Ruckh v. CMC II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Angela Ruckh
Defendant: CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC doing business as Governor's Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC doing business as LaVie Rehab, 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC doing business as Marshall Health and Rehabilitation Center, Consulate Management Company, LLC and Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC doing business as LaVie Care Centers
Petitioner: Mr. Christopher A Klimmek, State of Florida and USA
Interested Party: Warburg Pincus Equity Partners LP
Receiver: Steven S Oscher
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2011cv01303
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER: the action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending leave from the Delaware bankruptcy court to proceed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/9/2021. (BK)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 569 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Luce, Gregory)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 568 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Cost, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Joseph S. Hall, #3 Exhibit A - Itemization of Deposition Expenses, #4 Exhibit B - Deposition Invoices, #5 Exhibit C - B. Jones Email to R. Beynon, #6 Exhibit D - Itemization of Duplication Expenses, #7 Exhibit E - Duplication Invoices)(Darken, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees seeking Order regarding Relator's entitlement to Attorney's Fees and Expenses pursuant to Local Rule 7.01 and incorporated memorandum of law by Angela Ruckh. (Darken, Kevin) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (AG).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 566 JUDGMENT in favor of USA against 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2021. (CTR)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 565 JUDGMENT in favor of USA against 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2021. (CTR)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2021. (CTR)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 563 JUDGMENT in favor of USA against CMC II, LLC and Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. jointly and severally. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2021. (CTR)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER directing the clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT for the United States and against: Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC and CMC II, LLC, jointly and severally ($240,914,900); Salus Rehabilitation, LLC ($484,000); 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC ($6,266,424); and 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC ($10,055,961). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/8/2021. (BK)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Proposed Consent Judgmentin a Civil Case by Kevin Darken. (Darken, Kevin) Modified on 2/8/2021 (CTR).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 560 NOTICE by Kevin Darken Notice of Filing Proposed Judgments Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(f) with Leave of Court (Darken, Kevin) Modified text only on 2/8/2021 (CTR).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ENDORSED ORDER granting #558 the motion to submit proposed judgments. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/5/2021.
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 558 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENTS by Kevin Darken. (Darken, Kevin)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE by Kevin Darken Barry A. Cohen, P.A.'s Notice of Charging Lien (Darken, Kevin)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 MANDATE of USCA: AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART AND REMANDED as to #548 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ruckh, #476 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ruckh. Issued as Mandate: 9/28/20. USCA number: 18-10500-AA. (JNB)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER of USCA granting appellant's motion to transfer consideration of attorney's fees to District Court as to #548 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ruckh. EOD: 09/24/20; USCA number: 18-10500-AA. (AG)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro F. Bajo, Jr on behalf of Steven S Oscher (Bajo, Pedro)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 OPINION/ORDER of USCA: Affirmed in part, Reversed in part and Remanded as to #548 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ruckh, #476 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ruckh. EOD: 6/25/20; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 18-10500-AA. (JNB)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving Sealed Pleadings on 7/19/2018 re #548 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-AA. (CTR)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #548 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume/folder of SEALED pleadings: 1 USCA number: 18-10500-AA (CTR)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order RECORD on appeal sent to USCA re #548 Notice of appeal. Transmittal includes copy of docket sheet, volume/folder of SEALED pleadings: 1, USCA number 18-10500-AA (CTR)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER granting #550--motion to stay the #547--costs judgment against the relator. Execution on the judgment is STAYED pending a further order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/22/2018. (GSO)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 550 MOTION to stay re #546 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 549 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #548 Notice of appeal. (CTR)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #547 Judgment, #469 Judgment by Angela Ruckh. Filing fee not paid. (Ho, Derek)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 JUDGMENT in favor of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC against Angela Ruckh Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/20/2018. (CTR)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #480--motion concerning costs; directing the clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT for the defendants and against Angela Ruckh in the amount of $86,945.44. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (BK)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ENDORSED ORDER granting #544 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Jeffrey A. Love is terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/4/2018. (SLB)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Unopposed MOTION for Jeffrey A. Love to withdraw as attorney by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Hearing held on 04-21-16 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (HWJ)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11-7-14 before Judge Thomas B McCoun, III re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (HWJ)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 540 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on 7-10-14 before Judge Thomas B McCoun, III re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (HWJ)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 539 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 05-01-14 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (HWJ)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPTS. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 05-27-16 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/17/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (HWJ)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Summary Judgment held on 04-27-16 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/17/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (HWJ)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 04-27-15 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/17/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (HWJ)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 534 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 04-21-15 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/17/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 533 NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Bill Jones re: #476 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 532 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPTS. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 TRANSCRIPT of In Camera Hearing held on 01-18-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 530 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 22) held on 02-15-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 21) held on 02-14-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 20 PM) held on 02-13-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 20 - AM) held on 02-13-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 19) held on 02-10-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 18 - PM) held on 02-09-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 18 - AM) held on 02-09-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 523 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 17 - PM) held on 02-08-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 522 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 17 - AM) held on 02-08-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 521 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 16 PM) held on 02-07-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 520 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 16- AM) held on 02-07-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 15 - PM) held on 02-06-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 518 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 15 - AM) held on 02-06-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 14) held on 02-03-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 13 - PM) held on 02-02-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 13- AM) held on 02-02-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ) (CTR).
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 514 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 12 - PM) held on 02-01-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 12-AM) held on 02-01-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 512 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 11 - PM) held on 01-31-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 11 -AM held on 01-31-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 10-PM) held on 01-30-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT of 01-30-17 (Vol 10 AM) held on 01-30-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 508 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 9 PM) held on 01-27-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 507 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 9 AM) held on 01-27-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 506 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 8 PM) held on 01-26-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 8 - AM) held on 01-26-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 504 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 7 PM) held on 01-25-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 7 - AM) held on 01-25-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 502 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 6 - PM) held on 01-24-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Tial (Vol 6 -AM) held on 01-24-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 500 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 5 - PM) held on 01-23-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 499 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 5 - AM) held on 01-23-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 4 PM) held on 01-20-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 497 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 4- AM) held on 01-20-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 3-PM) held on 01-19-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 3-AM) held on 01-19-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 494 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 2 PM) held on 01-18-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 2 - AM) held on 01-18-17 before Judge Steve D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Vol 1) held on 01-17-17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones, Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/13/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (HWJ)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Bill Jones re #476 Notice of appeal Estimated transcript filing date: 03-23-18. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (HWJ)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Claudia Spangler Fry re: #476 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (BSN)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 489 NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Lynann Nicely re: #476 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (LN)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Lynann Nicely. (LN)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on 4/14/2016 before Judge McCoun re #476 Notice of appeal. Court Reporter Lynann Nicely, Telephone number (813) 301-5252. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/15/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2018. (LN)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Lynann Nicely re #476 Notice of appeal Estimated transcript filing date: 2/22/2018. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (LN)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 485 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Angela Ruckh for proceedings held on 2/22/16 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (Strikis, Silvija)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 484 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Angela Ruckh for proceedings held on 4/14/16 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (Strikis, Silvija)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Angela Ruckh for proceedings held on 5/1/14, 7/10/14, 11/7/14, 4/21/15, 4/27/15, 4/21/16, 4/27/16, 5/27/16, 1/17/17- 2/15/17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday re #476 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-10500-D. (Strikis, Silvija)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE of compliance re #478 Objection Local Rule 3.01(g) by State of Florida (Bennett, Jill)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number tpa048754 re #476 Notice of appeal filed by Angela Ruckh (ARC)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:11-cv-1303-SDM-CPT. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III no longer assigned to the case. (KE)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Court Review of Defendants' Petition for Costs and Unopposed Request That Costs Not Be Taxed Against the United States by USA. (Olson, William)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 OBJECTION re #474 Bill of costs - proposed . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 478 OBJECTION re #474 Bill of costs - proposed . (Bennett, Jill)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #476 Notice of appeal. (CTR)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #469 Judgment by Angela Ruckh. Filing fee not paid. (Ho, Derek)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER awarding Relator fees pursuant to Order on Motion for Protective Order and for Sanctions #218. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 1/31/2018. (SLB)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Luce, Gregory)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER denying #470--motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/23/2018. (BK) Attachment modified on 1/24/2018 (BK)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 472 RESPONSE in Opposition re #470 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Luce, Gregory)
January 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ENDORSED ORDER: The relator moves (Doc. 470) for an injunction pending appeal. The motion claims an "emergency" attributable to the prospect that one or more of the defendants might engage in a transaction not in the ordinary course of business, for example, might "liquidate or otherwise restructure their business" or "thwart judgment... by transferring assets to related parties." The defendants must respond to the relator's motion by noon on Friday, January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/14/2018.
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 469 JUDGMENT in favor of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC against State of Florida, USA, Angela Ruckh Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/12/2018. (CTR)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting #452--renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law; alternatively, conditionally granting the request for a new trial; vacating #432, #433, #434, #435, and #436--judgments against the defendants; directing the clerk, as to all claims, TO ENTER JUDGMENT for the defendants and against Angela Ruckh, the United States, and the State of Florida and TO CLOSE the case; denying as moot the defendant's motion for remittitur. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2018. (BK)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #463 the defendants' motion for leave to "engage in certain business actions that may exceed the terms" of the March 15, 2017 order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/18/2017. (AJS)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 NOTICE by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC re #452 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law (Defendants' Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) (Defendants' Third Notice to the Court of Pendency of Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law) (Luce, Gregory)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 RESPONSE in Opposition re #463 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Take Extraordinary Business Actions (Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion for Leave to Take Extraordinary Business Actions Pending Stay of Execution of Judgments) filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Silvija A. Strikis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Strikis, Silvija)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER permitting the relator to respond no later than NOON on DECEMBER 12, 2017, to the defendants' #463 motion. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/7/2017. (AJS)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Take Extraordinary Business Actions (Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion for Leave to Take Extraordinary Business Actions Pending Stay of Execution of Judgments) by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Hayes)(Luce, Gregory)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 NOTICE by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC re #452 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law (Defendants' Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) (Defendants' Second Notice to the Court of Pendency of Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law) (Luce, Gregory)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC re #452 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law (Defendants' Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) (Luce, Gregory)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 NOTICE of supplemental authority (Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority In Support of Their Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) by CMC II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Luce, Gregory)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ENDORSED ORDER: The defendants' #457 motion for leave to file supplemental authority is construed as a notice of supplemental authority (admirably filed without elaboration or argument). The authority is noted, and the motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/30/2017.
