Cline v. Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Christopher Cline
Defendant: Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv00602
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Susan C Bucklew
1 Judge: Susan C Bucklew
2 Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: Restrictions on Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2018 25 TRANSFER to Orlando Division and assigned case number 6:18-cv-771-ORL-37GJK (BSN)
May 17, 2018 24 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER transferring case to the Orlando Division for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.02(b)(3) and pursuant to Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #23 . The Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 5/17/2018. (DMB)
May 17, 2018 23 NOTICE by Christopher Cline re #17 Order on Motion to Change Venue (Wenzel, Steven)
May 16, 2018 22 Remark NO FURTHER COPIES TO BE MAILED TO COUNSELS: James A. Hunter, Arthur Stock, and Lane L. Vines, after 19 , 20 , 21 Orders. (BSN)
May 15, 2018 21 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 the Unopposed MOTION for Lane L. Vines, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. Lane L. Vines is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by June 15, 2018. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 5/15/2018. (DMB)
May 15, 2018 20 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 the Unopposed MOTION for Arthur Stock, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. Arthur Stock is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by June 15, 2018. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 5/15/2018. (DMB)
May 15, 2018 19 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 the Unopposed MOTION for James A. Hunter, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. James A. Hunter is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by June 15, 2018. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 5/15/2018. (DMB)
May 14, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lane L. Vines, appearing on behalf of Christopher Cline (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA050619.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Lane L. Vines, Esquire to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
May 14, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Arthur Stock, appearing on behalf of Christopher Cline (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA050619.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Arthur Stock, Esquire to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
May 14, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James A. Hunter, appearing on behalf of Christopher Cline (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA050619.) Related document: #12 Unopposed MOTION for James A. Hunter, Esquire to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
May 14, 2018 18 NOTICE of compliance with CM/ECF Registration by Christopher Cline (Kmiec, Keenan)
May 10, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER ATTACHED denying #10 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and directing Plaintiff to respond and show cause on or before 5/17/18 as to why this case should not be transferred to the Orlando Division pursuant to the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 5/10/2018. (DMB)
May 4, 2018 16 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #10 Motion to Change Venue filed by Christopher Cline. (Wenzel, Steven)
May 4, 2018 15 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Christopher Cline. (Wenzel, Steven)
May 4, 2018 14 Unopposed MOTION for Lane L. Vines, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. (Wenzel, Steven)
May 4, 2018 13 Unopposed MOTION for Arthur Stock, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. (Wenzel, Steven)
May 4, 2018 12 Unopposed MOTION for James A. Hunter, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. (Wenzel, Steven)
April 20, 2018 11 DECLARATION of Kris Tucker re #10 MOTION to Change Venue by Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC. (Phillips, J.)
April 20, 2018 10 MOTION to Change Venue by Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Phillips, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 20, 2018 9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC. (Phillips, J.)
April 17, 2018 8 Remark ; NO FURTHER COPIES TO BE MAILED TO COUNSEL KENAN D. KMIEC AFTER 7 ORDER. (BSN)
April 16, 2018 7 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Keenan D. Kmiec's motion to appear pro hac vice. Mr. Kmiec is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, to enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and to electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by May 16, 2018. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 4/16/2018. (DMB)
April 13, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Keenan Kmiec, appearing on behalf of Christopher Cline (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA050006.) Related document: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Keenan D. Kmiec, Esquire to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
April 6, 2018 6 Unopposed MOTION for Keenan D. Kmiec, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by Christopher Cline. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wenzel, Steven)
March 30, 2018 5 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 the Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC. Defendant shall file its response on or before 4/20/18. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 3/30/2018. (DMB)
March 30, 2018 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC. (Phillips, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 14, 2018 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
March 13, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC. (BSN)
March 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number tpa 49342) filed by Christopher Cline. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BSN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cline
Represented By: Steven Greg Wenzel
Represented By: Arthur Michael Stock
Represented By: Lane Vines
Represented By: James A. Hunter
Represented By: Keenan D. Kmiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Fitness Group, LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?