Fuccillo et al v. Century Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
William B. Fuccillo, Fuccillo Enterprises of Florida, Inc. and Fuccillo Automotive Group, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Century Enterprises, Inc. and Trent Silver |
Case Number: |
8:2018cv01236 |
Filed: |
May 22, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Tampa Office |
County: |
Pasco |
Presiding Judge: |
Anthony E. Porcelli |
Presiding Judge: |
Charlene Edwards Honeywell |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1121 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 18, 2021 |
Filing
89
ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(d) and FRCP 41(a)(2) 87 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs, William B. Fuccillo and Fuccillo Automotive Group, Inc., shall recover from Defendant Trent Silver as to Count I sta tutory damages in the amount of One Thousand Dollars ($1,000.00). Plaintiff, William B. Fuccillo, shall recover from Defendant Trent Silver as to Count V nominal damages in the amount of One Dollar ($1.00). Plaintiffs' claims in Coun ts II, III, and IV are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs, William B. Fuccillo and Fuccillo Automotive Group, Inc, consistent with this order. The Clerk is further directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/18/2021. (JDE)
|
September 28, 2020 |
Filing
78
ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Acceptance of Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts 65 is GRANTED as set forth in this Order. Plaintiffs' Notice of Second Motion for Summary Judgment 62 is GRANTED as to liability in favor of Plaintiffs, William B. Fuccillo and Fuccillo Automotive Group, Inc., on the ACPA claim in Count I of Plaintiffs' Complaint and as to liability in favor of Plaintiff, William B. Fuccillo, on the § 540.08 claim in Count V. Plaint iffs' Notice of Second Motion for Summary Judgment 62 is DENIED as to Plaintiff, Fuccillo Enterprises of Florida, Inc., on Count I. By separate order, the Court will schedule a status conference to discuss scheduling the remaining matters for trial on damages or damages and liability, as appropriate. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/28/2020. (JDE)
|
February 25, 2020 |
Filing
70
ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Objections to the Report and Recommendation 66 are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 63 is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this Order for all pu rposes, including appellate review. Defendant Century Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Prevailing Party Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Supporting Memorandum of Law 32 is GRANTED-in-part and DENIED-in-part. Century Enterprises, Inc. is award ed attorneys' fees in the amount of $34,005.50, plus any additional fees incurred after April 2019, which will be determined by separate petition. Century's request for costs is denied. A judgment as to all of Century's fees will be entered by separate order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/25/2020. (LJB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?