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE of change of address by Royston Delaney (Delaney, Royston)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Luce, Gregory)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER denying #453--the United States' motion to submit a "statement of interest." Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/26/2017. (BK)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 REPLY to Response to Motion re #452 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law (Defendants' Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Luce, Gregory)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 RESPONSE in Opposition re #452 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law (Defendants' Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) filed by Angela Ruckh. (Ho, Derek)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to File a Statement of Interest by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, William)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law (Defendants' Renewed Dispositive Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law) by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Luce, Gregory)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER granting #447--application for stay of execution; staying execution on the judgments until disposition of a post-trial motion. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/15/2017. (BK)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 RESPONSE in Opposition re #447 Emergency APPLICATION for stay of execution of judgments filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Marie Von Hoene on behalf of State of Florida (Von Hoene, Kathleen)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting-in-part #444 the motion to extend the time within which to move for an attorney's fee and to submit a proposed bill of costs; permitting the relator, the United States, and the State of Florida to each respond no later than 6 p.m. on MARCH 14, 2017, to the #447 emergency motion to stay execution on the judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 03/13/2017. (SKB)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Emergency APPLICATION for stay of execution of judgments by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Bryson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of R. Arrowsmith)(Watson, Jason)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Gregory M. Luce, appearing on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA042343) Related document: #445 MOTION for Gregory M. Luce to appear pro hac vice. (LMD)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ENDORSED ORDER granting #445 motion for Gregory M. Luce, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/10/2017. (SLB)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MOTION for Gregory M. Luce to appear pro hac vice by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Watson, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically From Court's Order Modifying Local Rule 3.01 and Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Costs by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) . Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees, Expenses and Costs on 3/9/2017 (CTR).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alex Watson on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Watson, Jason)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER concerning motion for judgment as a matter of law; permitting a reply within seven days of the response; prescribing page and footnote limits for the motion, the response, and the reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2017. (BK)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 VACATED See Doc. #468. JUDGMENT in favor of the United States and against 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/1/2017. (SKB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (BK)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 VACATED See Doc. #468. JUDGMENT in favor of the United States and against 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/1/2017. (SKB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (BK)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 434 VACATED See Doc. #468. JUDGMENT in favor of the United States and against Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/1/2017. (SKB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (BK)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 VACATED See Doc. #468. JUDGMENT in favor of the State of Florida and against CMC II, LLC, and Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/1/2017. (SKB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (BK)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 VACATED See Doc. #468. JUDGMENT in favor of the United States and against CMC II, LLC and Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/1/2017. (SKB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (BK)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER directing the clerk, in accord with Doc. #430--verdict, to enter judgments. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/1/2017. (BK)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 441 COURT'S EXHIBIT LIST. (Attachments: #1 Court Exhibit 1, #2 Court Exhibit 2, #3 Court Exhibit 3, #4 Court Exhibit 4, #5 Court Exhibit 5, #6 Court Exhibit 6, #7 Court Exhibit 7, #8 Court Exhibit 8)(SKB)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Part 3 of 3, pgs. 305-308) by Angela Ruckh, State of Florida, USA. (Attachments: #1 DX-31AR, #2 DX-32AR, #3 DX-32BR, #4 RX-3039R, #5 RX-3040R, #6 RX-3041R, #7 RX-3043R, #8 RX-3044R, #9 RX-3047 (1 of 2), #10 RX-3047 (2 of 2), #11 RX-3049, #12 RX-3051, #13 RX-3052, #14 RX-3053, #15 RX-3054, #16 RX-3055, #17 RX-A, #18 RX-B, #19 RX-3056 (1 of 2), #20 RX-3056 (2 of 2), #21 DX-480A, #22 RX-3057 (1 of 3), #23 RX-3057 (2 of 3), #24 RX-3057 (3 of 3), #25 DX-826AR, #26 DX-828AR, #27 DX-830AR, #28 RX-3073R)(SKB)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Part 2 of 3, pgs. 199-304) by Angela Ruckh, State of Florida, USA. (Attachments: #1 RX-2077, #2 RX-2632, #3 RX-2957, #4 RX-2959R, #5 RX-2972, #6 RX-2973 (1 of 2), #7 RX-2973 (2 of 2), #8 RX-2979, #9 RX-2981, #10 RX-2982, #11 RX-2983, #12 RX-3002, #13 RX-3004, #14 RX-3005R, #15 RX-3015A, #16 RX-3021, #17 RX-3022, #18 RX-3031, #19 RX-3034)(SKB)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Part 1 of 3, pgs. 1-198) by Angela Ruckh, State of Florida, USA. (Attachments: #1 RX-1, #2 RX-21R (1 of 2), #3 RX-21R (2 of 2), #4 RX-48, #5 RX-59, #6 RX-84R, #7 RX-85R, #8 RX-88, #9 RX-89R (1 of 2), #10 RX-89R(2 of 2), #11 RX-122, #12 RX-130, #13 RX-148, #14 RX-158, #15 RX-162, #16 RX-163, #17 RX-186, #18 RX-188, #19 RX-189A, #20 RX-190, #21 RX-197, #22 RX-202, #23 RX-216, #24 RX-217, #25 RX-218, #26 RX-221, #27 RX-222, #28 RX-224, #29 RX-225, #30 RX-226, #31 RX-227, #32 RX-228, #33 RX-255, #34 RX-259, #35 RX-265, #36 RX-278, #37 RX-280, #38 RX-297, #39 RX-308R, #40 RX-372, #41 RX-386, #42 RX-405, #43 RX-406R, #44 RX-407, #45 RX-408, #46 RX-409, #47 RX-410, #48 RX-411, #49 RX-412, #50 RX-413, #51 RX-414, #52 RX-415, #53 RX-416, #54 RX-417, #55 RX-418, #56 RX-419, #57 RX-420, #58 RX-421, #59 RX-422, #60 RX-423, #61 RX-424, #62 RX-425, #63 RX-440, #64 RX-441, #65 RX-450, #66 RX-451, #67 RX-455, #68 RX-463, #69 RX-467R, #70 RX-472, #71 RX-476, #72 RX-489 (1 of 2), #73 RX-489 (2 of 2), #74 RX-501R, #75 RX-502R, #76 RX-552R, #77 RX-861R, #78 RX-892, #79 RX-970R, #80 RX-988R, #81 RX-991R, #82 RX-1000R, #83 RX-1030R, #84 RX-1064R, #85 RX-1067R, #86 RX-1074R, #87 RX-1142R, #88 RX-1216R, #89 RX-1235BR, #90 RX-1235CR, #91 RX-1235DR, #92 RX-1262BR, #93 RX-1262CR, #94 RX-1274A, #95 RX-1275A, #96 RX-1306BR, #97 RX-1347BR, #98 RX-1354BR, #99 RX-1354CR, #100 RX-1364BR, #101 RX-1367BR, #102 RX-1379BR, #103 RX-1391AR, #104 RX-1421BR, #105 RX-1463BR, #106 RX-1466BR, #107 RX-1476AR, #108 RX-1503BR, #109 RX-1504BR, #110 RX-1528AR, #111 RX-1587BR, #112 RX-1597BR, #113 RX-1608BR, #114 RX-1790BR, #115 RX-1806AR, #116 RX-1816BR, #117 RX-1833, #118 RX-1834R, #119 RX-1843, #120 RX-1846, #121 RX-1852, #122 RX-1857, #123 RX-1863, #124 RX-1868, #125 RX-1869, #126 RX-1882, #127 RX-1893R, #128 RX-1899, #129 RX-1903, #130 RX-1922R, #131 RX-1947, #132 RX-1969, #133 RX-1970)(SKB)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Defendant's Exhibit List by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DX-1, #2 DX-2, #3 DX-5, #4 DX-6, #5 DX-13, #6 DX-14, #7 DX-30 Part 1 of 3, #8 DX-30 Part 2 of 3, #9 DX-30 Part 3 of 3, #10 DX-31, #11 DX-31D, #12 DX-32, #13 DX-33, #14 DX-37, #15 DX-38, #16 DX-39, #17 DX-41, #18 DX-52 Part 1 of 2, #19 DX-52 Part 2 of 2, #20 DX-54, #21 DX-61, #22 DX-62, #23 DX-63, #24 DX-65, #25 DX-135D, #26 DX-198D, #27 DX-198DA, #28 DX-202D, #29 DX-202DA, #30 DX-202DB, #31 DX-235D, #32 DX-236D, #33 DX-297D, #34 DX-298D, #35 DX-299D, #36 DX-300D, #37 DX-301D, #38 DX-302D, #39 DX-307D, #40 DX-307DA, #41 DX-310DA, #42 DX-310DB, #43 DX-311DA, #44 DX-368D, #45 DX-375D, #46 DX-395D, #47 DX-397D, #48 DX-425D, #49 DX-426D, #50 DX-427D, #51 DX-428D, #52 DX-471D, #53 DX-472D, #54 DX-473D, #55 DX-474D, #56 DX-479D, #57 DX-480D, #58 DX-532D, #59 DX-533D, #60 DX-534D, #61 DX-597, #62 DX-636, #63 DX-639D, #64 DX-641D, #65 DX-642D, #66 DX-643D, #67 DX-644D, #68 DX-717D, #69 DX-718D, #70 DX-762D, #71 DX-763D, #72 DX-811D, #73 DX-869D, #74 DX-880D, #75 DX-884D, #76 DX-910D, #77 DX-911D, #78 DX-912D, #79 DX-931, #80 DX-932, #81 DX-939, #82 DX-957 Part 1 of 5, #83 DX-957 Part 2 of 5, #84 DX-957 Part 3 of 5, #85 DX-957 Part 4 of 5, #86 DX-957 Part 5 of 5, #87 DX-965DA, #88 DX-1031, #89 DX-1032, #90 DX-1109D, #91 DX-1131, #92 DX-1132, #93 DX-1133, #94 RX-2240D, #95 DX-1135 Part 1 of 2, #96 DX-1135 Part 2 of 2, #97 DX-1136, #98 DX-1138, #99 DX-1139D)(SKB).
