Candlelight Mini Storage, Inc. v. Chubb Group Insurance Companies
Plaintiff: Candlelight Mini Storage, Inc.
Defendant: Chubb Group Insurance Companies
Case Number: 8:2012cv00393
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hernando
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Pizzo
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending motions are denied as moot. Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/17/2013. (LN)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Second Amended Complaint 17 is DENIED. Defendant shall file an Answer to the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 14 within 14 days. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/24/2012. (LN)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 is granted. Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, for foreclosure, is dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff may replead its complaint, in accordance with the instructions stated in the Order, within 20 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/13/2012. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candlelight Mini Storage, Inc. v. Chubb Group Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group Insurance Companies
Represented By: Joshua A. Mize
Represented By: Anne-Leigh Gaylord Moe
Represented By: Edward O. Savitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candlelight Mini Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Rey
Represented By: Stephanie M Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?