People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. v. Dade City's Wild Things, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Defendant: Dade City's Wild Things, Inc., Stearns Zoological Rescue & Rehab Center, Inc., Kathryn P. Stearns and Randall E. Stearns
Counter_claimant: Randall E. Stearns, Kathryn P. Stearns and Stearns Zoological Rescue & Rehab Center, Inc.
Counter_defendant: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv02899
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 Motion to Compel Defendants to Respond to Requests for Production. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/16/2017. (BEE)
November 15, 2017 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 153 Motion to extend time; 156 Motion to Continue; 157 Motion to Continue. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/15/2017. (BEE)
November 9, 2017 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 148 Motion to Permit Transfer of Tigers, subject to Defendants filing a notice that they do not object to the requested relief. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/9/2017. (BEE)
October 18, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 motion for recusal of magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/18/2017. (BEE)
October 4, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents and Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/4/2017. (BEE)
July 12, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking under advisement 39 Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents and Better Answers to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories; granting 56 Motion to Compel Entry Upon Land and Site Inspection; denying without prejudice 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 7/12/2017. (BEE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. v. Dade City's Wild Things, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Richard Cochran
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dade City's Wild Things, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stearns Zoological Rescue & Rehab Center, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn P. Stearns
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall E. Stearns
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Randall E. Stearns
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kathryn P. Stearns
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Stearns Zoological Rescue & Rehab Center, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Richard Cochran
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?