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 JURY VERDICT. (SKB)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/15/2017 day twenty-two of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. A verdict is reached and the trial is concluded. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/14/2017 day twenty-one of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The jurors will continue deliberations on Wednesday, February 15, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/13/2017 day twenty of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Tuesday, February 14, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/10/2017 day nineteen of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Monday, February 13, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 RESPONSE re #418 Trial Brief, #417 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/09/2017 day eighteen of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Friday, February 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE ENTRY of 02/08/2017 day seventeen of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Thursday, February 9, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 RESPONSE re #416 Trial Brief filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/07/2017 day sixteen of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Wednesday, February 8, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/06/2017 day fifteen of jury trial before Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Tuesday, February 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding the Materiality of Comprehensive Care Plans by Angela Ruckh. (Webster, James)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/03/2017 day fourteen of jury trial before Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Monday, February 6, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Proposed Jury Instructions by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 416 TRIAL BRIEF Memorandum Regarding the Rebuttable Presumption of Knowledge by Angela Ruckh. (Webster, James)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/02/2017 day thirteen of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday; defendant moves for judgment under Rule 50, Fed. R. Civ. P; the court reserves ruling. The trial will resume on Friday, February 3, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MOTION for judgment as a matter of law by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MINUTE ENTRY for 02/01/2017 day twelve of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Thursday, February 2, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/31/2017 day eleven of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Wednesday, February 1, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/30/2017 day ten of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Tuesday, January 31, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER regarding juror payments for jury trial. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/26/2017. (SKB)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/27/2017 day nine of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Monday, January 30, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/26/2017 day eight of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Friday, January 27, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/25/2017 day seven of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Thursday, January 26, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Olson on behalf of USA (Olson, William)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/24/2017 day six of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Wednesday, January 25, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 TRIAL CALENDAR for trial term of February 2017 in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday; jury trial continued from January trial calendar. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/24/2017. (SKB)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/23/2017 day five of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Tuesday, January 24, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/20/2017 day four of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume on Monday, January 23, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/19/2017 day three of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. The trial will resume Friday, January 20, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/18/2017 day two of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday: counsel Tina Dunsford withdraws from the case. The trial will resume on Thursday, January 19, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MINUTE ENTRY for 01/17/2017 day one of jury trial conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday: voir dire conducted, jury selected. The trial will resume on Wednesday, January 18, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (SKB)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER concerning #396--motion to allow electronic equipment into the courthouse. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/17/2017. (BK)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Unopposed MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically Flat screen monitor, hotspot for use at trial by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strikis, Silvija)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #393--motion concerning electronics; substituting Max Brady and William N. Lawther in place of Joyce Cannon and Louise Hanna. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/13/2017. (BK)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STATEMENT of the case for trial by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Leave to Substitute Individuals Permitted to Bring Electronic Equipment for Use at Trial by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strikis, Silvija)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Proposed Corrected Jury Instructions by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Modified on 1/12/2017 (DG).
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 TRIAL BRIEF Correction of Docket #390 by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ***TERMINATED-per request of attorney.***TRIAL BRIEF by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Modified on 1/12/2017 (CTR).
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER regarding #380--motion to allow electronic equipment into the United States Courthouse. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2017. (BK) (BK). Modified on 1/11/2017 to correct scrivener's error (BK)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 TRIAL BRIEF by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE by the court of correspondence by James M. Webster. (Attachments: #1 correspondence)(BK)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Proposed Jury Instructions by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 PROPOSED verdict form filed by207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Proposed Voir Dire by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 PROPOSED verdict form filed byAngela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Proposed Jury Instructions by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Proposed Voir Dire by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 JOINT MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically for Use at Trial by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynam, Terence) Modified event and text on 1/9/2017 (JNB).
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #299 motion to exclude certain testimony of Stefan Boedeker. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/29/2016. (SKB)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER denying #282 motion to exclude the testimony of Constantijn Panis. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/29/2016. (SKB)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 TRIAL CALENDAR for trial term January 2017. Jury trial scheduled for 1/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/22/2016. (SKB)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ENDORSED ORDER: No additional motion in limine is permitted. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/22/2016.
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER resolving certain in limine motions by the relator. (Docs. #286, #287, #288, #289, and #347) Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/21/2016. (BK)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER resolving certain in limine motions by the defendants. (Docs. #283, #284, #290, #291, and #349) Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/21/2016. (BK) Modified on 12/21/2016 (BK)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ENDORSED ORDER denying #370 the relator's motion to reconsider or to remand to the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/19/2016.
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 RESPONSE in Opposition re #370 MOTION to remand to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings or, in the Alternative MOTION for Reconsideration re #369 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER modifying local rule 3.01. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/14/2016. (BK)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MOTION to remand to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Reconsideration re #369 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting in part #348--motion for reconsideration and relief; vacating in part #334--order; affirming in part #334--order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/1/2016. (BK)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting #365-motion by relator regarding witness Jessica Erwin; denying #366--defendants' request for attorney's fees, costs, or other sanctions; directing the relator, by 5:00 p.m. EST on 12/5/2016 to offer to the defendants three alternative days for Erwin's deposition and to arrange for production of Erwin's documents. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/1/2016. (BK)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER denying #292--motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/1/2016. (BK)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE in Opposition re #365 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Present Testimony from an Additional Witness filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Present Testimony from an Additional Witness by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER scheduling the jury trial for 1/17/2017 in Courtroom 15A. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/30/2016. (BK)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ENDORSED ORDER denying #361 the defendants' motion for leave to submit an additional memorandum of law. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/20/2016.
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 RESPONSE in Opposition re #361 MOTION for leave to file Further Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Angela Ruckh. (Ho, Derek)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION for leave to file Further Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE to counsel Catherine E. Creely, Carroll Skehan of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (AMD)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MINUTE ENTRY for 5/27/2016 motion hearing re #282 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert on Statistical Sampling filed by 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC, and #299 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Corrected Motion Partially to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stefan Boedeker (Opinions 1 and 2) filed by Angela Ruckh conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday. Order to follow. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (LAM)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ENDORSED ORDER granting #356 motion for Catherine E. Creely, Esq., to appear pro hac vice; granting #357 motion for Carroll Skehan, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 5/26/2016. (SLB)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Carroll Skehan, appearing on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA036959) Related document: #357 MOTION for Carroll Skehan to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Catherine E. Creely, appearing on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA036917) Related document: #356 MOTION for Catherine Elizabeth Creely to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MOTION for Carroll Skehan to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Dunsford, Tina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION for Catherine Elizabeth Creely to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Dunsford, Tina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #347 Motion in Limine filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DX0927, #2 Exhibit 2 - DX0012, #3 Exhibit 3 - RX0080, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Deeter Dep. (Oct. 19, 2015), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Pelovitz Dep. (Mar. 28, 2016))(Lynam, Terence)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #349 Motion in Limine filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #348 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO COURTROOM ONLY): Motion Hearing on #292 and #299 --motions to exclude testimony scheduled for 5/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Steven D. Merryday. (LAM)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE of hearing on #282 and #299--motions to exclude testimony; hearing scheduled for 5/27/2016 at 9:00 a.m. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge Steven D. Merryday. (BK)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM in support re #334 Order on Motion for SanctionsOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief of the Fees and Costs Awarded by this Court filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Silvija A. Strikis)(Strikis, Silvija)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION in limine by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Relator's Presentation in Opp'n to Defs.' Mot. for Summ. J., #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Deposition of C. Packer (Oct. 16, 2015))(Lynam, Terence)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MOTION in limine by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RESPONSE in Opposition re #321 MOTION for leave to file under seal and to remove confidentiality designation of a document filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER continuing the trial previously set for a date certain of May 16, 2016, to the July 2016 trial docket. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/3/2016. (LAM)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Lynann Nicely. (LN)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 04/14/16 before Judge McCoun. Court Reporter Lynann Nicely,Telephone number (813) 301-5252. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/19/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2016. (LN)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTE ENTRY for 4/27/2016 motion hearing conducted by Judge Steven D. Merryday re #292 MOTION for summary judgment filed by 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, CMC II, LLC, and Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (LAM)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE by Angela Ruckh re #300 Pretrial statement of Filing Defendants' Redacted Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Pretrial Statement)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting #333--motion to remove defendants' trial exhibit list from the public record; directing the clerk to TERMINATE Doc. [300-2] from the docket; redacted exhibit list due 5/2/2016. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/26/2016. (BK)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #335--motion re computers. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/26/2016. (BK)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SUPPLEMENT re #333 Consent MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Removal of Defendants' Trial Exhibit List (Dkt. No. 300-2) From the Public Record and Leave to File Redacted Version MOTION for leave to file by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Defendants' Exhibit List)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Use of Courtroom Technology and Attorney Laptops During April 27, 2016 Hearing by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Sealed Documents S-336 & S-337. (AMD)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Relator's Motion to Preclude Defendants' Use of Untimely Produced Documents and for Sanctions #264. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/22/2016. (SLB)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Consent MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Removal of Defendants' Trial Exhibit List (Dkt. No. 300-2) From the Public Record and Leave to File Redacted Version by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) . Added MOTION for leave to file on 4/25/2016 (AMD).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #272 Supplement, #266 Supplement, #264 Motion for SanctionsMotion for Miscellaneous Relief, #328 Supplement filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting in part #321--motion to seal; by 4/27/2016 the relator may file under seal the documents listed in paragraph four of the motion; motion to remove "confidential" designation pends. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/22/2016. (BK)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ENDORSED ORDER granting #327 the motion for Kevin Darken to "appear" by telephone at the April 27, 2016 hearing. However, "appear" means to listen by telephone, not to argue by telephone. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/22/2016.
