 636 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 635 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with John Grier Construction Co. and Joseph S. Terrell, et al., associated with Case Nos. 8:10-cv-111-T-17MAP and 8:10-cv-238-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/3/2011. (CCB)
June 3, 2011 635 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: John Grier Construction Co. and Joseph S. Terrell, Jr., et al. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 26, 2011 634 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 632 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Lee and Donald Douglas. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/26/2011. (CCB)
May 26, 2011 633 Featured Case ORDER granting 631 Receiver's Unopposed Motion convey certain business assets and real property. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/26/2011. (see order) (MSS)
May 25, 2011 632 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Lee and Donald Douglas by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 25, 2011 631 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Convey Certain Business Assets and Real Property Located at 599 Lime Avenue, Sarasota, Florida 34237 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 18, 2011 630 Featured Case ORDER granting 629 Unopposed Verified Motion for approval of sale of real property located on North Jefferson Avenue in Sarasota County, Florida. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/18/2011. (MSS)
May 18, 2011 629 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Sale of Real Property Located on North Jefferson Avenue in Sarasota County, Florida by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
May 4, 2011 628 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 627 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Sam Richter associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-1114-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/4/2011. (CCB)
May 4, 2011 627 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Sam Richter by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 2, 2011 626 Featured Case ORDER granting 625 Unopposed Motion for limited relief from injunction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2011. (MSS)
April 29, 2011 625 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Limited Relief from Injunction by Richard T. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gaskill, Jason)
April 26, 2011 624 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 622 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Vivian K. Kouvant associated with Case No.8:10-cv-225-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/26/2011. (CCB)
April 26, 2011 623 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 621 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Tracy Becker, et al., associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-76-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/26/2011. (CCB)
April 26, 2011 622 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Vivian K. Kouvant by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Vivian K. Kouvant Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 26, 2011 621 MOTION to Approve Settlement re Tracy Becker by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Tracy Becker Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 25, 2011 620 Featured Case ORDER granting 619 Motion for approval of sale of undeveloped land located in Grady County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/25/2011. (MSS)
April 25, 2011 619 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval of Sale of Undeveloped Land Located in Grady County, Georgia by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Purchase and Sale Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 21, 2011 618 Featured Case ORDER granting 617 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval to Serve Proposals for Settlement in Connection with Ancillary Actions by Burton W. Wiand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/21/2011. (SKH)
April 20, 2011 617 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Approval to Serve Proposals for Settlement in Connection with Ancillary Actions by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Template of a Proposal for Settlement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 20, 2011 616 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven R. Wirth on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Wirth, Steven)
April 4, 2011 615 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 614 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Carolina Mountain Land Conservancy associated with Case no. 8:09-cv-2443-T-27MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/4/2011. (CCB)
April 1, 2011 614 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Carolina Mountain Land Conservancy by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 30, 2011 613 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 612 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Tracy G. Becker, Sharon Reisdorf, Cynthia Baschmann, and Scott Becker associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-76-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/30/2011. (CCB)
March 30, 2011 612 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Tracy G. Becker, Sharon Reisdorf, Cynthia Baschmann, and Scott Becker by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
March 23, 2011 611 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 610 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Chester Trachtenberg, Foxhaven, LLC, as successor in interest of Ouisa, LLC, and Cherrytoes, LLC, as successor in interest of Beatrice, LLC, (Case No.: 8:10-cv-1257-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/23/2011. (SKH)
March 22, 2011 610 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Chester Trachtenberg, Foxhaven, LLC, as successor in interest of Ouisa, LLC, and Cherrytoes, LLC, as successor in interest of Beatrice, LLC by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
March 14, 2011 609 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Eighth Interim Report (10/1/10-12/31/10) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - C. Moody Spreadsheet)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 11, 2011 608 Featured Case ORDER granting 607 Receiver's Unopposed Motion to approve sale of jewelry by public auction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/11/2011. (MSS)
March 10, 2011 607 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve Sale of Jewelry by Public Auction by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Description of Jewelry, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 10, 2011 606 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 605 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and James River Diversified Fund, L.P. (Case No: 10-cv-90-T-17MAP), James River Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P., and Paul Saunders (Case No: 10-cv-159-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/10/2011. (SKH)
March 9, 2011 605 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: James River Diversified Fund, L.P., James River Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P., and Paul Saunders by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Executed Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit C - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
March 7, 2011 604 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 603 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with James LeTellier associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-2150-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/7/2011. (CCB)
March 7, 2011 603 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: James LeTellier by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
