Butdorf v. SC Maintenance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Butdorf
Defendant: Steven S. Clements and SC Maintenance, Inc.
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2015cv00916
Filed: April 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Filing 37 JUDGMENT in favor of Thomas Butdorf against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER adopting #35--REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting #33--motion for judgment against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.; directing the clerk to ENTER a $4,804.77 judgment for Thomas Butdorf and against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/15/2016. (BK)
November 29, 2016 Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #33 MOTION for Final Judgment of Garnishment filed by Thomas Butdorf; recommending that the motion be granted and entry of final judgment of garnishment be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against garnishee Chase Bank in the amount of $4,804.77. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/29/2016. (DMS)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson for a report and recommendation: #33--motion for garnishment judgment filed by Thomas Butdorf. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/28/2016. (BK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 23, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION for Garnishment judgment by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullard, Cesery)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice #31 plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/6/2016. (DMS)
August 25, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullard, Cesery)
August 2, 2016 Filing 30 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (AMD)
August 2, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE by Thomas Butdorf Second Notice to Defendant (Bullard, Cesery)
August 2, 2016 Filing 28 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Chase Bank . (Bullard, Cesery) Modified filing party on 8/3/2016 (AMD).
August 2, 2016 Filing 27 PROOF of service by Thomas Butdorf (Bullard, Cesery)
July 26, 2016 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of compliance of Service by Thomas Butdorf. (Bullard, Cesery)
July 20, 2016 Filing 25 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Chase Bank in the amount of $4,804.77. (AMD)
March 2, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Cesery L. Bullard on behalf of Thomas Butdorf (Bullard, Cesery)
January 12, 2016 Filing 21 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Thomas Butdorf against SC Maintenance, Inc., Steven S. Clements. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/12/2016. (AMD)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adopting #18 report and recommendations; granting #16 MOTION for an attorney's fee and costs. The clerk is directed to enter a judgment for Butdorf and against the defendants for $2,112.50 in an attorney's fee and $484.75 in costs. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2016. (LAM)
December 10, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE by Thomas Butdorf re #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law filed by Thomas Butdorf. (Notice of Non-Opposition) (Murthy, Angeli)
December 7, 2015 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #16 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Thomas Butdorf; recommending that motion be granted to the extent that an amended judgment be entered awarding the plaintiff an additional amount of $2,112.50 in an attorney's fee, and $484.75 in costs, pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2015. (DMS)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson for a report and recommendation: #16--motion by Thomas Butdorf for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/9/2015. (BK)
August 25, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Angeli Murthy, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - Cse Expenses, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit - Costs -)(Murthy, Angeli) Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson for a report and recommendation. Modified on 9/9/2015 (BK)
August 12, 2015 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Thomas Butdorf against SC Maintenance, Inc., Steven S. Clements. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/12/2015. (AMD)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13--motion for entry of default judgment; directing the Clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT for Thomas Butdorf against SC Maintenance, Inc., and Steven S. Clements for $2,207.52 and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/12/2015. (BK)
August 6, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION for default judgment against Steven S. Clements, SC Maintenance, Inc. by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Thomas Butdorf)(Murthy, Angeli)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part #11--motion for an extension of time; motion for default judgment due 8/7/2015. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/27/2015. (BK)
July 21, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Final Default Judgment as to Defendant SC Maintenance by Thomas Butdorf. (Murthy, Angeli)
July 8, 2015 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Steven S. Clements. (AMD)
July 8, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Steven S. Clements by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Angeli Murthy)(Murthy, Angeli) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 8, 2015 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on June 15, 2015 by Thomas Butdorf as to Steven S. Clements. (Murthy, Angeli)
June 19, 2015 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SC Maintenance, Inc. (AMD)
June 18, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against SC Maintenance, Inc. by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Angeli Murthy)(Murthy, Angeli) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 18, 2015 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on May 22, 2015 by Thomas Butdorf as to SC Maintenance, Inc.. (Murthy, Angeli)
April 21, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Parties must utilize case management report attached. (LAM)
April 17, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of consent to join by Thomas Butdorf re #1 Complaint. (LSS)
April 17, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Steven S. Clements, SC Maintenance, Inc.. (LSS)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven S. Clements, SC Maintenance, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-29638) filed by Thomas Butdorf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butdorf v. SC Maintenance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven S. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Butdorf
Represented By: Cesery L. Bullard
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?