Boswell et al v. Gee et al
Plaintiff: Charles Brian Boswell and Margaret Ann Boswell
Defendant: Courtney Derry, Kristine Poore, Andrew Warren, Donna Lusczynski, Charles D. Keene, Kari Mathewson, Chad Chronister, Jose M. Docobo, Alan Hill, Greg Brown, Thomas Dirks, Kenneth Davis, James R. Burton, David Gee, Samuel V. Portalatin, Rita Peters, Scott Sisson, Thea Clark, Joseph Maurer, Preston Hollis, Donald Morris, Robert Ura and Christopher Brown
Case Number: 8:2018cv01769
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 97 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Kristine Poore. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 96 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Preston Hollis. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 95 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Thomas Dirks. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 94 WAIVER of service returned executed on 8-21-2018 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Rita Peters. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 93 WAIVER of service returned executed on 8-22-2018 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Courtney Derry. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 92 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-07-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Courtney Derry. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 91 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-06-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Andrew Warren. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 90 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Robert Ura. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 89 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Scott Sisson. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 88 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Samuel V. Portalatin. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 87 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Kristine Poore. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 86 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Donald Morris. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 85 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Donald Morris. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 84 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Joseph Maurer. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 83 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Joseph Maurer. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 82 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Joseph Maurer. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 81 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Joseph Maurer. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 80 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Kari Mathewson. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 79 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Kari Mathewson. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 78 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Donna Lusczynski. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 77 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Donna Lusczynski. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 76 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Charles D. Keene. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 75 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Charles D. Keene. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 74 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Preston Hollis. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 73 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Alan Hill. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 72 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Thomas Dirks. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 71 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Kenneth Davis. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 70 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Robert Ura. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 69 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Scott Sisson. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 68 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Samuel V. Portalatin. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 67 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to David Gee. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 66 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Greg Brown. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 65 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Jose M. Docobo. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 64 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Kenneth Davis. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 63 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Thea Clark. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 62 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Thea Clark. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 61 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell, Margaret Ann Boswell as to Thea Clark. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 60 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Chad Chronister. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 59 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Chad Chronister. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 58 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Christopher Brown. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 57 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Christopher Brown. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 56 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-14-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to James R. Burton. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of counsel CORRECTED NOTICE OF UPDATED SERVICE DESIGNATIONS by Kennan George Dandar on behalf of Charles Brian Boswell, Margaret Ann Boswell (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of counsel UPDATED SERVICE DESIGNATIONS by Kennan George Dandar on behalf of Charles Brian Boswell, Margaret Ann Boswell (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 53 WAIVER of service returned executed on 8-21-2018 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Rita Peters. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 52 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9/07/2018 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Courtney Derry. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 51 WAIVER of service returned executed on 8-22-2018 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Courtney Derry. (Dandar, Kennan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 50 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9-06-18 by Charles Brian Boswell as to Andrew Warren. (Dandar, Kennan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS issued as to Courtney Derry.(Official) (LNR)
August 17, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS issued as to Rita Peters.(Individual) (LNR)
August 17, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS issued as to Courtney Derry.(Individual capacity) (LNR)
August 17, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS issued as to David Gee.(Individual capacity) (LNR)
August 17, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE by Charles Brian Boswell, Margaret Ann Boswell OF NON-SERVICEABLE ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT DAVID GEE (Dandar, Kennan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas Dirks (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas Dirks (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS issued as to Scott Sisson (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS issued as to Scott Sisson (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS issued as to Robert Ura (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS issued as to Thea Clark (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS issued as to Thea Clark (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS issued as to Andrew Warren (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS issued as to Robert Ura (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS issued as to Rita Peters (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS issued as to Samuel V. Portalatin (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS issued as to Samuel V. Portalatin (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS issued as to Preston Hollis (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS issued as to Preston Hollis (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS issued as to Donna Lusczynski (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS issued as to Donna Lusczynski (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS issued as to Kristine Poore (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to Kristine Poore (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS issued as to Kenneth Davis (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS issued as to Kenneth Davis (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS issued as to Alan Hill (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS issued as to Joseph Maurer (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to Joseph Maurer (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued as to David Gee (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS issued as to Jose M. Docobo (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to Donald Morris (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Donald Morris (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Kari Mathewson (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS issued as to Kari Mathewson (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Chad Chronister (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Chad Chronister (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to Charles D. Keene (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Charles D. Keene (individual). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Courtney Derry (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Christopher Brown (official). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Christopher Brown (individually). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to James R. Burton (individually). (LNR)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Greg Brown (individually). (LNR)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Courtney Derry, Rita Peters, Andrew Warren Notice of E-mail Designation (Blain, Christopher)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Blain on behalf of Courtney Derry, Rita Peters, Andrew Warren (Blain, Christopher)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 7/24/2018. (SRC)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (LNR)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA51966) filed by Charles Brian Boswell, Margaret Ann Boswell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boswell et al v. Gee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Derry
Represented By: Christopher Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Warren
Represented By: Christopher Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Lusczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Mathewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose M. Docobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dirks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel V. Portalatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Peters
Represented By: Christopher Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thea Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brian Boswell
Represented By: James Roscoe Tanner
Represented By: Kennan George Dandar
Represented By: Marie A. Mattox
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Boswell
Represented By: James Roscoe Tanner
Represented By: Kennan George Dandar
Represented By: Marie A. Mattox
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?