Kline et al v. Bitconnect et al
Plaintiff: Dusty Showers, Andrew Kline, Lena Huna and Charles Mabra
Defendant: John Does, Joshua Jeppesen, Ryan Maasen, Bitconnect International, PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Glenn Arcaro, Bitconnect and Bitconnect Trading LTD
Case Number: 8:2018cv00319
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Mark A Pizzo
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida, West Palm Beach Division. The Court's April 6, 2018 Show Cause Order #27 is DISCHARGED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/17/2018. (RLH)
April 18, 2018 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, WEST PALM BEACH DIVISION. (JNB)
April 18, 2018 Case transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:18-cv-80512, filed 04/18/2018. (JNB)
April 13, 2018 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of David C. Silver re: #30 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Silver, David)
April 13, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by the BitConnect Investor Group a/k/a by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
April 11, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #27 Order pdf filed by Andrew Kline. (Pascucci, Michael)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #26 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Local Rule 4.04(b), based on #27 the Court's Order. On its own motion, the Court stays Plaintiffs' deadline to move for class certification pending the Court's ruling on its jurisdiction over this matter. Should the Court retain jurisdiction, Plaintiffs may refile their motion, which the Court will consider as timely filed. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/6/2018. (RLH)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that on or before Monday, April 16, 2018, Plaintiffs are directed to SHOW CAUSE why this action should be allowed to proceed in this forum. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/6/2018. (RLH)
April 5, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically From Local Rule 4.04(b) by Lena Huna, Andrew Kline, Charles Mabra, Dusty Showers. (Eggnatz, Joshua)
March 23, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of compliance re #22 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro (Volz, Carl)
March 21, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of compliance re #20 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro (Moore, Desiree)
March 21, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of compliance re #20 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro (Mueller, Nicole)
March 19, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Carl E. Voltz, appearing on behalf of Glenn Arcaro (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA049504.) Related document: #21 MOTION for Carl E. Volz to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
March 19, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Desiree F. Moore, appearing on behalf of Glenn Arcaro (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA049504.) Related document: #18 MOTION for Desiree F. Moore to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
March 19, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Nicole C. Mueller, appearing on behalf of Glenn Arcaro (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA049504.) Related document: #17 MOTION for Nicole C. Mueller to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Defendant Arcaro's motion for Carl Volz to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/19/2018. (ACS)
March 16, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Carl E. Volz to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admin_Atty Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. NOTE: Exhibit removed from the docket; Special Admission Attorney Certification Form shall be filed in paper format with the Clerk of Court, counsel notified. Modified on 3/19/2018 (LD).
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Defendant Glenn Arcaro's motion by Nicole C. Mueller to appear pro hac vice; granting #18 Defendant Glenn Arcaro's motion by Desiree F. Moore to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/16/2018. (DK)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendant Glenn Arcaro's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Answer or response due on or before the 45th day after the lead plaintiff files or designates the operative pleading. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/16/2018. (RLH)
March 15, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Desiree F. Moore to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admin_Atty Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. NOTE: Exhibit removed from the docket; Special Admission Attorney Certification Form shall be filed in paper format with the Clerk of Court, counsel notified. Modified on 3/16/2018 (LD).
March 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Nicole C. Mueller to appear pro hac vice by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admin_Atty Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. NOTE: Exhibit removed from the docket; Special Admission Attorney Certification Form shall be filed in paper format with the Clerk of Court, counsel notified. Modified on 3/16/2018 (LD).
March 15, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Glenn Arcaro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants shall respond on or before the 45th day after the lead plaintiff files or designates the operative pleading. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/15/2018. (RLH)
March 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ryan Maasen. (Stumphauzer, Ryan)
March 14, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's March 8, 2018 Endorsed Order by Ryan Maasen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Long Lawsuit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Long Lawsuit Order Transferring Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Argiro Lawsuit Complaint)(Stumphauzer, Ryan)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' response due on or before April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/8/2018. (RLH)
March 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ryan Maasen. (Stumphauzer, Ryan)
March 7, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ryan Maasen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Paige Lawsuit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wildes Lawsuit Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Avalos Lawsuit Complaint)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
February 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/9/2018. (SRC)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/08. (LNR)
February 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Joshua Jeppesen. (LNR)
February 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect LTD. (LNR)
February 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Ryan Maasen. (LNR)
February 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Glenn Arcaro. (LNR)
February 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect Trading LTD. (LNR) (LNR).
February 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Bitconnect International, PLC. (LNR)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA48661) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline et al v. Bitconnect et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jeppesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Maasen
Represented By: Ryan Stumphauzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitconnect International, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitconnect LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Arcaro
Represented By: Carol Celeiro Lumpkin
Represented By: Desiree Moore
Represented By: Carl E. Volz
Represented By: Nicole Claire Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitconnect
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitconnect Trading LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusty Showers
Represented By: Joshua H. Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Kline
Represented By: Joshua H. Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Huna
Represented By: Joshua H. Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mabra
Represented By: Joshua H. Eggnatz
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?