Dragon Jade International, LTD v. Ultroid, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dragon Jade International, LTD
Defendant: Ultroid, LLC, Ultroid Marketing Development Corp and Ultroid Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv02422
Filed: October 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. McCoun
Presiding Judge: James D. Whittemore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the grounds that Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' Amended Counterclaims is a shotgun pleading. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/26/2019. (AKA)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying 45 Motion for judgment on the pleadings; granting 49 Motion for leave to amend counterclaims; and denying as moot 80 motion to amend pleadings. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 1/28/2019. (AKA)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER adopting 34 Report and Recommendations.; denying 11 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/8/2018. (AEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dragon Jade International, LTD v. Ultroid, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dragon Jade International, LTD
Represented By: Jennifer G. Altman
Represented By: Markenzy Lapointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultroid, LLC
Represented By: William E. Lawton
Represented By: Joshua B. Walker
Represented By: Jenna Marie Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultroid Marketing Development Corp
Represented By: William E. Lawton
Represented By: Joshua B. Walker
Represented By: Jenna Marie Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultroid Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: William E. Lawton
Represented By: Joshua B. Walker
Represented By: Jenna Marie Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?