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Derek Ho, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA036323. Related document: #324 Unopposed MOTION for Derek T. Ho to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/21/2016. (SLB)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SUPPLEMENT re #264 MOTION for sanctions MOTION to preclude Defendants' use of untimely produced documents by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Angela Ruckh. (Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ENDORSED ORDER granting #323 motion for James M. Webster, III, Esq., to appear pro hac vice; granting #324 motion for Derek T. Ho, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/21/2016. (SLB)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/21/2016. (DIGITAL) (LYB)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Unopposed MOTION for Derek T. Ho to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Unopposed MOTION for James M. Webster, III to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 RESPONSE in Opposition re #292 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Silvija A. Strikis, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis - Relator's Counterstatements to Defendants' Chart of Facts, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis - Relator's Statement of Additional Material Facts, #4 Exhibits 1-24 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #5 Exhibits 25-42 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #6 Exhibits 43-52 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #7 Exhibits 53-65 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #8 Exhibit 66 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #9 Exhibits 67-81 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #10 Exhibits 82-101 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #11 Exhibits 102-106 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #12 Exhibits 107-110 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #13 Exhibits 111-117 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis, #14 Exhibits 118-139 to Decl. of Silvija A. Strikis)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION for leave to file under seal and to remove confidentiality designation of a document by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 RESPONSE in Opposition re #283 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert Shirley Bradley filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Shirley Bradley, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Shirley Bradley, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of Deposition of Sarah Finnegan, #4 Exhibit D - Compilation of News Reports)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re #290 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Proposed Testimony of Relator's Expert Marvette Lowrie-Morris filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Marvette Lowrie-Morris, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Marvette Lowrie-Morris, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Gregory Palega)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 RESPONSE in Opposition re #282 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert on Statistical Sampling filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Constantijn Panis, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Constantijn Panis, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Stefan Boedeker)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 RESPONSE in Opposition re #291 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude The Testimony of Relator in Her Capacity as an Expert Witness filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Deposition of Angela Ruckh, #2 Exhibit B - LaVie Job Description form)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 RESPONSE in Opposition re #284 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert Marc Vianello filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Marc Vianello, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Marc Vianello, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibit 11 from the Deposition of Marc Vianello, #4 Exhibit D - Page from Defendants' Billing Journal for Beneva Lakes Healthcare for Nov. 2008)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 RESPONSE in Opposition re #287 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Scott Heichel filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Scott Heichel (Feb. 25, 2016) (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Scott Heichel (Mar. 15, 2016) (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Scott Heichel (Apr. 18, 2016))(Lynam, Terence)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #286 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Peter Dressel filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Peter Dressel (Feb. 25, 2016), #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Peter Dressel (Dec. 11, 2015), #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Peter Dressel (Mar. 14, 2016), #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Deposition of Marvette Lowrie-Morris (Mar. 17, 2016))(Lynam, Terence)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 RESPONSE in Opposition re #289 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Steven Pelovitz filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Steven Pelovitz (Feb. 25, 2016), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Steven Pelovitz (Mar. 28, 2016), #3 Exhibit C - Email from T. Lynam to R. Beynon (Mar. 17, 2016), #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of C. Creely (Apr. 19, 2016))(Lynam, Terence)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 RESPONSE in Opposition re #288 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Gregory Palega, M.D. filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Gregory Palega, M.D. (Feb. 25, 2016) (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Gregory Palega, M.D. (Mar. 15, 2016) (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Shirley Bradley (Mar. 25, 2016), #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Gregory Palega, M.D. (Apr. 18, 2016), #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts of Deposition of Marvette Lowrie-Morris (Mar. 17, 2016), #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Deposition of Angela Ruckh (Oct. 29, 2015))(Lynam, Terence)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 RESPONSE in Opposition re #299 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Corrected Motion Partially to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stefan Boedeker (Opinions 1 and 2) filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Expert Report of Stefan Boedeker (Feb. 24, 2016), #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Excerpts of Deposition of Angela Ruckh (Mar. 24, 2016), #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Excerpts of Deposition of Constantijn Panis (Mar. 17, 2016), #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Excerpts of Deposition of Stefan Boedeker (Mar. 16, 2016), #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Declaration of Stefan Boedeker (Apr. 18, 2016))(Lynam, Terence)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 TRIAL CALENDAR for trial term May 2016. Jury Trial set for date certain of 5/16/2016 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/15/2016. (LAM)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 4/14/2016 re #264 MOTION for sanctions MOTION to preclude Defendants' use of untimely produced documents filed by Angela Ruckh. (DIGITAL) (LYB)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of hearing on Relator's Motion to Preclude Defendants' Use of Untimely Produced Documents and for Sanctions #264. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Any counsel who wish to appear by telephone shall notify chambers (813-301-5550), at least one hour prior to the hearing. On the date/time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 4/14/2016 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III (SLB)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Sealed Documents S-304 & S-305. (AMD)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of hearing re #292--motion for summary judgment. Motion hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. (BK)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #294--motion to file an excerpt from medical records and summaries under seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/11/2016. (BK)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying #296--motion to continue pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/11/2016. (BK)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 PRETRIAL statement by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Relator's Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Exhibit List, (Image deleted per Order doc #340) #3 Exhibit C - Relator's Deposition Designations, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Deposition Designations)(Strikis, Silvija) Modified on 4/22/2016 (AG). Modified attachment #2 on 4/26/2016 (AMD).
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Corrected Motion Partially to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stefan Boedeker (Opinions 1 and 2) by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report by Stefan Boedeker, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Constantijn Panis, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Stefan Boedeker)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ***Termed - Incorrect event. Counsel will re-file*** AMENDED document by Angela Ruckh. Amendment to #285 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion Partially to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stefan Boedeker (Opinions 1 and 2) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report by Stefan Boedeker, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Constantijn Panis, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Stefan Boedeker)(Strikis, Silvija) Modified on 4/8/2016 (AMD).
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 RESPONSE in Opposition re #296 MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 DECLARATION of Robert Salcido re #292 MOTION for summary judgment by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Facts & R.S. Declaration Exhibits 1-20, #2 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 21 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 21 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 23 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 23 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 24 (Part 1), #8 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 24 (Part 2), #9 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 24 (Part 3), #10 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibits 25-39, #11 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 40 (Part 1), #12 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 40 (Part 2), #13 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibits 41-48)(Lynam, Terence)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION for leave to file under seal by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynam, Terence)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ***TERMED - incorrect event. Counsel to re-file using event 'Declaration'.*** MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Summary Judgment by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Facts & R.S. Declaration Exhibits 1-20, #2 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 21 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 21 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 23 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 23 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 24 (Part 1), #8 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 24 (Part 2), #9 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 24 (Part 3), #10 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibits 25-39, #11 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 40 (Part 1), #12 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibit 40 (Part 2), #13 Exhibit R.S. Declaration Exhibits 41-48)(Lynam, Terence) Modified on 4/6/2016 (AMD).