February 22, 2011 602 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 600 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Michael Corcione associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-234-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/22/2011. (CCB)
February 22, 2011 601 Featured Case ORDER granting 599 Motion approve the Sale of Real Property located at 2433 West Main Street, Tupelo, Lee County, Mississippi 38801; See order for further details.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/22/2011. (JLH)
February 21, 2011 600 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Michael Corcione by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
February 18, 2011 599 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically approve the Sale of Real Property located at 2433 West Main Street, Tupelo, Lee County, Mississippi 38801 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
February 1, 2011 598 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 597 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Paul Farley associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-145-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/1/2011. (CCB)
February 1, 2011 597 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Paul Farley by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 27, 2011 596 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 595 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Eric A. Kaye associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-132-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/27/2011. (CCB)
January 26, 2011 595 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Eric A. Kaye by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 26, 2011 594 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 593 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Richard Fagin, individually and as Trustee of the Richard Fagin Trust 1994 associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-183-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/26/2011. (CCB)
January 25, 2011 593 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Richard Fagin, individually and as Trustee of the Richard Fagin Trust 1994 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 19, 2011 592 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 591 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Lobdell Multi-Focus Fund, L.P. associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-129-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/19/2011. (CCB)
January 19, 2011 591 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Lobdell Multi-Focus Fund, L.P. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 18, 2011 590 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 589 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with James A.W. Cook associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-94-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/18/2011. (CCB)
January 18, 2011 589 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: James A.W. Cook by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 12, 2011 588 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying as moot 587 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/12/2011. (CCB)
January 11, 2011 587 MOTION to quash Subpoena by D&E Unit Trust Associates, Carrelage Multi-Strategy Offshore Fund, Ltd., David Ehrlich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Holmes, David)
January 10, 2011 586 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 585 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Albert R. Gaskill, Jr., as Trustee of the Albar Management Profit Sharing Plan & Trust dtd 08/82 associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-143-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/10/2011. (CCB)
January 10, 2011 585 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Albert R. Gaskill, Jr., as Trustee of the Albar Management Profit Sharing Plan & Trust dtd 08/82 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
January 5, 2011 584 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 583 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Mark A. Timmick and Winners Circle Fund, L.P., associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-201-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/5/2011. (CCB)
January 5, 2011 583 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Mark A. Timmick and Winners Circle Fund, L.P. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lamont, Michael)
December 17, 2010 582 Featured Case ORDER granting 577 Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/17/2010. (MSS)
December 16, 2010 581 Featured Case ORDER granting 580 Unopposed Verified Motion to approve the sale of 1978 Cessna 152 Aircraft. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/16/2010. (MSS)
December 16, 2010 580 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Approve the Sale of 1978 Cessna 152 Aircraft by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 16, 2010 579 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 578 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Gary Hill, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-109-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/16/2010. (CCB)
December 15, 2010 578 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Gary Hill by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 15, 2010 577 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Unopposed Seventh Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Receiver's Seventh Interim Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Scoop Receivership-Representation of Scoop Receivership, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Scoop Receivership-Recovery from Investors, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Assets from N and C Moody, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Scoop Receivership-Recovery of Commissions, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Scoop Receivership-Holland & Knight, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Categorization and Summary of All Costs Incurred By WGK, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Attorney Fee Schedule, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Scoop Legal Team-Scoop Capital, LLC Receivership, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Fowler White Invoice, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Scoop Legal Team-HFH v. Bishop, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Scoop Legal Team-Carolina Mtn Land Conservancy, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Scoop Legal Team-Recovery from Investors, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Johnson Pope Invoice, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Assets from N and C Moody, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Scoop Legal Team-Recovery of Commissions, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Scoop Legal Team-Holland & Knight, # 19 Exhibit 19 - PDR Invoices, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Riverside Financial Group Invoices, # 21 Exhibit 21 - E-Hounds, Inc. Invoices, # 22 Exhibit 22 - The RWJ Group, LLC Invoices, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 14, 2010 576 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 575 Motion regarding Mediator Fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/14/2010. (CCB)
December 13, 2010 575 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for leave to pay the mediator fees for the clawback mediations already conducted, and for those yet to be conducted, directly from funds in the Receivership Estate by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 13, 2010 574 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 572 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with KeyBank National Association f/k/a Key Trust Compnay of Ohio, N.A. as Trustee of the William H. Price, II Revocable Dynasty Trust, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-178-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/13/2010. (CCB)
