City of Winter Haven v. Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership Featured Case
Plaintiff: City of Winter Haven
Defendant: Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership
Case Number: 8:2009cv00190
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Kovachevich
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1442 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER dismissing case with prejudic re 27 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and to terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/30/2009. (SN)
September 29, 2009 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.)
August 11, 2009 Filing 26 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:09-cv-190-T-17AEP. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins no longer assigned to the case. (LDB)
May 5, 2009 Filing 25 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 24 Amended complaint by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership.(Connor, J.)
April 28, 2009 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership with Jury Demand filed by City of Winter Haven. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Composite), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Crawford, Warren)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 12 Motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff's Counts II and III. Plaintiff is instructed to file on the breach of contract claim only within five (5) days of this order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/22/2009. (SN)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 15 Plaintiffs Motion to Disqualify Peterson & Myers, P.A. From Representing Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 4/21/2009. (RM)
April 17, 2009 Filing 21 STIPULATION re 15 MOTION to disqualify Peterson & Myers, P.A. Extending Time for the Parties to Serve Initial Disclosures by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.)
April 6, 2009 Filing 20 RESPONSE to motion re 15 MOTION to disqualify Peterson & Myers, P.A. filed by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Connor, J.)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 3/31/2009. (RM)
March 30, 2009 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION to disqualify Peterson & Myers, P.A. by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER referring motion to Magistrate Judge: 15 MOTION to disqualify Peterson & Myers, P.A. filed by City of Winter Haven. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/18/2009. (SN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
March 17, 2009 Filing 16 RESPONSE to motion re 12 Amended MOTION to dismiss Counts II and III of the Complaint filed by City of Winter Haven. (O'Toole, Neal)
March 17, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION to disqualify Peterson & Myers, P.A. by City of Winter Haven. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Toole, Neal)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2009, Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2009, Discovery due by 9/1/2009, Dispositive motions due by 10/1/2009. A pretrial conference may be scheduled on or after 11/1/09 and a trial may be scheduled on or after 12/1/09. This is a jury trial which is expected to take 24 hours to try. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/9/2009. (SN)
March 6, 2009 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Connor, J.)
March 3, 2009 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to dismiss Counts II and III of the Complaint by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER terminating 7 Motion to dismiss; granting 10 Motion for leave to file amended motion to dismiss. The amended motion shall be filed within 5 days of this date. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/3/2009. (SN)
March 2, 2009 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Amended Motion to Dismiss with Supporting Memorandum by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document Amended Motion to Dismiss with Supporting Memorandum)(Connor, J.)
February 20, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal L. O'Toole on behalf of City of Winter Haven (O'Toole, Neal)
February 20, 2009 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in support re 7 Motion to dismiss filed by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.)
February 20, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss Counts II and III of the Complaint by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.)
February 11, 2009 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/23/2009. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/11/2009. (CLM)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to complaint. Response due by 2/23/2009. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/11/2009. (SN)
February 9, 2009 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Connor, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/08. (LDB)
February 5, 2009 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership with Jury Demand filed in state court on 12/31/08 by City of Winter Haven.(LDB)
February 5, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from in the Tenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Polk County, Florida, case number 53-2008-CA-12521-000 filed in State Court on 12/31/08. Filing fee $350, receipt number T049159 filed by Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(LDB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Winter Haven v. Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Winter Haven
Represented By: Frederick John Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership
Represented By: J. Davis Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?