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION for summary judgment by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude The Testimony of Relator in Her Capacity as an Expert Witness by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Excerpts of Deposition of A. Ruckh (Mar. 24, 2016) (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B. Relator's Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(C), #3 Exhibit C. Relator's Amended Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(C), #4 Exhibit D. Excerpts of Deposition of A. Ruckh (Oct. 29, 2015), #5 Exhibit E. Letter from R. Beynon to T. Lynam (Mar. 22, 2016), #6 Exhibit F. CV of A. Ruckh)(Lynam, Terence)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Proposed Testimony of Relator's Expert Marvette Lowrie-Morris by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of J. Hurst, #2 Exhibit B. Excerpts of Deposition of M. Lowrie-Morris (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C. Excerpts of Deposition of A. Buzzell, #4 Exhibit D. Excerpts of Deposition of S. Bradley, #5 Exhibit E. Excerpts of Deposition of G. Palega, M.D.)(Lynam, Terence)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Steven Pelovitz by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Steven Pelovitz, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Steven Pelovitz, #3 Exhibit C - March 17, 2016 Email from C. Creely to E. Heard)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Gregory Palega, M.D. by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Gregory Palega, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Gregory Palega, #3 Exhibit C - Palega Summary of Patient 515, #4 Exhibit D - Palega Summary of Patient 465)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Scott Heichel by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Scott Heichel, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of Scott Heichel, #3 Exhibit C - Expert Report of Shirley Bradley, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Deposition of Shirley Bradley, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibit C to Expert Report of Shirley Bradley)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Peter Dressel by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Report of Peter Dressel, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Marvette Lowrie-Morris, #3 Exhibit C - Expert Report of Peter Dressel, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Deposition of Peter Dressel, #5 Exhibit E - Compiled Articles, #6 Exhibit F Part 1 - Dressel Deposition Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit F Part 2 - Dressel Deposition Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit F Part 3 - Dressel Deposition Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit F Part 4 - Dressel Deposition Exhibit 3)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion Partially to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stefan Boedeker (Opinions 1 and 2) by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report by Stefan Boedeker, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Constantijn Panis, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of Stefan Boedeker)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert Marc Vianello by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Sample UB-04 Form, #2 Exhibit B. Excerpts of Deposition of Ann Buzzell, #3 Exhibit C. Excerpts of Deposition of Marc Vianello)(Lynam, Terence)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert Shirley Bradley by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Excerpts of Deposition of Shirley Bradley)(Lynam, Terence)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Relator's Proposed Expert on Statistical Sampling by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Excerpts of Deposition of Caroline Packer, #2 Exhibit B. Excerpts of Deposition of Constantijn Panis, #3 Exhibit C. Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #4 Exhibit D. Letter from R. Beynon to T. Lynam Mar. 28, 2016)(Lynam, Terence)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #280 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/25/2016. (LYB)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ***TERMED - Counsel directed to re-file as a Motion*** STIPULATION re #258 Order on motion to extend time by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Modified on 3/22/2016 (AMD).
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry. (CS)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 2/22/16 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Claudia Spangler-Fry,Telephone number (813)301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/29/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (CS)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE by Angela Ruckh Pursuant to Local Rule 3.09(b) (Strikis, Silvija)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #272 Supplement, #264 Motion for SanctionsMotion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lynam, Terence)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ENDORSED ORDER granting #273 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Scott R. Lilly terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/1/2016. (SLB)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Unopposed MOTION for Scott R. Lilly and Florida Health Law Center Tampa, PLLC to withdraw as attorney for Defendants by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion of Florida Health Law Center Tampa, PLLC, and Scott R. Lilly to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants)(Lilly, Scott)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 SUPPLEMENT re #266 Supplement, #264 MOTION for sanctions MOTION to preclude Defendants' use of untimely produced documents by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feb. 24, 2016 Letter from T. Lynam to Counsel)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 2/22/2016 re #264 MOTION for sanctions MOTION to preclude Defendants' use of untimely produced documents filed by Angela Ruckh. (DIGITAL) (LYB)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF HEARING: telephone conference on Relator's Motion for Sanctions and to Preclude Defendants' Use of Untimely Produced Documents set for 2/22/2016 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. On the date/time specified, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #266 Supplement to Relator's Motion to Preclude and for Sanctions filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of P. Dressel)(Lynam, Terence)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #264 Motion for SanctionsMotion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Thomas, #2 Exhibit Deposition excerpts, #3 Exhibit Declaration of P. Dressel)(Lynam, Terence)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SUPPLEMENT re #264 MOTION for sanctions and to preclude Defendants' use of untimely produced documents MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to preclude use of documents produced on 1/28/2016 and 2/10/2016 by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feb. 10, 2016 Letter from T. Lynam to S. Strikis, et al.)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III for disposition: #264--motion for sanctions and to preclude the defendants' use of certain documents. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/2/2016. (BK)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MOTION for sanctions and MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to preclude use of documents on 1/28/2016 by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Relator's 3rd Set of Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Relator's 4th Set of Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit C - Feb 6, 2015 Email from J. Ward to T. Dunsford, #4 Exhibit D - Feb 14, 2015 Email from J. Ward to T. Dunsford, #5 Exhibit E - Defendants' Chart of Medical Records Produced, #6 Exhibit F - Relator's 5th Set of Requests for Production, #7 Exhibit G - Defendants' Responses to Relator's First Set of Requests for Admission, #8 Exhibit H - Defendants' Supplemental Responses to Relator's First Set of Requests for Admission, #9 Exhibit I - Letter from T. Lynam to R. Beynon, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpts from Deposition Transcript of A. Ardoin)(Strikis, Silvija). Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III for disposition. Modified on 2/2/2016 (BK). Modified on 2/11/2016 (AG).
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #262--motion to substitute counsel; Jill Bennett is substituted for Magdalena Anna Ozarowski as counsel for the State of Florida; directing the clerk to TERMINATE Ozarowski. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/25/2016. (BK) Modified attorney name on 1/26/2016 (AMD).
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by State of Florida. (Bennett, Jill)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ENDORSED ORDER granting #259 the parties' unopposed motion, based on the extraordinary weather in Washington, D. C. on January 22, 2016, and the days following, to extend through February 16, 2016, the time within which to depose Scott Bartos. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/25/2016.
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE by State of Florida of Substitution of Counsel (Bennett, Jill)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Consent MOTION to extend time to Take Deposition of Scott Bartos After January 22, 2016 by Angela Ruckh. (Hall, Joseph)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2016 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday (EJC)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting in part Defendants' Motion for Additional Time #255. The case management deadlines are amended as follows: Defendants' rebuttal expert disclosures due 2/25/2016; expert discovery deadline 3/21/2016; any mediation shall occur on or before 3/30/2016; dispositive and/or Daubert motions due 4/5/2016; joint pretrial statement due 4/11/2016; and pretrial conference on 4/14/2016 at 11:00 a.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the district judge, this case remains set on the trial term commencing 5/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 1/8/2016. (SLB)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION to extend time to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports Correction of Docket #256 filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Silvija A. Strikis, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter from J. Hall to T. Lynam, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter from T. Lynam to R. Beynon, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Deposition of R. Thomas, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Deposition of A. Buzzell, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Deposition of P. Demayo, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Deposition of J. Rousey, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Deposition of K. Morgan, #9 Exhibit 8 - Salus Strategic Planning Document, #10 Exhibit 9 - Email string, #11 Exhibit 10 - RUG Enhancement Document)(Strikis, Silvija)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 [TERMINATED] RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION to extend time to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Silvija A. Strikis, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter from J. Hall to T. Lynam, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter from T. Lynam to R. Beynon, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Deposition of R. Thomas, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Deposition of A. Buzzell, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Deposition of P. Demayo, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Deposition of J. Rousey, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Deposition of K. Morgan, #9 Exhibit 8 - Salus Strategic Planning Document, #10 Exhibit 9 - Email string, #11 Exhibit 10 - RUG Enhancement Document)(Strikis, Silvija)NOTE: Counsel notified the Clerk's Office of error in filing document, corrected documents filed at doc. 257. Modified on 1/7/2016 (LD).
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION to extend time to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Lynam, Terence)
November 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE to counsel Stanley E. Woodward of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (EJC)
November 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE to counsel Robert S. Salcido of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (EJC)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #251--motion regarding deadlines: initial expert reports due 12/11/15; rebuttal expert reports due 1/11/2016; deadline for expert discovery is 2/12/2016; deadline for dispositive motions and Daubert motions is 2/24/2016. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/25/2015. (BK)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Joint MOTION to extend time to certain case deadlines by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #249 joint stipulation which is construed as a motion to extend the discovery deadline; discovery deadline extended to 11/24/2015. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/19/2015. (LAM)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #244 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #245 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #246 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #247 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 10/9/2015. (SLB)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Rebecca A. Beynon, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA032677) Related document: #247 MOTION for Rebecca A. Beynon to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION for Rebecca A. Beynon to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Robert S. Salcido, appearing on behalf of CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA032570.) Related document: #244 Unopposed MOTION for Robert S. Salcido to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Stanley E. Woodward, Jr., appearing on behalf of CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA032570.) Related document: #246 Unopposed MOTION for Stanley E. Woodward, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Terence J. Lynam, appearing on behalf of CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA032570.) Related document: #245 Unopposed MOTION for Terrence J. Lynam to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION for Stanley E. Woodward, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunsford, Tina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Unopposed MOTION for Terrence J. Lynam to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunsford, Tina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Robert S. Salcido to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunsford, Tina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties by #242 stipulation move for leave (1) to depose the defendants under Rule 30(b)(6) no later than November 20, 2015, and (2) to depose Scott Bartos no later than January 22, 2016. Notwithstanding the July 1, 2015 scheduling order (Doc. 231), the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/30/2015.