December 13, 2010 573 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 571 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Stanley W. Mason, Jr.; Stanley W. Mason Jr. and Doris A. Mason as Trustees; and the Mason Family Limited Partnership associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-219-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/13/2010. (CCB)
December 10, 2010 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 537 Order on Motion to Approve Settlement, 539 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 538 Order on Motion to Approve Settlement. Address update per information on BOP website. Mail resent to Arthur Nadel. (CD)
December 10, 2010 572 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: KeyBank National Association f/k/a Key Trust Company of Ohio, N.A. as Trustee of the William H. Price, II Revocable Dynasty Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 10, 2010 571 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Stanley W. Mason, Jr., individually, Stanley W. Mason, Jr. and Doris A. Mason, as Trustees of the Stanley W. Mason, Jr. and Doris A. Mason Trust Agreement u/a/d September 24, 1998, and the Mason Family Limited Partnership by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 10, 2010 570 NOTICE canceling motion hearing scheduled for 12/13/2010 (MSS)
December 10, 2010 569 Featured Case ORDER denying 544 Motion for protective order. Mr. Rowe to produce records to receiver on or before 1/3/2011; granting 562 Motion to withdraw as attorney. The firm of Bush Ross, P.A., are relieved of any further responsibility to represent Mr. and Mrs. Rowe and their related entities in this action; denying as moot 563 Motion to stay. The Court has given Mr. Rowe ample time to hire new counsel before having to produce the subpoenaed records. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/10/2010. (SKH)
December 10, 2010 568 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2010 re 544 MOTION for protective order, 563 MOTION to stay Deadlines re 562 , MOTION for Edward O. Savitz, Anne-Leigh Gaylord Moe, Karen S. Cox to withdraw as attorney. Court Reporter: Janie Gibbs (MSS)
December 9, 2010 567 RESPONSE in opposition re 544 MOTION for protective order filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Formica v. Rowe et al., Motion to Dismiss)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 9, 2010 566 RESPONSE in opposition re 563 MOTION to stay Deadlines re 562 MOTION for Edward O. Savitz, Anne-Leigh Gaylord Moe, Karen S. Cox to withdraw as attorney filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
December 8, 2010 565 NOTICE of Hearing on 563 Motion to Stay Deadlines and 562 Motion for Edward O. Savitz, Anne-Leigh Gaylord Moe, Karen S. Cox to withdraw as attorney set for Friday, 12/10/2010 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
December 8, 2010 564 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED regarding motions to withdraw and stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/8/2010. (CCB)
December 7, 2010 563 MOTION to stay Deadlines re 562 MOTION for Edward O. Savitz, Anne-Leigh Gaylord Moe, Karen S. Cox to withdraw as attorney by Donald H. Rowe. (Moe, Anne-Leigh)
December 7, 2010 562 MOTION for Edward O. Savitz, Anne-Leigh Gaylord Moe, Karen S. Cox to withdraw as attorney by Donald H. Rowe. (Moe, Anne-Leigh)
December 7, 2010 561 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 557 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Merlyn W.V. Lofgren, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-168-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/7/2010. (CCB)
December 7, 2010 560 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 556 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Kathy C. Humpert, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-2166-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/7/2010. (CCB)
December 7, 2010 559 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 555 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Randie Ekenberg, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-2144-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/7/2010. (CCB)
December 6, 2010 558 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 554 Motion to withdraw as attorney by Mark D. Hildreth. The clerk is directed to remove Mr. Hildreth from electronic notice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/6/2010. (SKH)
December 6, 2010 557 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Merlyn W.V. Lofgren by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
December 6, 2010 556 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Kathy C. Humpert by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 6, 2010 555 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Randie Ekenberg, et al. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 6, 2010 554 MOTION for Mark D. Hildreth to withdraw as attorney and Request to Stop Electronic Notice by City of Venice. (Hildreth, Mark)
December 3, 2010 553 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED supplementing order at docket 548. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/3/2010. (CCB)
December 2, 2010 552 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 547 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Wing Y. Chin and Margaret Chin, as Co-Trustees of the Wing Y. and Margaret Chin Revocable Trust (Case No: 8:10-cv-158-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/2/2010. (SKH)
December 2, 2010 551 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 546 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Henry A. Stumpf, John McCord, and Kirk O. Broberg, as Co-Trustees of the Daley Investment Trust (Case No: 8:10-cv-208-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/2/2010. (SKH)
December 2, 2010 550 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 545 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Michael Brown (Case No: 8:10-cv-73-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/2/2010. (SKH)
December 2, 2010 549 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 544 for protective order: Motion Hearing scheduled Monday, December 13, 2010 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (SKH)
December 2, 2010 548 Featured Case ORDER directing Non-Party Rowe to file with this Court on or before 12/6/2010, a detailed privilege log in strict compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with regard to the documents and information he claims are protected from disclosure by either the attorney-client privilege or the work product privilege; and ORDER directing the Receiver to respond to 544 Non-Party Rowe's Motion for Protective Order on or before 12/9/2010. The Court will conduct a hearing on the motion on Monday, December 13, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/2/2010. (SKH)
December 2, 2010 547 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Wing Y. Chin and Margaret Chin, as Co-Trustees of the Wing Y. and Margaret Chin Revocable Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 2, 2010 546 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Henry A. Stumpf, John McCord, and Kirk O. Broberg, as Co-Trustees of the Daley Investment Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 2, 2010 545 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Michael Brown by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
December 2, 2010 544 MOTION for protective order by Donald H. Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Rowe's Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 2 to Rowe's Motion for Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Rowe's Motion for Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Rowe's Motion for Protective Order)(Moe, Anne-Leigh)
December 1, 2010 543 INCORRECT EVENT CODE; COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE** NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Venice Notice of Withdrawal from Case (Hildreth, Mark) Modified on 12/1/2010 (JLH).
