Regions Bank v. Kaplan et al

Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: Marvin I Kaplan, R1A Palms, LLC, Lighthouse Pointe, LLC, Wells Fargo, N.A., Triple Net Exchange, LLC, MK Investing, LLC, BNK Smith, LLC and Smith Advertising & Associates, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Robert Shaw, The Florida Bankers Association, Inc., Charles A. Starr III, G. Todd Smith, Gary T. Smith, Lucy B. Smith, Bridgeview Bancorp, Inc., Regions Bank, Smith Advertising & Associates, Inc. and Wells Fargo, N.A.
Counter_claimant: BNK Smith, LLC, R1A Palms, LLC, Triple Net Exchange, LLC, MK Investing, LLC and Marvin I Kaplan
Case Number: 8:2012cv01837
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Mark A. Pizzo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2016 757 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the scheduled continuation of the bench trial on Friday, July 8, 2016 and Friday, July 15, 2016; deferring ruling on all punitive damage issues until a final determination as to liability and the award of compensatory damages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/24/2016. (JM)
May 18, 2016 743 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 504 Order on Sealed Motion, affirming Order and overruling objections. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/18/2016. (JM)
May 12, 2016 738 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 707 Motion to Compel financial worth discovery. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/12/2016. (JM)
May 6, 2016 724 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 695 Objection, overruling Objections to Order (Dkt. 694), and directing Defendants to comply with Order to produce tax returns. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/6/2016. (JM)
May 2, 2016 715 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 710 Motion for Reconsideration re 703 Order on Motion in Limine; granting exclusion of Witness Michael Gallatin. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/2/2016. (JM)
April 29, 2016 703 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 628 Motion in Limine; see Order for details; granting 653 Motion in Limine, except for Michael Gallatin; denying as moot 664 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/29/2016. (JM)
April 19, 2016 657 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 550 Motion for summary judgment as to Count II, Conspiracy to Defraud, of the Amended Counterclaim/Crossclaim (Dkt. 93). Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/19/2016. (JM)
March 31, 2016 624 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 358 Motion for Attorney Fees. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/31/2016. (JM)
December 3, 2015 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 568 Amended Consent Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/3/2015. (JM)
November 13, 2015 534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 533 Consent Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/13/2015. (JM)
November 4, 2015 527 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 521 Joint Motion for leave to file Single Statement of Undisputed Facts, and to Exceed Page Limit (not more than 45 pages). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/4/2015. (JM)
September 25, 2015 504 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 472 Bridgeview Bank Group's motion to determine that certain testimony of Marvin Kaplan is not privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 9/25/2015. (CRJ)
September 8, 2015 481 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 458 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Extend Discovery pending resolution of related criminal proceedings; the Motion to Stay is denied; the Motion to Extend Discovery is granted to permit the deposition s of Regions' 30(b)(6) witnesses, Robert Shaw, Brandy Burnett, and Larry Starr, to be completed no later than October 15, 2015; the Supplement to Motion to Stay is denied as tothe depositions of Walter Schultz and Matthew Schultz.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/8/2015. (JM)
August 24, 2015 461 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 446 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to file Bridgeview Bank Group's motion to determine that deposition testimony of Marvin Kaplan is not privileged, as well as Exhibit A to that motion, under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 8/24/2015. (CRJ)
August 18, 2015 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 435 Motion to defer payment of expert witness fees and expenses; denying without prejudice Motion to determine reasonableness of expert charges; denying without prejudice 436 Motion for approval of expert witness fees and expenses. The Kaplan Parties shall produce the expert witness Jason D. Koontz at the scheduled deposition on August 28, 2015. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 8/18/2015. (JM)
May 15, 2015 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 366 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/15/2015. (JM)
May 14, 2015 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 360 Motion for Reconsideration re 244 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Motion for Sanctions; dismissing Counts IV, V, VI, VII of Amended Counterclaim/Crossclaims (Dkt. 93) as to Bridgeview Bank Group. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/14/2015. (JM)
May 8, 2015 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 359 Motion to extend time; denying 364 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying without prejudice 370 Motion to Strike; directing Kaplan Parties to make complete expert disclosures by May 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/8/2015. (JM)
March 30, 2015 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 276 motion to dismiss Counterclaim and Crossclaim of Bridgeview Bank Group. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/30/2015. (JM)
March 24, 2015 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 273 Motion for Final Default Judgment in favor of Crossclaimants Marvin I. Kaplan, Triple Net Exchange, LLC, MK Investing, LLC and BNK Smith LLC against G. Todd Smith, Gary T. Smith, Lucy B. Smith andSmith Advertising & Associates, Inc. The Clerk of Court shall enter a Final Default Judgment as to liability and entitlement to damages; the Court reserves jurisdiction to determine the amount of damages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/24/2015. (JM)
September 30, 2014 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 202 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Denying as Moot 208 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/30/2014. (jm)
September 29, 2014 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 261 Motion for Leave to File Reply as moot; granting 177 Motion to Strike 175 Jury demand. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/29/2014. (JM)
March 31, 2014 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion to Strike 93 CounterclaimCrossclaim ; denying 100 motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 106 motion to dismiss; denying without prejudice 119 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 123 motion to dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/31/2014. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Kaplan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Dale W. Cravey
Represented By: Beth A. Cronin
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: David Stuart Garbett
Represented By: Joseph D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin I Kaplan
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R1A Palms, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Pointe, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Mark James Ragusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Net Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MK Investing, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNK Smith, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Advertising & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert Shaw
Represented By: Dale W. Cravey
Represented By: Beth A. Cronin
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: David Stuart Garbett
Represented By: Joseph D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: The Florida Bankers Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Byrley Colgan
Represented By: Rachel K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Charles A. Starr III
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Eric Robert Pellenbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: G. Todd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gary T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lucy B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bridgeview Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: William G. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Dale W. Cravey
Represented By: Beth A. Cronin
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: David Stuart Garbett
Represented By: Joseph D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Smith Advertising & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Mark James Ragusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: BNK Smith, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: R1A Palms, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Triple Net Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MK Investing, LLC
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Marvin I Kaplan
Represented By: Jon Douglas Parrish
Represented By: Kirt R. Posthuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?