Bell v. Cross et al
Case Number: 8:2016cv00961
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting in part 165 Motion. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 10/15/2020. (JHA)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying 162 Motion. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 10/5/2020. (JHA)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying without prejudice 160 Motion. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 9/30/2020. (JHA)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying without prejudice 138 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 7/14/2020. (JHA)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 5/21/2020. (JHA)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 102 motion to dismiss; denying as moot 103 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 12/3/2019. (JHA)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part 72 motion to dismiss; granting in part 73 motion to dismiss; granting in part 79 motion to amend/correct. The 20 First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice on the grounds that it is a shotgun pleading. Plaintiff/Relator shall file a Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 7/19/2019. (AKA)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 37 Relator's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/25/2019. (AKA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Cross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?