M.W. et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: M.W., Anastazia J. Wood, Justin Wood and Suzanne McCarthy
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car, EAN Trust, Enterprise Leasing Company of Florida, Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC, Craig R. Wolff, Laser Spine Institute, LLC and Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC
Case Number: 8:2014cv03132
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. McCoun
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 10/13/2015. (KTW)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 91 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 9/29/2015. Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's motion to strike portions of plaintiffs' second amended complaint (Dkt. 88) by September 30, 2015. (KTW)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 8/12/2015. (KTW)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Remand to State Court. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court 20 is DENIED as to Ford and the Enterprise Defendants. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court 20 is GRAN TED as to Defendants Craig R. Wolff, M.D., Laser Spine Institute, LLC, and Laser Spine Surgical Center LLC. The Clerk is directed to sever and remand all claims against Defendants Craig R. Wolff, M.D., Laser Spine Institute, LLC, and Laser Spine Surgical Center LLC as to Count IV of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 3/24/2015. (KTW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.W. et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Charles Wayne Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastazia J. Wood
Represented By: Charles Wayne Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wood
Represented By: Charles Wayne Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne McCarthy
Represented By: Charles Wayne Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: J. Randolph Bibb
Represented By: Ryan Clark
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan E Wittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes
Represented By: Lee P. Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes
Represented By: Lee P. Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Trust
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes
Represented By: Lee P. Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company of Florida
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes
Represented By: Lee P. Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes
Represented By: Lee P. Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig R. Wolff
Represented By: Christopher Scott Knopik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser Spine Institute, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott Knopik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott Knopik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?