November 22, 2010 542 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice 541 Motion to Quash and directing Rowe to comply with the subpoena no later than noon 12/6/2010. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/22/2010. (CCB)
November 19, 2010 541 MOTION to quash Subpoena by Donald H. Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Quash Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Motion to Quash Subpoena, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Motion to Quash Subpoena)(Savitz, Edward)
November 18, 2010 540 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Seventh Interim Report (5/1/10-9/30/10) by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Summary of C. Moody Assets)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 18, 2010 539 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 534 Receiver's Unopposed Motion to Relinquish Possession of Certain Artistic Prints. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/18/2010. (DMB)
November 18, 2010 538 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 536 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Richard Moore associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-209-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/18/2010. (CCB)
November 18, 2010 537 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 535 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Jeffrey Wilson associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-113-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/18/2010. (CCB)
November 17, 2010 536 Second MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Richard Moore by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 17, 2010 535 Second MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Jeffrey Wilson by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 17, 2010 534 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Relinquish Possession of Certain Artistic Prints by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A-Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A-Part 4, # 5 Exhibit B-Appraisal, # 6 Exhibit C)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 17, 2010 533 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 532 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Mark Neubiesser associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-133-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/17/2010. (CCB)
November 17, 2010 532 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Mark Neubiesser by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 9, 2010 531 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (521). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Jeffrey Wilson. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (SKH)
November 9, 2010 530 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (520). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Richard Moore. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (SKH)
November 9, 2010 529 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (519). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Richard Moore, Thomas Moore, Richard DiBerardo, as Co-Trustees of the Family Trust u/w Reverly A. Moore. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (SKH)
November 9, 2010 528 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver s Motion to Approve Settlement (518). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Gaylord Brooks Investment, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (SKH)
November 9, 2010 527 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 524 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Nicholas Lombardozzi and Lisa Lombardozzi associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-70-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (CCB)
November 9, 2010 526 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 523 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Kathryn H. Scribner associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-131-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (CCB)
November 9, 2010 525 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 522 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Currituck Capital, LLC, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-93-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2010. (CCB)
November 8, 2010 524 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Nicholas Lombardozzi and Lisa Lombardozzi by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 523 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Kathryn H. Scribner by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 522 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Currituck Capital, LLC by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 521 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Jeffrey Wilson by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 520 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Richard Moore by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 519 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Richard Moore, Thomas Moore, and Richard DiBerardo, as Co-Trustees of the Family Trust u/w Reverly A. Moore by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 518 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Gaylord Brooks Investment, LLC by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 8, 2010 517 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 516 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Sharon G. Moody, individually and as Trustee of the Sharon G. Moody Revocable Trust, associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-249-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/8/2010. (CCB)
November 5, 2010 516 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Sharon Moody, individually and as Trustee of the Sharon G. Moody Revocable Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Morello, Gianluca)
November 3, 2010 515 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 513 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Ronald Thauer associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-124-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/3/2010. (CCB)
November 3, 2010 514 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 512 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Yaz Bilimoria associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-78-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/3/2010. (CCB)
November 3, 2010 513 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Ronald Thauer by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
November 3, 2010 512 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Yaz Bilimoria by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
October 29, 2010 511 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 510 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The clerk is directed to term the attorney from the docket. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/29/2010. (CCB)
October 29, 2010 510 MOTION for Gregory P. Brown to withdraw as attorney by Managed Capital, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
October 28, 2010 509 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Status Conference held on 10/28/2010. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (MSS)
October 20, 2010 508 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 506 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Kelvin Lee, et al., associated with Case nos. 8:10-cv-210-T-17MAP, 8:10-cv-211-T-17MAP, and 8:10-cv-251-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/20/2010. (CCB)
October 19, 2010 507 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Yaegers on behalf of LandMark Bank of Florida (Yaegers, Thomas)
October 19, 2010 506 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Kelvin Lee, Individually and as Trustee of the Nancy E. Lee Trust dtd 12/1/1987, and Barbara Lee, Individually by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
October 19, 2010 505 **INCORRECT EVENT CODE; COUNSEL TO REFILE AS A MOTION** NOTICE by Managed Capital, LLC of Intent to Withdraw (Brown, Gregory) Modified on 10/20/2010 (JLH).
