Herrera et al v. JFK Medical Center Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: |
Marisela Herrera, Luz Sanchez, Nicholas Acosta and Penny Wollmen |
Defendant: |
JFK Medical Center Limited Partnership, HCA Holdings, Inc., Memorial Healthcare Group, Inc. and North Florida Regional Medical Center, Inc. |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv02327 |
Filed: |
September 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Tampa Office |
County: |
Palm Beach |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas B. McCoun |
Presiding Judge: |
James S. Moody |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
197
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 180 of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects. Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines and Amend the Complaint to Add Parties 155 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/28/2017. (LN)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
117
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 HCA's Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 111 Hospital Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 116 Motion for Leave to File reply and for oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 1/30/2017. (JDE)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
70
ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Interlocutory Appeal (Dkt. #68) is GRANTED. Discovery is stayed pending a ruling by the Eleventh Circuit on Plaintiff's Interlocutory Appeal. Plaintiff's Un opposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. # 69) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively CLOSE this case and terminate any pending motions. The Parties shall file a joint status report and motion to re-open the case within seven (7) days after the Eleventh Circuit issues its order. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. # 61) is due fourteen (14) days after the Court enters an order re-opening the case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/30/2015. (LN)
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
64
ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Plaintiff's Petition for Rule 23(f) Permissive Appeal (Dkt. #59) is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Refer Case to Early Mediation (Dkt. #60) is DENIED without prejudice . Discovery is stayed pending a ruling by the Eleventh Circuit on Plaintiff's Petition. Plaintiff shall file a notice with this Court within seven (7) days after the Eleventh Circuit issues its order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/12/2015. (LN)
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
51
ORDER: Defendant HCA Holdings, Inc.'s Motion Requesting Judicial Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Dkt. #34) is GRANTED. Defendant HCA Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Prejudice, Motion to Strike Class A llegations, and Joinder in Hospital Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motions to Strike, with Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Dkt. #35) is GRANTED in part. JFK Limited Center Partnership d/b/a JFK Medical Center, Memorial Healthcare Group, Inc. d/b/a Memorial Hospital Jacksonville, and North Florida Regional Medical Center, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Dkt. #36) is GRANTED in part. The Court dismisses Count III of the Amended Complai nt. The Court strikes Plaintiffs' class allegations. Marisela Herrera may proceed with this action. The remaining Plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice and may file separate individual actions. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/20/2015. (LN)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Request for Stay of Briefing and Consideration of the Motion 3 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/22/2014. (LN)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?