Helix Investment Management, SLP v. Privilege Direct Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Helix Investment Management, SLP |
Defendant: |
Privilege Direct Corp., Oliphant Financial Group, LLC, Oliphant Financial Corporation and Robert A. Morris |
Case Number: |
8:2018cv00206 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Tampa Office |
County: |
Sarasota |
Presiding Judge: |
Virginia M. Hernandez Covington |
Presiding Judge: |
Anthony E. Porcelli |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 5, 2019 |
Filing
187
ORDER: The Reports and Recommendations (Doc. ## 184, 185, 186) are ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. Helix Investment Management, LP's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Privilege Direct Corp. (Doc. # 127) and Amended Motion for Entry of Defau lt Judgment against Oliphant Financial Group, LLC (Doc. # 175) are GRANTED. Helix's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Doc. # 170) is GRANTED IN PART. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Helix Investment Management, LP, and against Privilege Direct Corp. and Oliphant Financial Group, LLC, as set forth in the Order. Thereafter, the Clerk is directed to CLOSE THE CASE. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/5/2019. (MWS)
|
March 5, 2019 |
Filing
115
ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss Helix's Third Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Litigation (Doc. # 100 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/5/2019. (KAK)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
109
ORDER: United States Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli's Report and Recommendation (Doc. # 105 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. # 91 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/6/2019. (KAK)
|
December 17, 2018 |
Filing
98
ORDER: The parties should be prepared to discuss the jurisdictional issue raised above at the December 18, 2018, preliminary injunction hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/17/2018. (KAK)
|
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
88
ORDER: Defendants Oliphant Financial Group, LLC, Oliphant Financial Corporation and Robert A. Morris' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 54 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Plaintiff is authorized to file a Third Amended Complaint by December 10, 2018, failing which the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/28/2018. (KAK)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
23
ORDER: Defendant Oliphant Financial Group's Motion to Stay Action (Doc. # 17 ) is GRANTED. This case is stayed and administratively closed until such time as the Florida Department of Corporations issues the certificate of authority to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court once the Florida Department of Corporations issues the certificate of authority. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/6/2018. (KAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?