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION re #231 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Proposed Order by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #240 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney John B. Ward terminated. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/22/2015. (LAM)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION for John B. Ward to withdraw as attorney by Angela Ruckh. (Ward, John)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ENDORSED ORDER granting #237 motion for Bradley E. Oppenheimer, Esq., to appear pro hac vice; granting #238 motion for Jeffrey A. Love, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/11/2015. (SLB)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jeffrey A. Love, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA032105). Related document: #238 MOTION for Jeffrey A. Love to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Bradley E. Oppenheimer, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA032105). Related document: #237 MOTION for Bradley E. Oppenheimer to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION for Jeffrey A. Love to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MOTION for Bradley E. Oppenheimer to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2016 at 11:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III, Jury Trial set for May 2016 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/13/2015. (LAM)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER construing Doc. #218 as a report and recommendation; overruling #221--objections; adopting #218--report and recommendation; granting in part #187--motion for sanctions; referring to the magistrate judge for a report and recommendation: #222--affidavit, and #232--response in opposition; computing defendants' credit re mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/12/2015. (BK)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying #230--motion for leave to reply; denying #233--motion to strike. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/3/2015. (BK)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION to Strike #232 Objection by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 OBJECTION re #222 Affidavit Filed by John B. Ward Regarding Attorney's Fees. (Lilly, Scott)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #226 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be completed by 10/30/2015; expert disclosures by 12/2/2015; rebuttal expert disclosures by 12/23/2015; all expert discovery by 1/29/2016; and dispositive motions by 2/10/2016. Pretrial conference and trial term to be noticed by separate order of the district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 7/1/2015. (SRC) Modified on 8/11/2015 (SRC).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION for leave to file Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Limited Reply to Relator's Response to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge McCoun's May 19, 2015 Order by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lilly, Scott)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 RESPONSE re #221 Objection to Magistrate Judge McCoun's May 19, 2015 Order filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strikis, Silvija)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 RESPONSE re #223 Affidavit filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC from JUNE 17, 2015 to JULY 4, 2015. (Lilly, Scott)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Related Relief by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #224 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Stephen Vincent Iglesias terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 6/12/2015. (SLB) (SLB).
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC. (Lilly, Scott)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 AFFIDAVIT of TINA E. DUNSFORD re: #217 Order on Motion for Taxation of Costs by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC. (Dunsford, Tina)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 AFFIDAVIT of John B. Ward re: #218 Order on Motion for Protective OrderOrder on Motion for Sanctions Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Prosecuting Relator's Motion for Sanctions by Angela Ruckh. (Ward, John)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 OBJECTION re #218 Order on Motion for Protective OrderOrder on Motion for Sanctions by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Lilly, Scott)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ENDORSED ORDER granting #219 the defendant' unopposed motion for an extension through June 2, 2015, of the time within which to announce resolution of the dispute concerning a sanction amount or to submit an itemized affidavit of the sanctionable amounts. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/22/2015.
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Agree Upon Sanction Amount or to Submit Seorn Affidavit Itemizing Sanctionalbe Amounts by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER denying #176 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; granting in part#187 Relator's Motion for Sanctions. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 5/19/2015. (SLB)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #185--motion for taxation of costs; by 5/21/2015 the parties must announce agreement to a sanction amount or the defendants must submit an affidavit; by 6/4/2015 Ruckh may respond to affidavit. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/8/2015. (BK)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying #172--motion in limine. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/28/2015. (BK)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE ENTRY for 04/27/2015 proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Merryday: MOTION HEARING re #172 MOTION in limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Testimony filed by Angela Ruckh. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (LAM)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 04-21-15 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones,Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/18/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2015. (HWJ)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ENDORSED ORDER granting #210 the unopposed motion for "the parties' respective proposed sampling expert witnesses," Constantijn Panis and Stefan Boedeker, to attend telephonically the hearing on April 27, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. EDT. Panis and Boedeker (or someone in their stead) should call Becky Kline at 813-301-5001 after 10:00 a.m. EDT on April 27 and supply the telephone number from which each expert will listen to the hearing. Using those numbers, the Deputy Clerk will initiate the conference call at 2:00 p.m. EDT. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/24/2015.
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Consent MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Allowance of Telephonic Observance of Non-Evidentiry Hearing by Parties' Respective Expert Witnesses by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H. Gold on behalf of USA (Gold, Jonathan)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 4/21/2015 re #176 MOTION for protective order and the Appointment of an E-Discovery Special Master filed by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, CMC II, LLC, #187 MOTION for sanctions filed by Angela Ruckh. (DIGITAL) (SRC)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ENDORSED ORDER granting #200 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/20/2015. (SLB)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of hearing re #172--motion in limine to admit expert statistical sampling testimony. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2015 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. (BK)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ENDORSED ORDER granting #201 the motion to withdraw by Christopher A. Klimmek, who is terminated as counsel and removed from the service list. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/16/2015.
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #190 Response to motion by USA. (Harwell, Lacy)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 7, 2014 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones,Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/7/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2015. (HWJ)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher A. Klimmek to withdraw as attorney by Christopher A Klimmek. (Klimmek, Christopher)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ENDORSED ORDER denying #197 the defendants' motion for leave to reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/14/2015.
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION for sanctions to Relator's Motion to Enforce This Court's Discovery Orders and for Sanctions filed by CMC II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Lilly, Scott)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for leave to file to File Limited Reply to Relator's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Tax Mediation Costs Against Relator by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 Second MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ENDORSED ORDER granting #194 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Relator's Motion for Sanctions #187; denying as moot #193 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/10/2015. (SLB)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #187 MOTION for sanctions by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Relator's Motion to Enforce This Court's Discovery Orders and for Sanctions by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Lilly, Scott)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ENDORSED ORDER denying #189 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/7/2015. (SLB)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE OF HEARING on #176 MOTION for Protective Order and the Appointment of an E-Discovery Special Master, and #187 MOTION for Sanctions . Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2015 at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Any counsel who wish to appear by telephone shall notify chambers (813-301-5550), at least one day prior to the hearing. On the date/time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RESPONSE to Motion re #172 MOTION in limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Testimony filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Boedeker deposition transcript), #2 Exhibit B (US ex rel Christensen v. Everglades College memorandum opinion))(Harwell, Lacy)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for leave to file Limited Reply to Relator's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III for a report and recommendation (if granted) or for disposition (if denied): #187--motion by Angela Ruckh for sanctions. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/30/2015. (BK)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION for sanctions by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Strikis, Silvija)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #176 MOTION for protective order and the Appointment of an E-Discovery Special Master and Cross-Motion for Sanctions filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strikis, Silvija) **COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO FILE SEPARATE CROSS-MOTION FOR SANCTIONS.**Modified on 3/27/2015 (DMS).
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Taxation of Mediation Costs Against Relator by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Modified text on 3/25/2015 (RFK).
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER denying #182--motion for leave to reply; granting #183--motion for leave to file a statement of interest (due 4/7/2015). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/23/2015. (BK)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to File Statement of Interest by USA. (Harwell, Lacy)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Relator's Motion in Limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Testimony by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REQUEST for oral argument re #176 MOTION for protective order and the Appointment of an E-Discovery Special Master by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REQUEST for oral argument re #179 Response in Opposition to Motion In Limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Methodology by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #172 MOTION in limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Testimony filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lilly, Scott)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ENDORSED ORDER granting #177 the defendants' unopposed motion for an extension through March 17, 2015, of the time within which to respond to the relator's motion in limine. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/17/2015.
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to 3/17/15 to Reply to Relator's Motion in Limine to Admit Expert Statistical Testimony [DE 172] by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for protective order and the Appointment of an E-Discovery Special Master by CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lilly, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ENDORSED ORDER granting #174 the defendants' motion for an extension through March 16, 2015, of the time within which to respond to the relator's motion in limine (Doc. 172). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/7/2015.
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #172 MOTION in limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Testimony by All Defendants. (Lilly, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEDIATION report Hearing held on February 24, 2015. Hearing outcome: The parties have reached an impasse.. (Grilli, Peter)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION in limine To Admit Expert Statistical Sampling Testimony by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #169 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Vilma Martinez and Jennifer Watson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 2/12/2015. (SLB)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Lilly on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Lilly, Scott)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION for J. Watson & V. Martinez to withdraw as attorney by All Defendants. (Martinez, Vilma) Modified text on 2/5/2015 (EJC).
