Service with Class Corp. v. Hawker Beechcraft Global Customer Support, LLC.

Plaintiff: Service with Class Corp.
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Global Customer Support, LLC.
Case Number: 8:2016cv03453
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion to Strike Dapkunas' supplemental report. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/16/2018. (JD)
February 13, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Strike expert opinion ; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Strike expert opinion. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/13/2018. (JD)
February 7, 2018 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for summary judgment. The parties must file all motions in limine by February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/7/2018. (JD)
May 19, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint with attachments, solely to name the proper defendant, by May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 5/19/2017. (JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service with Class Corp. v. Hawker Beechcraft Global Customer Support, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service with Class Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Global Customer Support, LLC.
Represented By: L. Robert Bourgeois
Represented By: John Patrick O'Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?