Lasseter v. Restaurant Delivery Developers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Trump, Catherine Garner, Jillian Price, Kelly Lacher, Ryan Anand Jatindranath, Dacey Walker, Jr., Leonie Wims, Eric Loescher, Rita Diz, Christina Leann McCain, Amanda Brown, Timothy Blankenship, Darrick Edwards, Olga Anderson-Ascione, Leslie Barton Madewell, Emad Wissa, Clarice Polczynski, Jordan Bryant, Julian Castano, Joseph Caleb Smith, Matthew Novotney, Gregory Maguire, David M. Webster, David C. England, Dontryle Stover, Alexandra Maneely, Joseph Pozdoll, Guy Rippey, Kimberly Chandler, Linsea Mohr, Erica Baker, Tony Morrison Browne, Hunter Jones, Howard Bernstein, Jacob Everett, Willie Williams, Kevin Graham, Omar Reed, Richard Molina, Robert Carpenter, Daniel Nathan Mazza, Genesis Gibson, Anthony E. Smith, Catherine Gilman, Tony Medaries, Sandra Ardley, Felica Renee Williams, Levar Morant, Rachael Deglman, Michele Hernandez, Anthony Jones, Steven Zamora, Tereesa Kelley, Robert Flynn Rameieh, III, Jarell Corley, Loren C. Bartley, Jessica Esaw, Roman Tikhonin, Laura Duggan, Kevin S. Smith, Veronica McCall, Shane Gosnell, Danielle Priester, Melissa Jurica, Christian Garcia Cruz, Adam Cole Crenshaw, William A. Camacho, Syeda Faria Bukhari, Adrian Garcia, Magarete Jamison Adenike Agunbiade, Christopher Adam Currie, Ashley Nicole May, Russell Bussey, James R. Jennings, Jack Nelson, Wendy Natali, Manuel Villanueva, Carlo Lucido, Sharon Lasseter, Tor Armstrong, Emanuel Godley, Brianna Franklin, William J. Sheketoff, Marquel Vernett, Barry Spencer, Jr., Michelle D. Sanders, Cathleen Waddle, Michael Longa, David Snead, Junior Alberto Jimenez, Angelinne W. Bonner, Robert W. Auer, Jeffrey Stephen Honeycutt, Kevin Lirio, Bryan Liriano, Ebony McIntyre, Santita Lacrisia McNear, Cleveland Richard White, III, Daniel Carrasquillo, Jeffrey O'Connell, Danielle Slack, Steven Baker, Tracey Williams, Lamicheal Williams, Shantel Ward, Devonche Lawrence, Daniel E. Berman, Ian G Luther, James Simeon, Garnet Chambers, Gena Lawson, Randell Lashawn Stephens, Devin Hunter, Lavon Tony Butler, Michael John Westwick-Brausen, Demetrius Jurineack, Patrick Thielen, Amy Kluger, Cayla L Zarvas, Patricia White, Timothy A Griswold, Ryan Duane Eddy, Chris Weidman, Kenneth Braverman, Larry Settle, John Denke, William Ross, Emanuel Glenn, Geidy Aguila Ramirez and Terry Anthony Henley
Defendant: Daniel Sinor, Thomas Colangelo, Restaurant Delivery Developers, LLC, Andrew Brown and William Moore
Case Number: 8:2018cv01912
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Sharon Lasseter as to Thomas Colangelo. (Lindstrom, Eric)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Sharon Lasseter. Related document: #1 Complaint (Lindstrom, Eric) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (KMM).
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on August 22, 2018 by Sharon Lasseter as to William Moore. (Lindstrom, Eric)
August 30, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan, appearing on behalf of Sharon Lasseter (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA052765.). (EA)
August 30, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Thomas Fowler, appearing on behalf of Sharon Lasseter (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA052766.). (EA)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on August 22, 2018 by Sharon Lasseter as to Restaurant Delivery Developers, LLC. (Lindstrom, Eric)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: All claims, other than the claims of Sharon Lasseter, are severed pursuant to Rule 21 and dismissed without prejudice to commencing separate individual actions. The statute of limitations for any claim asserted in this case is deemed tolled for a period of 20 days from the date of this Order. Sharon Lasseter is directed to file an Amended Complaint containing only her claims by September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/28/2018. (KAK)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Magarete Jamison Adenike Agunbiade, Olga Anderson-Ascione, Sandra Ardley, Tor Armstrong, Robert W. Auer, Erica Baker, Steven Baker, Loren C. Bartley, Daniel E. Berman, Howard Bernstein, Timothy Blankenship, Angelinne W. Bonner, Kenneth Braverman, Amanda Brown, Tony Morrison Browne, Jordan Bryant, Syeda Faria Bukhari, Russell Bussey, Lavon Tony Butler, William A. Camacho, Robert Carpenter, Daniel Carrasquillo, Julian Castano, Garnet Chambers, Kimberly Chandler, Jarell Corley, Adam Cole Crenshaw, Christian Garcia Cruz, Christopher Adam Currie, Rachael Deglman, John Denke, Rita Diz, Laura Duggan, Ryan Duane Eddy, Darrick Edwards, David C. England, Jessica Esaw, Jacob Everett, Brianna Franklin, Adrian Garcia, Catherine Garner, Genesis Gibson, Catherine Gilman, Emanuel Glenn, Emanuel Godley, Shane Gosnell, Kevin Graham, Timothy A Griswold, Terry Anthony Henley, Michele Hernandez, Jeffrey Stephen Honeycutt, Devin Hunter, Ryan Anand Jatindranath, James R. Jennings, Junior Alberto Jimenez, Anthony Jones, Hunter Jones, Melissa Jurica, Demetrius Jurineack, Tereesa Kelley, Amy Kluger, Kelly Lacher, Sharon Lasseter, Devonche Lawrence, Gena Lawson, Bryan Liriano, Kevin Lirio, Eric Loescher, Michael Longa, Carlo Lucido, Ian G Luther, Leslie Barton Madewell, Gregory Maguire, Alexandra Maneely, Ashley Nicole May, Daniel Nathan Mazza, Christina Leann McCain, Veronica McCall, Ebony McIntyre, Santita Lacrisia McNear, Tony Medaries, Linsea Mohr, Richard Molina, Levar Morant, Wendy Natali, Jack Nelson, Matthew Novotney, Jeffrey O'Connell, Clarice Polczynski, Joseph Pozdoll, Jillian Price, Danielle Priester, Robert Flynn Rameieh, III, Geidy Aguila Ramirez, Omar Reed, Guy Rippey, William Ross, Michelle D. Sanders, Larry Settle, William J. Sheketoff, James Simeon, Danielle Slack, Anthony E. Smith, Joseph Caleb Smith, Kevin S. Smith, David Snead, Barry Spencer, Jr, Randell Lashawn Stephens, Dontryle Stover, Patrick Thielen, Roman Tikhonin, Jerry Trump, Marquel Vernett, Manuel Villanueva, Cathleen Waddle, Dacey Walker, Jr, Shantel Ward, David M. Webster, Chris Weidman, Michael John Westwick-Brausen, Cleveland Richard White, III, Patricia White, Felica Renee Williams, Lamicheal Williams, Tracey Williams, Willie Williams, Leonie Wims, Emad Wissa, Steven Zamora, Cayla L Zarvas. Related case(s): yes (Lindstrom, Eric) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (KMM).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/13/2018. (TWL)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/13/2018. (TWL)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Daniel Sinor. (KMM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to William Moore. (KMM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas Colangelo. (KMM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Andrew Brown. (KMM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Restaurant Delivery Developers, LLC. (KMM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-52235) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasseter v. Restaurant Delivery Developers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Trump
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Garner
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Price
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lacher
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Anand Jatindranath
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dacey Walker, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonie Wims
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Loescher
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Diz
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Leann McCain