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 11:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III; jury trial set for the February 2016 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday; ORDER granting the parties motion to permit twenty depositions by each side; requiring mediation as scheduled on 2/24/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/28/2015. (BK)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE re #165 Compliance notice filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strikis, Silvija)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE of compliance re #162 Order on motion to stay, #151 Order on motion to compelOrder on Motion for Protective Order by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Part 1, #2 Exhibit A- Part 2, #3 Exhibit A- Part 3, #4 Exhibit B- Part 1, #5 Exhibit B- Part 2, #6 Exhibit C)(Dunsford, Tina)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER overruling #156--objection; directing the parties to submit an amended case management report by 12/29/2014. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/18/2014. (BK)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE re #156 Objection, #157 MOTION to stay OR MODIFY PRODUCTION DEADLINES PENDING DISTRICT JUDGE'S RULING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART RELATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Strikis, Silvija)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting in part #157--motion to stay; extending the discovery deadline to 12/19/2014. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/11/2014. (BK)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SUPPLEMENT re #157 MOTION to stay OR MODIFY PRODUCTION DEADLINES PENDING DISTRICT JUDGE'S RULING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART RELATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION, #160 Supplement (CORRECTED) by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SUPPLEMENT re #157 MOTION to stay OR MODIFY PRODUCTION DEADLINES PENDING DISTRICT JUDGE'S RULING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART RELATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SUPPLEMENT re #156 Objection to the Magistrate's Discovery Order by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina E. Dunsford on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Dunsford, Tina)
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to stay OR MODIFY PRODUCTION DEADLINES PENDING DISTRICT JUDGE'S RULING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART RELATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) by All Defendants. (Iglesias, Stephen)
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OBJECTION re #151 Order on motion to compelOrder on Motion for Protective Order . (Iglesias, Stephen)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED ANSWER to (and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants) to the Revised Second Amended Complaint by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENDORSED ORDER granting #132 Defendants' motion to amend answer and affirmative defenses. Defendants filed proposed amendments and the Relator has withdrawn her opposition to the motion. Defendants shall file their Amended Answer and Affirmatives Defenses to the Revised Second Amended Complaint within five days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 11/18/2014. (SLB)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE re #150 Compliance notice filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for protective order and Reply to DE 143 relate to DE 148, not 143 filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Iglesias, Stephen)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #143 Relator's Motion to Compel ; granting in part and denying in part #145 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 11/14/2014. (SLB)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of compliance re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Relator's Revised Second Amended Complaint (per Court's verbal order) by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Defendants' [Proposed] Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Revised Second Amended Complaint)(Iglesias, Stephen)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 11/7/2014 re #143 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Angela Ruckh, #145 MOTION for protective order and Reply to DE 143 filed by 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (DIGITAL) (SRC)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for protective order and Reply to DE 143 and Cross-Motion To Compel Production filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Strikis, Silvija)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Tuesday, February 24, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli. (Grilli, Peter)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of hearing on Relator's Motion to Compel #143 and Defendants' Motion for Protective Order #145. Hearing set for 11/7/2014 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Any counsel who wish to appear by telephone shall notify chambers (813-301-5550), at least one day prior to the hearing. On the date/time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for protective order and Reply to DE 143 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Relator's Third Request for Production, #2 Exhibit 2- Relator's Fourth Request for Production, #3 Exhibit 3- Letter from Opposing Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4- Declaration from Jami Hurst, #5 Exhibit 5- Email regarding vacation hours, #6 Exhibit 6- Declaration of Mark Peterson, #7 Exhibit 7- CIDs from DOJ, #8 Exhibit 8- Hearing Transcript Excerpts May 1, 2014, #9 Exhibit 9- Hearing Transcript Excerpts July 10, 2014, #10 Exhibit 10- Opposing Counsel Ledger AHCA, #11 Exhibit 11- Declaration of Brad Lauzon, #12 Exhibit 12- Supplemental Production, #13 Exhibit 13- General Description of Documents Produced to Relator on CD or DVD, #14 Exhibit 14- Examples of Documents Produced to Relator from Clearwell)(Iglesias, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of change of address by Stephen Vincent Iglesias (Iglesias, Stephen)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Compel Production by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Strikis, Silvija) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ENDORSED ORDER granting #141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kari Aasheim terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/26/2014. (SLB)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Kari Aasheim to withdraw as attorney by All Defendants. (Aasheim, Kari)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying without prejudice #134 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/8/2014. (SRC)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC of Intent to Seek Leave of Court to File the July 10, 2014 Hearing Transcript Under Seal (Martinez, Vilma)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on July 10, 2014 before Judge Thomas B. McCoun, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones,Telephone number 813-301-5024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/11/2014, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2014, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2014. (HWJ)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III for disposition: #132--motion re deadline to amend. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/21/2014. (BK)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Written designation and consent to act by Kevin J. Darken on behalf of Angela Ruckh. Local Counsel: Kevin J. Darken. Non-Resident Counsel: Drew A. Navikas. (Darken, Kevin)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION for Drew A. Navikas, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Proof of good standing.)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Relator's Revised Second Amended Complaint filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Strikis, Silvija)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Relator's Revised Second Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martinez, Vilma)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER overruling #130--objections; adopting #124--REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding case management deadlines; scheduling the pre-trial conference for 9/3/2015 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge McCoun; placing this matter on the October 2015 trial docket. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/29/2014. (BK)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Reset jury trial for the 10/2015 trial calendar; schedule final pretrial conference for 9/3/2015 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. (BK)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE re #124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #100 Case Management Report. filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER overruling #122--objection; denying as moot #120--motion to dismiss; directing service on Florida; directing the Clerk to serve Florida with each future order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/23/2014. (BK)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENDORSED ORDER denying the defendants' #127 motion for leave to reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/23/2014.
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief Under Middle District Local Rule 3.01(c) by All Defendants. (Martinez, Vilma)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and subject matter filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and subject matter filed by State of Florida. (Ozarowski, Magdalena)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPORT on Preliminary Pretrial Conference and #100 Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 7/10/2014. (SLB)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/10/2014. (DIGITAL) (SRC)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #121 Notice (Other) of Election to Decline Intervention, filed by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Martinez, Vilma)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by State of Florida Of Election to Decline Intervention (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ozarowski, Magdalena)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and subject matter by All Defendants. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2014 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Any counsel who wish to appear by telephone shall notify chambers (813-301-5550), at least one day prior to the hearing. On the date/time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of change of address by Kevin J. Darken (Darken, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Vincent Iglesias on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Iglesias, Stephen)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #101 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part #104 Motion to Quash; denying as moot #114 Motion to supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 5/6/2014. (ATL)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 5/1/2014 re #101 MOTION to quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Parties or in the Alternative, Motion for Protectiver Order filed by 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC, #104 MOTION to quash Subpoena to Produce Documents Information or Objects by Non-Party filed by Warburg Pincus Equity Partners LP. (DIGITAL) (SRC)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to supplement Authority in support of Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Parties, or, In the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Martinez, Vilma)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: arguments on motions to quash #101 #104 previously scheduled for 4/17/2014 are rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: 5/1/2014 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Any counsel who wish to appear by telephone shall notify chambers (813-301-5550), at least one day prior to the hearing. On the date/time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key.(SLB)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ENDORSED ORDER granting #111 Relator's consent motion to reschedule April 17, 2014, hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/8/2014. (SLB)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Consent MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Reschedule April 17, 2014 Hearing by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
March 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ENDORSED ORDER denying #93 the defendants' motion for clarification. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/29/2014.
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ENDORSED ORDER denying #107 Non-Party's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/18/2014. (SLB)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE OF HEARING: arguments on Non-Party Warburg Pincus Equity Partners, LP's Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order #104 and Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Parties or, in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order #101 set for 4/17/2014 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Any counsel who wish to appear by telephone shall notify chambers (813-301-5550), at least one day prior to the hearing. On the date/time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for leave to file Brief Reply to Relator's Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena by Warburg Pincus Equity Partners LP. (McDermott, Paul)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CERTIFICATE of service by Angela Ruckh re #105 Memorandum in opposition . (Strikis, Silvija)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #104 Motion to Quash filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to quash Subpoena to Produce Documents Information or Objects by Non-Party by Warburg Pincus Equity Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McDermott, Paul)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION to quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Parties or in the Alternative, Motion for Protectiver Order filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC re #101 MOTION to quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Parties or in the Alternative, Motion for Protectiver Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Warburg Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Formation Capital Subpoena Exb 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibits Formation Capital Subpoena, #4 Exhibit AHT Subpoena Exb 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibits AHT Subpoena, #6 Exhibit MedBest Subpoena Exb 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibits MedBest Subpoena)(Aasheim, Kari) Modified doc # on 2/4/2014 (JNB).
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Parties or in the Alternative, Motion for Protectiver Order by All Defendants. (Aasheim, Kari)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Strikis, Silvija)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #63 Amended Complaint by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC.(Aasheim, Kari)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement G Creek by 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari) Modified on 1/27/2014 (DMS).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement Sea Crest by Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari) Modified on 1/27/2014 (DMS).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement Salus by Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari) Modified on 1/27/2014 (DMS).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement Marshall by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari) Modified on 1/27/2014 (DMS).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement CMC II by Consulate Management Company, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari) Modified on 1/27/2014 (DMS).
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for clarification re #92 Order on motion to dismiss Court's Order dated January 14, 2014 by All Defendants. (Aasheim, Kari)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER lifting the 3/5/2013 stay; denying #82, #83, #84, and #85--motions to dismiss; both the answer to the second amended complaint and the amended case management report are due 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/14/2014. (BK)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89--motion to continue trial and pre-trial. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/1/2013. (BK)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88--motion by Anna Small to withdraw as counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/27/2013. (BK)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for New Trial Joint Motion to Adjourn Case Managment Schedule by All Defendants. (Aasheim, Kari)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Anna G. Small to withdraw as attorney by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC. (Small, Anna)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #83 Motion to dismiss, #85 Motion to dismiss, #82 Motion to dismiss, #84 Motion to dismiss filed by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of service by Angela Ruckh re #75 Amended Complaint . (Strikis, Silvija)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss Revised Second Amended Complaint by 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss Revised Second Amended Complaint by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Revised Second Amended Complaint by CMC II, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended complaint by Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION by 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC for costs. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78--motion for clarification; response to complaint due 6/17/2013; denying #79--motion to lift stay. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/6/2013. (BK)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Lift Stay of Discovery by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for clarification re #71 Order on motion to compelOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on Motion for Sanctions by All Defendants. (Aasheim, Kari)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Vilma Martinez on behalf of 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, CMC II, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC (Martinez, Vilma)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by Angela Ruckh Relator's Notice of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Strikis, Silvija)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Revised Second Amended Complaint) against 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC, CMC II, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Strikis, Silvija)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEDIATION report Hearing held on May 29, 2013. Hearing outcome: the parties have reached an impasse.. (Grilli, Peter)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ENDORSED ORDER denying #72 the "consent" motion to delay mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/28/2013.
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Consent MOTION to extend time to Mediate by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #60--the relator's motion to enforce order, motion to compel production, and motion for sanctions; directing the defendants to produce documents by 5/24/2013; directing the relator to file a notice and amend the second amended complaint by 6/3/2013. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/20/2013. (BK)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION to Compel Production in Response to Relator's Request No. 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Enforce This Court's March 5, 2013 Order MOTION for sanctions filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strikis, Silvija)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER granting #67 the plaintiff's motion for leave to file a five-page reply (confined to the topics stated in the motion) not later than May 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/16/2013.