October 19, 2010 504 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 503 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Irvin Fagin associated with Case no. 8:10-cv163-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/19/2010. (CCB)
October 19, 2010 503 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Irvin Fagin by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
October 19, 2010 502 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for Thursday, 10/28/2010, at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara.(CCB)
October 19, 2010 501 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 498 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/19/2010. (CCB)
October 19, 2010 500 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 499 Motion for Leave to Agree to Restructuring Transactions with Bonds.com. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/19/2010. (CCB)
October 18, 2010 499 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Agree to Restructuring Transactions with Bonds.com by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
October 15, 2010 498 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Status Conference by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
October 12, 2010 497 Featured Case ORDER granting 496 Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/12/2010. (see order) (MSS)
October 7, 2010 496 Unopposed MOTION for attorney fees Receiver's Unopposed Sixth Interim Motion for Order Awarding Fees, Costs, and Reimbursement of Costs to Receiver and His Professionals by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 24, 2010 495 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (CS)
September 24, 2010 494 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 9/3/10 before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. Court Reporter Claudia Spangler-Fry,Telephone number 813-301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/15/2010, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2010, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2010. (CS)
September 23, 2010 493 Featured Case ORDER Reappointing receiver. (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/23/2010. (JLH)
September 23, 2010 492 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Reappoint Receiver by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order Reappointing Receiver)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 23, 2010 491 Featured Case ORDER granting 490 Motion to approve sale of 1977 Beech Baron B-55 aircraft. The Receiver is hereby authorized to sell. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/23/2010. (JLH)
September 22, 2010 490 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Approve The Sale of 1977 Beech Baron B-55 Aircraft by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 16, 2010 489 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 487 Motion to Approve Settlement with Daniel M. Fraser associated with 8:10-cv-222-T17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/16/2010. (CCB)
September 16, 2010 488 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 486 Motion to Approve Settlement with Gene Muehring and Karel Muehring associated with 8:10-cv-173-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/16/2010. (CCB)
September 15, 2010 487 MOTION to Approve Settlement by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 15, 2010 486 MOTION to Approve Settlement by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
September 14, 2010 485 NOTICE by IBERIABANK to Stop Electronic Notice (Rollins, Traci)
September 8, 2010 484 Featured Case ORDER that in this action, Peg Nadel has sent a letter addressed to the undersigned Judge. Upon review, the document is found to be inappropriate for filing in the following respect(s): Letters Not Accepted/Non-filing with Judge: Matters shall not be addressed or presented to the Court in the form of a letter or the like. All documents, in proper form, shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court and not with the Judge thereof. See Local Rule 3.01(f) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/8/2010. (AG)
September 8, 2010 483 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 482 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/8/2010. (CCB)
September 7, 2010 482 MOTION for protective order, MOTION to quash Subpoena by Marguerite J. Nadel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(RFK)
September 3, 2010 481 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 475 Motion to Compel and denying 479 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/3/2010. (CCB)
September 3, 2010 480 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2010 475 MOTION to compel for Production of Documents in Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena filed by Burton W. Wiand and re 479 MOTION for protective order filed by Donald H. Rowe. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
September 3, 2010 479 MOTION for protective order by Donald H. Rowe. (Cox, Karen)
September 2, 2010 478 Featured Case ORDER that this letter is not accepted and matters shall not be addressed or presented to the court in the form of a letter. Al documents in proper form shall be filed the the clerk and not with the Judgment pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(f). The Clerk is direct to return the above referenced document to the submitting party. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/2/2010. (JLH)
September 1, 2010 477 NOTICE of Expedited Hearing on Motion 475 to Compel Production of Documents in Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena: Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 at 8:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (SKH)
September 1, 2010 476 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing Managed Capital, LLC to file an EXPEDITED RESPONSE to 475 Motion to Compel Production of Documents in Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena. Responses due on or before 12:00 p.m. on 9/2/2010. EXPEDITED HEARING scheduled Friday, September 3, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/1/2010. (SKH)
August 31, 2010 475 MOTION to compel Production of Documents in Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lamont, Michael)
August 31, 2010 474 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) 473 Motion to Compel, directing parties to confer on or before 9/3/2010, and directing the clerk to send copy of attached order to nonparty counsel. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/31/2010. (CCB)
August 31, 2010 473 MOTION to compel Production of Documents in Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)**Attachment A image removed; personal identifiers**(Lamont, Michael) Modified on 9/1/2010 (JLH).
