Global Licensing, Inc. v. The Vue Gentleman's Club et al

Plaintiff: Global Licensing, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Tomkovich and The Vue Gentleman's Club
Case Number: 8:2018cv02113
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Response due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/9/2018. (BEE)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by The Vue Gentleman's Club, Michael Tomkovich. (Walters, Lawrence) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/CERTIFICATE of service by Global Licensing, Inc. re #3 Summons issued The Vue Gentleman's Club. (Wood, Matthew) Modified text only on 10/1/2018 (CTR).
September 11, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid Global Licensing, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA052985.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Jeffrey Sherbow to appear pro hac vice. (EA)
September 5, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid Global Licensing, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA052871.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Matthew Wood to appear pro hac vice. (EA)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jeffrey Sherbow may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/4/2018. (BEE)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Jeffrey Sherbow to appear pro hac vice by Global Licensing, Inc.. (Rosensweig, Neal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (EA)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew S. Wood may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/28/2018. (BEE)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Matthew Wood to appear pro hac vice by Global Licensing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rosensweig, Neal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/27/2018. (GSO)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Global Licensing, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Rosensweig, Neal)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to The Vue Gentleman's Club. (EA)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Michael Tomkovich. (EA)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Vue Gentleman's Club, Michael Tomkovich with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052676) filed by Global Licensing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Licensing, Inc. v. The Vue Gentleman's Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tomkovich
Represented By: Lawrence G. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vue Gentleman's Club
Represented By: Lawrence G. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Licensing, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Gary Rosensweig
Represented By: Matthew S. Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Sherbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?