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Brown
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Blankenship
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrick Edwards
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Anderson-Ascione
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Barton Madewell
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Wissa
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Polczynski
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Bryant
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Castano
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Caleb Smith
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Novotney
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Maguire
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Webster
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. England
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontryle Stover
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Maneely
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pozdoll
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Rippey
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Chandler
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linsea Mohr
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Baker
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Morrison Browne
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Jones
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Bernstein
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Everett
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Williams
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Graham
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Reed
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Molina
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carpenter
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Nathan Mazza
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Gibson
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Smith
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Gilman
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Medaries
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ardley
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felica Renee Williams
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levar Morant
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Deglman
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Hernandez
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jones
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zamora
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tereesa Kelley
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Flynn Rameieh, III
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarell Corley
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren C. Bartley
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Esaw
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Tikhonin
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Duggan
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica McCall
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Gosnell
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Priester
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jurica
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Garcia Cruz
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Cole Crenshaw
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Camacho
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syeda Faria Bukhari
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Garcia
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magarete Jamison Adenike Agunbiade
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Adam Currie
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nicole May
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Bussey
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Jennings
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Nelson
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Natali
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Villanueva
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Lucido
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lasseter
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tor Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Godley
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Franklin
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Sheketoff
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquel Vernett
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Spencer, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle D. Sanders
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Waddle
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Longa
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Snead
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Alberto Jimenez
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelinne W. Bonner
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Auer
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Stephen Honeycutt
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lirio
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Liriano
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony McIntyre
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santita Lacrisia McNear
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Richard White, III
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Carrasquillo
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Connell
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Slack
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Baker
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Williams
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamicheal Williams
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantel Ward
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonche Lawrence
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian G Luther
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Simeon
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnet Chambers
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Lawson
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randell Lashawn Stephens
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Hunter
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavon Tony Butler
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Westwick-Brausen
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Jurineack
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Thielen
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kluger
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayla L Zarvas
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia White
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A Griswold
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Duane Eddy
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Weidman
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Braverman
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Settle
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Denke
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ross
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Glenn
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geidy Aguila Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Anthony Henley
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Eric Jacob Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sinor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Delivery Developers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?