August 31, 2010 472 NOTICE by E. John Lopez, Norton Hammersley Lopez & Skokos and Request to Stop Electronic Notice (Chapman, John)
August 30, 2010 471 Featured Case ORDER/NOTICE canceling pretrial conference scheduled for 12/2/2010 and trial scheduled for 1/3/2011. (SKH)
August 27, 2010 Sealed document S-3 (JLH)
August 27, 2010 Sealed document S-2 (JLH)
August 27, 2010 470 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2010 re 456 MOTION for Hearing and for Instructions filed by E. John Lopez, Norton Hammersley Lopez & Skokos. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
August 23, 2010 469 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 468 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Michael Burgess associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-68-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/23/2010. (CCB)
August 20, 2010 468 MOTION to Approve Settlement by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 19, 2010 467 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 463 Motion for protective order and cancelling hearing scheduled on this motion on 8/27/2010 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/19/2010. (SKH)
August 19, 2010 466 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 463 for Protective Order as to Subpoena Duces Tecum: Motion Hearing scheduled Friday, August 27, 2010 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (SKH)
August 19, 2010 465 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER directing Burton W. Wiand to respond to 463 Non-Party IberiaBank's Objection and Motion for Protective Order as to Subpoena Duces Tecum. Responses due by 8/26/2010 at 12:00 p.m., and scheduling hearing on the Motion on Friday, August 27, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/19/2010. (SKH)
August 18, 2010 464 RESPONSE to motion re 456 MOTION for Hearing and for Instructions filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 18, 2010 463 MOTION for protective order as to Subpoena Duces Tecum, and Supporting Memorandum of Law by IBERIABANK. (Rollins, Traci)
August 18, 2010 462 STATUS REPORT The Receiver's Sixth Interim Report by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 18, 2010 461 JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION and other relief in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Arthur Nadel (Signed by Richard A. Lazzara) (JLH)
August 18, 2010 460 Featured Case JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION and other relief as to Defendant Arthur Nadel. ORDER granting 457 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/18/2010. (See order) (MSS)
August 18, 2010 459 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing scheduled Friday, August 27, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara on Movants' request for in-camera hearing and court instruction. (SKH)
August 18, 2010 458 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 456 Motion for Hearing. Hearing scheduled Friday, August 27, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/18/2010. (SKH)
August 17, 2010 457 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Notice of Filing Consent of Defendant Arthur Nadel by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Consent of Defendant Arthur Nadel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief As to Defendant Arthur Nadel))(Masel, Scott)
August 17, 2010 456 MOTION for Hearing and for Instructions by E. John Lopez, Norton Hammersley Lopez & Skokos. (Chapman, John)
August 11, 2010 455 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Nardella on behalf of LandMark Bank of Florida (Nardella, Michael)
August 9, 2010 454 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 453 Receiver's Motion to Expand Receivership to Include Traders Investment Club. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/9/2010. (CCB)
August 9, 2010 453 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Expand Receivership to Include Traders Investment Club by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Burton Wiand, As Receiver, In Support of Motion to Expand, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Burton Wiand In Support of Motion to Expand)(Morello, Gianluca)
August 4, 2010 452 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 450 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Anton Bruehl, individually and as Trustee of the Bruehl Family Trust. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/4/2010. (CCB)
August 4, 2010 451 Featured Case ORDER granting 449 Motion to approve the Sale of Real property located in Newnan, Coweta County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/4/2010. (JLH)
August 3, 2010 450 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Anton Bruehl, individually and as Trustee of the Bruehl Family Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
August 3, 2010 449 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Approve the Sale of Real Property Located in Newnan, Coweta County, Georgia by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 29, 2010 448 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 445 Receiver's Motion to Approve Exchange of Warrants for Common Shares of Bonds.com. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/29/2010. (CCB)
July 29, 2010 447 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 446 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Stephen Kraus and associated with 8:10-cv-137-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/29/2010. (CCB)
July 29, 2010 446 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Stephen Kraus by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 29, 2010 445 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Approve Exchange of Warrants for Common Stock of Bonds.com by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lamont, Michael)
July 21, 2010 444 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 443 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Caryn Comer associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-207-T-17MAP and with Christopher Comer associated with Case No. 8:10-cv-95-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/21/2010. (CCB)
July 20, 2010 443 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Caryn Comer and Christopher Comer by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 20, 2010 442 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 441 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with James R. Mahoney associated with case no. 8:10-cv-127-T17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/20/2010. (CCB)