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED ORDER granting #64 the defendants' motion for an extension through June 7, 2013, of the time within which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/16/2013.
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Relator's Motion To Enforce This Court's March 5, 2013 Order, To Compel Document Responses, and for Sanctions by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of service by Angela Ruckh re #63 Amended Complaint . (Strikis, Silvija)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION to Compel Production in Response to Relator's Request No. 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Enforce This Court's March 5, 2013 Order MOTION for sanctions filed by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Small, Anna)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Watson, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED COMPLAINT Relator's Second Amended Complaint against Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, Consulate Management Company, LLC, 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC, d/b/a Marshall Health and Rehabilitation Center, Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC, 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC, d/b/a Governor's Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center with Jury Demand. filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Strikis, Silvija)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of service by Angela Ruckh re #61 Declaration, #60 MOTION to Compel Production in Response to Relator's Request No. 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Enforce This Court's March 5, 2013 Order MOTION for sanctions . (Ward, John)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION of Joseph S. Hall re #60 MOTION to Compel Production in Response to Relator's Request No. 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Enforce This Court's March 5, 2013 Order MOTION for sanctions by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ward, John)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Compel Production in Response to Relator's Request No. 4, MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Enforce This Court's March 5, 2013 Order, MOTION for sanctions by Angela Ruckh. (Ward, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting the parties' construed motion for a protective order #58 and approving the parties' Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order)(SLB)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION Regarding Entry of Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Small, Anna)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #41 Relator's Motion for Protective Order based on representation by defense counsel that the matter has been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/3/2013. (SLB)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE canceling hearing on Relator's Motion for Protective Order #41 scheduled for 4/4/2013. Counsel for Defendant has advised chambers that the matter has been resolved. (SLB)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER granting #50 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #51 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #52 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/25/2013. (SRC)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING on #41 MOTION for protective order Regarding Confidentiality of Records. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. NOTE: The court has set aside 30 minutes for the hearing. On the date/time specified, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 1303 followed by the # (pound) key. (SRC)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney John B. Ward, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA16448.). (JNB)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Christopher A. Klimmek, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA16448.). (JNB)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Charles F. Kester, appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA16454.). (JNB)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CERTIFICATE of service by Angela Ruckh re #52 Unopposed MOTION for John B. Ward to appear pro hac vice, #51 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher A. Klimmek to appear pro hac vice . (Darken, Kevin)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for John B. Ward to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher A. Klimmek to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Charles F. Kester to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Jennifer Lee Watson on behalf of Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC (Watson, Jennifer)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER on #37 Motion for Protective Order; #43 Motion to Compel; #19 and #20 motions to dismiss. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/5/2013. (TKD)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of change of address by Royston Delaney (Delaney, Royston)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Relator's First Set of Document Requests filed by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Small, Anna)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for protective order Regarding Confidentiality of Records filed by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Small, Anna)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Silvija A. Strikis re #43 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Relator's First Set of Document Requests by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Relator's First Set of Document Requests by Angela Ruckh. (Strikis, Silvija) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECLARATION of Silvija A. Strikis re #41 MOTION for protective order Regarding Confidentiality of Records by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Strikis, Silvija)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for protective order Regarding Confidentiality of Records by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Aasheim on behalf of Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC (Aasheim, Kari)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for protective order MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strikis, Silvija)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 **TERMINATED FOR IMPROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE.**RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for protective order MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Delaney, Royston) Modified on 1/31/2013 (DMS).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Motions no longer referred: #37 MOTION for protective order MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law. (DMS)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for protective order , MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Small, Anna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting the #35 unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel filed by Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr., Esq., and B. Scott McBride, Esq. The Clerk is directed to terminate attorneys Thielhelm and McBride. The record shall reflect Anna G. Small, Esq., of Allen Dell, P.A., as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 1/10/2013. (SLB)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr. and B. Scott McBride to withdraw as attorney and to Substitute Counsel for Defendants by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Thielhelm, Robert)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for clarification and Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/3/2013. (TKD)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION for clarification re #27 Case management and scheduling order by All Plaintiffs. (Delaney, Royston)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 unopposed motion for Joseph S. Hall, Esq., to appear pro hac vice; granting #30 unopposed motion for Silvija A. Strikis, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 12/27/2012. (SLB)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 29, 2013 @ 9:30 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli, Esq.(Grilli, Peter)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Silvija A. Strikis appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA14905.) (JNB)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Joseph S. Hall appearing on behalf of Angela Ruckh (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA14905.) (JNB)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Silvija A. Strikis to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph S. Hall to appear pro hac vice by Angela Ruckh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admision Attorney Certification)(Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation before Peter J. Grill. Lead counsel Rory Delaney to coordinate dates and file notice of mediation within 20 days. Mediation shall be conducted on or before June 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/4/2012. (TKD)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III, Jury Trial set for the November, 2013, trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/4/2012. (TKD)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #20 Motion to dismiss, #19 Motion to dismiss filed by Angela Ruckh. (Delaney, Royston)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McBride, B.)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 motion for B. Scott McBride, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 10/9/2012. (SLB)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney B. Scott McBride appearing on behalf of Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA13643.) (JNB)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER construing Doc. #21--stipulation, as an unopposed motion; granting #21--motion to extend to 10/31/2012 the time within which Relator may respond to the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/5/2012. (BK)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for B. Scott McBride to appear pro hac vice by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Certification)(Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) and Memorandum of Law in Support, #19 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) and Memorandum of Law in Support JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR RELATOR TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Angela Ruckh. (Darken, Kevin)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) and Memorandum of Law in Support by Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) and Memorandum of Law in Support by Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC. (Thielhelm, Robert)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 8/6/2012 by Angela Ruckh as to Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC. (Darken, Kevin)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 8/7/2012 by Angela Ruckh as to Salus Rehabilitation, LLC. (Darken, Kevin)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC, Salus Rehabilitation, LLC, with Jury Demand filed by Angela Ruckh.(Darken, Kevin) Modified party names on 8/3/2012 (DMS).
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Written designation and consent to act by Kevin J. Darken on behalf of Jane Doe. Local Counsel: Kevin J. Darken. Non-Resident Counsel: Rory Delaney. (Darken, Kevin)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Rory Delaney appearing on behalf of Jane Doe (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA12021.) (JNB)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 motion for Rory Delaney, Esq., to appear pro hac vice. Counsel is directed to file a written designation and consent-to-act in accordance with Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 6/22/2012. (SLB)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Rory Delaney to appear pro hac vice by Jane Doe. (Darken, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (TKD)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/17/2012. (DMS)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of nonintervention by USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (DMS)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in support re 7 Exparte application for extension filed by USA. (DMS)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in support re 4 Exparte application for extension filed by USA. (DMS)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to seal case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/21/2011. (DMS)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION to seal case pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730(b) by Jane Doe. (DMS)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 QUI TAM COMPLAINT under False Claims Act against La Vie Health Care Centers, Inc., with Jury Demand (Filing fee $350 receipt number TPA5671) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruckh v. CMC II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ruckh
Represented By: Royston Delaney
Represented By: Joseph S. Hall
Represented By: Silvija A. Strikis
Represented By: James M. Webster, III
Represented By: John B. Ward
Represented By: Kevin J. Darken
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Love
Represented By: Bradley E. Oppenheimer
Represented By: Christopher A. Klimmek
Represented By: Charles F. Kester
Represented By: Derek T. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC II, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Michael Luce
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: Stanley E. Woodward
Represented By: Jason Alex Watson
Represented By: Terence J. Lynam
Represented By: Robert S. Salcido
Represented By: Catherine E. Creely
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Crest Health Care Management, LLC
Represented By: Carroll Skehan
Represented By: Gregory Michael Luce
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: Stanley E. Woodward
Represented By: Jason Alex Watson
Represented By: Terence J. Lynam
Represented By: Robert S. Salcido
Represented By: Catherine E. Creely
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Jennifer Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 803 Oak Street Operations, LLC doing business as Governor's Creek Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Carroll Skehan
Represented By: Gregory Michael Luce
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: Stanley E. Woodward
Represented By: Jason Alex Watson
Represented By: Terence J. Lynam
Represented By: Robert S. Salcido
Represented By: Catherine E. Creely
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Jennifer Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salus Rehabilitation, LLC doing business as LaVie Rehab
Represented By: Carroll Skehan
Represented By: Gregory Michael Luce
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: Stanley E. Woodward
Represented By: Jason Alex Watson
Represented By: Terence J. Lynam
Represented By: Robert S. Salcido
Represented By: B. Scott McBride
Represented By: Catherine E. Creely
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Jennifer Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Represented By: Anna Gay Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 207 Marshall Drive Operations, LLC doing business as Marshall Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Carroll Skehan
Represented By: Gregory Michael Luce
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: Stanley E. Woodward
Represented By: Jason Alex Watson
Represented By: Terence J. Lynam
Represented By: Robert S. Salcido
Represented By: Catherine E. Creely
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Jennifer Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulate Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Jennifer Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genoa Healthcare Consulting, LLC doing business as LaVie Care Centers
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R. Lilly
Represented By: B. Scott McBride
Represented By: Vilma Martinez
Represented By: Kari L. Aasheim
Represented By: Tina Elizabeth Dunsford
Represented By: Jennifer Watson
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Iglesias
Represented By: Anna Gay Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Warburg Pincus Equity Partners LP
Represented By: Paul Andrew McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Steven S Oscher
Represented By: Pedro F. Bajo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Christopher A Klimmek
Represented By: Christopher A. Klimmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Florida
Represented By: Jill Bennett
Represented By: Magdalena Anna Ozarowski
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Gold
Represented By: William Edward Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?