Roca Labs, Inc. v. Consumer Opinion Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Roca Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Consumer Opinion Corp. and Opinion Corp.
Case Number: 8:2014cv02096
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Sarasota
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying 222 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 222 Motion for Sanctions. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/10/2015. (DRW)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting Consumer Opinion Corp.'s 148 and Opinion Corp.'s 173 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying Roca Lab, Inc.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment 172 . See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/21/2015. (DRW)
November 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation of the Honorable Elizabeth A. Jenkins, United States Magistrate Judge 43 is ADOPTED. Roca Lab Inc.'s Verified Motion for Entry of a Temporary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law 5 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/16/2014. (KBT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roca Labs, Inc. v. Consumer Opinion Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roca Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Berger
Represented By: Nicole Freedlander
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Opinion Corp.
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opinion Corp.
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?