July 20, 2010 441 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: James R. Mahoney by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
July 20, 2010 440 Featured Case ORDER that Arthur Nadel and Marguerite Nadel shall cooperate with the Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/20/2010. (See attached order for details)(MSS)
July 19, 2010 439 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying [434 & 437] Motion for Possession of Funds and for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/19/2010. (CCB)
July 19, 2010 438 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/19/2010. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
July 16, 2010 437 SUPPLEMENT re 434 Emergency MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically (1) Possession of Funds and (2) Order to Show Cause As To Why Marguerite Nadel, Michael D. Zucker, and E. John Lopez Should Not Be Held In ContemptEmergency MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically (1) Possession of Funds and (2) Order to Show Cause As To Why Marguerite Nadel, Michael D. Zucker, and E. John Lopez Should Not Be Held In Contempt by Burton W. Wiand. (Lamont, Michael)
July 15, 2010 436 NOTICE OF HEARING: Show Cause Hearing scheduled Monday, July 19, 2010 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 15B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (SKH)
July 15, 2010 435 Featured Case ORDER scheduling hearing on Receiver's Verified Motion for Possession of Funds and Motion for Order to Show Cause. Hearing scheduled 7/19/2010 at 8:30 a.m., 801 N. Florida Ave., Chambers 15B, Tampa, Florida. Receiver: see special mailing instructions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/15/2010. (SKH)
July 15, 2010 434 Emergency MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically (1) Possession of Funds and (2) Order to Show Cause As To Why Marguerite Nadel, Michael D. Zucker, and E. John Lopez Should Not Be Held In Contempt by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 12, 2010 433 Featured Case ORDER granting 432 sale of 1971 Cherokee Piper Aircraft. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/12/2010. (KIT)
July 9, 2010 432 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Approve the Sale of 1971 Cherokee Piper PA-28-140 Aircraft Receiver's Unopposed Verified Motion to Approve the Sale of 1971 Cherokee Piper PA-28-140 Aircraft by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
July 7, 2010 431 Featured Case ORDER granting 430 Motion to depose Arthur Nadel. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/7/2010. (MSS)
July 6, 2010 430 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Defendant by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masel, Scott)
June 26, 2010 429 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (427). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/26/2010. (SKH)
June 26, 2010 428 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (426). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/26/2010. (SKH)
June 25, 2010 427 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Long Island Market Neutral Fund and ABN AMRO Bank N.V. n/k/a The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 25, 2010 426 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: David Cava, as Trustee of the Edmund Cava Trust, et al. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 24, 2010 425 NOTICE cancelling discovery hearing scheduled for Friday, June 25, 2010. (CCB)
June 24, 2010 424 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying 416 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/24/2010. (CCB)
June 23, 2010 423 RESPONSE in opposition re 416 MOTION to quash Receiver's Subpoena to SunTrust Bank and Joining in Receiver's Response filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Masel, Scott)
June 23, 2010 422 NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand of Filing Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo's Order denying Defendants' Motion for entry of a Protective Order in Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Order denying Defendants' Motion for entry of a Protective Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 23, 2010 421 DECLARATION of Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver re 420 Response in opposition to motion by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Morello, Gianluca)
June 23, 2010 420 RESPONSE in opposition re 416 MOTION to quash Receiver's Subpoena to SunTrust Bank filed by Burton W. Wiand. (Morello, Gianluca)
June 21, 2010 419 NOTICE by Donald H. Rowe of Filing Motion for Protective Order in Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Entry of Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit "A" to Motion for Entry of Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit "B" to Motion for Entry of Protective Order)(Cox, Karen)
June 17, 2010 418 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Quash (Dkt. 416) set for Friday, June 25, 2010 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
June 17, 2010 417 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER: The Receiver is directed to file a response to the Motion to Quash (Dkt. 416) on or before June 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/17/2010. (CCB)
June 16, 2010 416 MOTION to quash Receiver's Subpoena to SunTrust Bank by Donald H. Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Moe, Anne-Leigh)
June 14, 2010 415 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 414 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with June Cunningham, individually and as Trustee of the Dale Cunningham Trust. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/14/2010. (CCB)
June 14, 2010 414 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: June Cunningham, individually and as Trustee of the Dale Cunningham Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 11, 2010 413 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 411 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Bruce Wilson and associated with 8:10-cv-115-T17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/11/2010. (CCB)
June 11, 2010 412 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 410 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Jason Investment Co., LLC, and associated with 8:10-cv-87-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/11/2010. (CCB) Modified on 6/11/2010 (CB).
