De Jesus Alvarado v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus Alvarado
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, L. Francis Cissna and Mark J. Hazuda
Case Number: 8:2018cv01879
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Volusia
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
2 Judge: William F Jung
3 Judge: Mark A Pizzo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Judge William F. Jung. New case number: 8:18-cv-1879-T-02SPF. Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. #12 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. # 10) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/17/2018. (DLB)
September 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of compliance re #18 Summons returned executed as to USA Mark J. Hazuda, Director by Maria De Jesus Alvarado (Stoller, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. Mark J. Hazuda served on 9/10/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Stoller, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of compliance re #16 Summons returned executed as to USA L. Francis Cissna, Director by Maria De Jesus Alvarado (Stoller, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. L. Francis Cissna served on 9/10/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Stoller, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of compliance re #14 Summons returned executed as to USA Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Secretary by Maria De Jesus Alvarado (Stoller, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 9/10/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Stoller, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Mark J. Hazuda, Kirstjen M. Nielsen. (BES)
August 30, 2018 FEES paid by Maria De Jesus Alvarado (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number TPA052782) (ARC)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/27/2018. (NCR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/27/2018. (Flynn, Sean)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. (Stoller, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: MOTION HEARING held on 8/9/2018 re #2 Plaintiff's MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. (DIGITAL) (CKR)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of telephonic hearing on motion re #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. The parties shall appear telephonically at the hearing by calling the toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 on the day of the hearing and entering access code 7593847 followed by security code 181879 when prompted.(CKR)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/8/2018. (SAO)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/8/2018. (SAO)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:18-cv-1879-T-33SPF. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo no longer assigned to the case. (DG)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. (Stoller, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Mark J. Hazuda, Kirstjen M. Nielsen filed by Maria De Jesus Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus Alvarado v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Hazuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus Alvarado
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?