Clements v. Jace et al
Plaintiff: |
Deanna Clements |
Defendant: |
Rickie Jace and Stevan Figueroa |
Case Number: |
8:2017cv00316 |
Filed: |
February 8, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Tampa Office |
County: |
Pinellas |
Presiding Judge: |
Charlene Edwards Honeywell |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark A. Pizzo |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 7, 2018 |
Filing
42
ORDER: (1) The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 41 is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including appellate review. (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Du e to Plaintiff's Failure to Perfect Service of Process Pursuant to Court Orders [Doc. 23] [Doc. 28] 32 is GRANTED. (3) This case is dismissed, without prejudice, due to Plaintiff's failure to perfect service of process. (4) The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/7/2018. (BGS)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing
14
ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (1) The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including ap pellate review. (2) Defendants' Verified Motion to Quash Alleged Service of Process and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 10 is GRANTED. (3) Plaintiff's purported service of process on Defendants through the Florida Secretary of State is quashed. (4) Plaintiff shall have up to and including May 22, 2017 to effect service on the Defendants in accordance with Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to effect service may result in dismissal of this case as to said Defendant(s) without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/21/2017. (BGS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?