June 11, 2010 411 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Bruce Wilson by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 11, 2010 410 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Jason Investment Co., LLC by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
June 3, 2010 409 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 408 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Wilbur B. Sypherd and Sharon Sypherd, both individually and as Co-Trustees of the Sypherd Revocable Family Trust dated 12/15/89, and associated with case no. 8:10-cv-174-T-17MAP. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/3/2010. (CCB)
June 2, 2010 408 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Wilbur B. Sypherd, individually and as Co-Trustee of the Sypherd Revocable Family Trust Dated 12/15/89, and Sharon Sypherd as Co-Trustee of the Sypherd Revocable Family Trust Dated 12/15/89 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 28, 2010 407 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 406 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Nanette Mock (Case No. 8:10-cv-128-T-17MAP). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/28/2010. (CCB)
May 28, 2010 406 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Nanette Mock by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 26, 2010 405 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (403). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and William Hirons, as Trustee of the William Hirons Revocable Trust. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/26/2010.(SKH)
May 26, 2010 404 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (402). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Jose Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/26/2010. (SKH)
May 25, 2010 403 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: William Hirons, as Trustee of the William Hirons Revocable Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 25, 2010 402 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Jose Rodriguez by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 20, 2010 401 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement 400 . The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Gail Ensinger, as Trustee of the Gail Ensinger Trust. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/20/2010. (SKH)
May 20, 2010 400 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Gail Ensinger, as Trustee of the Gail Ensinger Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
May 17, 2010 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 397 Order on Motion to Approve Settlement. Mail resent to Arthur Nadel. (JLH)
May 12, 2010 399 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 398 the Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Alliance Equities, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/12/2010. (CCB)
May 12, 2010 398 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Alliance Equities, LLC by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement re Alliance Equities, LLC)(Lamont, Michael)
May 3, 2010 397 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 396 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Everett O. Jones as Trustee of the Lucy Lee Jones Trust dtd 2/23/90. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/3/2010. (CCB)
May 3, 2010 396 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Everett O. Jones as trustee of the Lucy Lee Jones Trust dtd 2/23/90 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 23, 2010 395 Featured Case ORDER granting 392 Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/23/2010. (see order) (MSS)
April 23, 2010 394 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (393). The Court approves the written settlement agreement attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and Don Zinman. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/23/2010. (SKH)
April 23, 2010 393 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Don Zinman by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement re Don Zinman)(Lamont, Michael)
April 21, 2010 392 UNOPPOSED FIFTH INTERIM MOTION for order awarding attorney fees, costs and reimbursement of costs to receiver and his professional by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Standard Fund accounting reports, # 2 Exhibit 2 Fourth Interim Report Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2-2 Fourth Interim Report Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 Fifth Interim Report Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 3 Fifth Interim Report Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17 part 1, # 20 Exhibit 17 part 2, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30 part 1, # 34 Exhibit 30 part 2, # 35 Exhibit 30 part 3, # 36 Exhibit 31, # 37 Exhibit 32, # 38 Exhibit 33 proposed order)(JLH)
April 21, 2010 391 Featured Case ORDER granting 390 Motion to approve procedure to administer claims and proof of claim form, (2) Establish deadline for filing proofs of claim, and (3) Permit notice by mail and publication. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/21/2010. (see order) (MSS)
April 20, 2010 390 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to (1) Approve Procedure to Administer Claims and Proof of Claim Form, (2) Establish Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim, and (3) Permit Notice By Mail and Publication and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Claim Form, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Deadline Requiring Filing of Proofs of Claim, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Morello, Gianluca)
April 7, 2010 387 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Receiver. The clerk is directed to term withdrawing counsel. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/7/2010. (CCB) Modified on 4/7/2010 (SKH).
April 7, 2010 386 MOTION for Carl R. Nelson and Ashley Bruce Trehan to withdraw as attorney by Burton W. Wiand. (Nelson, Carl)
April 7, 2010 385 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 384 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Barbara Edgecombe and Michael Scott Edgecombe. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/7/2010. (CCB)
April 6, 2010 384 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Barbara Edgecombe and Michael Scott Edgecombe by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 5, 2010 383 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 382 Motion to Approve Settlement between the Receiver and Robert Graetz. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/5/2010. (SKH)
April 5, 2010 382 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Robert E. Graetz by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 2, 2010 381 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 380 Motion to Approve Settlement between the Receiver and William J. Beard and R. Jean Beard, as Co-Trustees of the William J. and R. Jean Beard Joint Trust. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/2/2010. (SKH)
April 2, 2010 380 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: William J. Beard and R. Jean Beard, as Co-Trustees of the William J. and R. Jean Beard Joint Trust by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
April 1, 2010 379 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 378 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Paul C. Smith and Leonore Smith, as Co-Trustees of the Smith Revocable Family Trust did 8/3/1989. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/1/2010. (CCB)
March 31, 2010 378 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Paul C. Smith and Leonore Smith, as Co-Trustees of the Smith Revocable Family Trust dtd 08/03/1989 by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
March 26, 2010 377 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 376 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with John Klein, Jr. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/26/2010. (CCB)
March 26, 2010 376 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: John Klein, Jr. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement)(Lamont, Michael)
March 26, 2010 375 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting 374 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Logan Trucking, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/26/2010. (CCB)
March 26, 2010 374 MOTION to Approve Settlement re: Logan Trucking, Inc. by Burton W. Wiand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement re Logan Trucking, Inc.)(Lamont, Michael)
March 25, 2010 373 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED granting Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement (Dkt. 372). The Court approves the written settlement agreements attached to the motion entered into between the Receiver and David Quade and Susan Schuster. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/25/2010. (SKH)
March 25, 2010 372