The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Trust 2007-A v. Pedersen et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Trust 2007-A
Defendant: Janice L. Pedersen and Stephen J. Pedersen
Case Number: 8:2015cv02954
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE IN REM. (See Judgment for details.) The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions as moot and close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/18/2016. (LN)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Foreclosure, Re-Establishment of Lost Note, and Request for Award of Attorney's Fees in Rem 34 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Standing [3 8] is DENIED. Plaintiff shall file a proposed final judgment for the Court's review within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Plaintiff's proposed final judgment shall include a written indemnification agreement as adequate protection to D efendants against any loss that might occur if a claim were brought by another party to enforce the instrument. See Blitch v. Freedom Mortg. Corp., 185 So. 3d 645, 646 (Fla. 2d DCA 2016) (noting that "this post-proof condition is satisfied thro ugh a written indemnification agreement in the final judgment, the posting of a surety bond, a letter of credit, a deposit of cash collateral with the court, or such other security as the court may deem appropriate under the circumstances.") Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/27/2016. (LN)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/6/2016. (JG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Trust 2007-A v. Pedersen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Trust 2007-A
Represented By: Kari Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice L. Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?