Mims Properties Investments, LLC et al v. Mosaic Fertilizer, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Florida Sand and Fill, LLC, Innovation Environmental, Inc., Mims Properties, LLC, Mims Hammocks, LLC, Nichols Ranch, LLC, Mims Properties Investments, LLC and Mims/Alafia, LLC |
Defendant: |
Mosaic Fertilizer, LLC |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv01093 |
Filed: |
May 17, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Tampa Office |
County: |
Polk |
Presiding Judge: |
Elizabeth A. Kovachevich |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas B. McCoun |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 27, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to dismiss Count XIII and Count XVI of the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/27/2012. (JM)
|
December 12, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to dismiss, with leave to file an amended complaint within fourteen days. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/12/2011. (JM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Mims Properties Investments, LLC et al v. Mosaic Fertilizer, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Florida Sand and Fill, LLC |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Innovation Environmental, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Mims Properties, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Mims Hammocks, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Nichols Ranch, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Mims Properties Investments, LLC |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Mims/Alafia, LLC |
Represented By: |
Raul Valles, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Rocke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mosaic Fertilizer, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?