West Hills Farms, LLC et al v. GeoStar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Monica Grover, Jaswinder Grover, MD, MacDonald Stables, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC and Arbor Farms, LLC
Defendant: Brookstone Development Ltd., Inc., Deborah Ferguson, Tony Ferguson, Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc., Riverside Equities, LLC, Thomas Robinson, Great Lakes Geophysical, LLLP, Penny Robinson and GeoStar Corporation
Case Number: 8:2018cv02182
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER that, on the basis of #26 Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), (B). The Clerk is directed to close the case and terminate all pending motions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/15/2018. (GLP)
September 14, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Arbor Farms, LLC, Monica Grover, Jaswinder Grover, MD, MacDonald Stables, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC (Townsend, David)
September 14, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Townsend on behalf of Arbor Farms, LLC, Monica Grover, Jaswinder Grover, MD, MacDonald Stables, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC (Townsend, David)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/14/2018. (JAR)
September 13, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Brian M. Johnson to appear pro hac vice by Deborah Ferguson, Tony Ferguson, Great Lakes Geophysical, LLLP. (Collins, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 11, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2018. (SRC)
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (AG)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/08. (AG)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE to counsel of new case number (8:18-cv-2182-T-17JSS) and judge assignment; assigned to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.(AG)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-13247. File received electronically
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Middle District of Florida. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (DPer) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2018 re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Riverside Equities, LLC, Deborah Ferguson, Great Lakes Geophysical, LLLP, Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc., GeoStar Corporation, Brookstone Development Ltd., Inc., Tony Ferguson, Thomas Robinson, Penny Robinson. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: David Yarbrough) (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing RESET for 6/28/2018 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing RESET for 6/14/2018 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by All Defendants. (Pellegrino, Ariana) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Arbor Farms, LLC v. Geostar Corp., No. 12-9992-PZ, Order Appointing Receiver, (July 26, 2013), Order Affirmed, 305 Mich. App. 374, 853 N.W.2d 421 (2014), #3 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Great Lakes Geophysical with Tony Ferguson as Representative, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Deborah Ferguson, #5 Exhibit 4 - Asset Purchase Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 - 09/27/2011 Tony Ferguson email, FW: sale of assets by GLG, Inc. to GLG, LLP, #7 Exhibit 6 - Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc. 2011 Balance Sheet, #8 Exhibit 7 - November 2011 Fifth Third Bank Statement for GLG, LLLP in Mt. Pleasant, MI, #9 Exhibit 8 - 11/11/2011 J. Bohl email Re: PNC Credit Card, #10 Exhibit 9 - Michigan Motor Vehicle Search, #11 Exhibit 10 - 02/16/2009 J. Moeller email RE: Bank Confirm Information - NCB, #12 Exhibit 11 - 03/15/2011 J. Gingrich Email, Brookstone Balances, #13 Exhibit 12 - Brookstone National City Bank Activity 2011, #14 Exhibit 13 - 11/02/2009 F. Lambert email, Re Transfrer to GD&M today (sic), #15 Exhibit 14 - CBM Resources Project Costs, #16 Exhibit 15 - Schedule of Assignments Spreadsheet, #17 Exhibit 16 - 01/30/2010 G Ewart email RE reconciliations, #18 Exhibit 17 - Ernst & Young Agreed-upon procedures report, #19 Exhibit 18 - Ignite Energy Resources Consolidated Schedule of Loans and Repayments, #20 Exhibit 19 - 11/30/2009 M. MacDonald email RE IER TB and IC Schedules, #21 Exhibit 20 - 11/03/2010 F Lambert email RE CBMR Senior Promissory Notes, #22 Exhibit 21 - 01/15/2010 F. Lambert email, Fw Senior Note Prom. Note Status, #23 Exhibit 22 - 03/01/2010 J. Moeller email RE Confirmation letters, #24 Exhibit 23 - 03/02/2010 T. Robinson email RE Signed 2007 and 2008 Confirmations, #25 Exhibit 24 - 05/31/2013 G. Ewart email RE VCR Share Reconciliation 32m shares, #26 Exhibit 25 - Corporate filing in MI, Riverside Equities, LLC, Penny Robinson, Manager, #27 Exhibit 26 - Riverside Senior Secured Convertible Loan Agreement and Promissory Notes Deed, #28 Exhibit 27 - Declaration of Penny Robinson from In re ClassicStar Mare Lease Litigation, MDL No. 1877 (E.D. Ky.), #29 Exhibit 28 - Deed from Riverside Equities Living Trust by Penny K. Robinson, #30 Exhibit 29 - Certificate of Trust for Riverside Equities Living Trust, #31 Exhibit 30 - Financial Memo Summary in Ernst & Young Review, #32 Exhibit 31 - Summary of December 2009 promissory notes, #33 Exhibit 32 - GeoStar 2004 Annual Report, #34 Exhibit 33 - GLG, Inc. 2005 & 2006 MI Information Update, #35 Exhibit 34 - GLG, Inc. 2009 West Virginia Business Organization Detail, #36 Exhibit 35 - F. Lambert Deposition, #37 Exhibit 36 - Michigan UCC Statement and cover page, #38 Exhibit 37 - Brookstone 2005 Annual Report, #39 Exhibit 38 - 07/06/2017 J Weiner email RE Arbor Farms GeoStar - New ESI Search Terms for Plaintiffs - Search results) (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Tony Ferguson, #3 Exhibit 2. Declaration of Deborah Ferguson, #4 Exhibit 3. Declaration of Thom Robinson, #5 Exhibit 4. Declaration of Penny Robinson, #6 Exhibit 5. Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr PC Letter Dated September 9, 2011 to Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc., #7 Exhibit 6. Greenbaum Doll & McDonald PLLC Letter Dated September 23, 2011 to Barry D. Hunter, Frost Brown Todd LLC, #8 Exhibit 7. Opinion and Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Joinder of Thomas Robinson and Tony Ferguson as Defendants to the Present Case Pursuant to MCR 2.206 and Thomas Robinson and Tony Ferguson's Motion to Vacate the Court's Show Cause Orders and Subsequent Bench Warrants) (Pellegrino, Ariana) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 11). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 11 [STRICKEN] MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Tony Ferguson, #3 Exhibit 2. Declaration of Deborah Ferguson, #4 Exhibit 3. Declaration of Penny Robinson, #5 Exhibit 4. Declaration of Penny Robinson, #6 Exhibit 5. Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr PC Letter Dated September 9, 2011 to Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc., #7 Exhibit 6. Greenbaum Doll & McDonald PLLC Letter Dated September 23, 2011 to Barry D. Hunter, Frost Brown Todd LLC, #8 Exhibit 7. Opinion and Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Joinder of Thomas Robinson and Tony Ferguson as Defendants to the Present Case Pursuant to MCR 2.206 and Thomas Robinson and Tony Ferguson's Motion to Vacate the Court's Show Cause Orders and Subsequent Bench Warrants) (Pellegrino, Ariana)[MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE] Modified on 3/2/2018 (DPer). Modified on 3/5/2018 (Sandusky, K). [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time to Respond to the Complaint. Answer due by 3/1/2018. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Complete Service of Process. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Complete Service of Process re #5 Summons Issued by Monica Grover, Jaswinder Grover, MD, MacDonald Stables, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC. (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MacDonald Stables, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, MD, West Hills Farms, LLC, Monica Grover against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 4, 2017 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (Krause, S) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Brookstone Development Ltd., Inc., Deborah Ferguson, Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation, Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc., Great Lakes Geophysical, LLLP, Riverside Equities, LLC, Penny Robinson, Thomas Robinson* (Krause, S) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by West Hills Farms, LLC (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by MacDonald Stables, LLC (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Arbor Farms, LLC (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6423895 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Isabella - County of 1st Defendant: Isabella. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Isabella County Circuit Court and Eastn District of Kentucky, Central Division at Lexington, 12-9992-PZ and MDL No. 1877/Civil No. 5:07-cv-353, Judge Isabella: Hon. Paul H. Chamberlain; Eastern District of Kentucky: Hon. Joseph M. Hood] (Hoenig, Lesley) [Transferred from mied on 8/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Hills Farms, LLC et al v. GeoStar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Development Ltd., Inc.
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Ferguson
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: William Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Ferguson
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: William Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Geophysical, Inc.
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Equities, LLC
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Robinson
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Geophysical, LLLP
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: William Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Robinson
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoStar Corporation
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Grover
Represented By: Lesley A. Hoenig
Represented By: David A. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaswinder Grover, MD
Represented By: Lesley A. Hoenig
Represented By: David A. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacDonald Stables, LLC
Represented By: Lesley A. Hoenig
Represented By: David A. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Hills Farms, LLC
Represented By: Lesley A. Hoenig
Represented By: David A. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arbor Farms, LLC
Represented By: Lesley A. Hoenig
Represented By: David A. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?