Mayor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sheri Mayor
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 8:2018cv00978
Filed: April 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Presiding Judge: James D. Whittemore
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/9/2019. (MLM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT in favor of Sheri Mayor against Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2019. (JNB)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER remanding the Commissioner's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in Ms. Mayor's favor and close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/2/2019. (DMP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Mayor
Represented By: Jeanette A. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?