Wright v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Amy Wright
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv02281
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
0 Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
1 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Coffman, William)
October 31, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/31/2018. (Wilson, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 8 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Amy Wright. (Coffman, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 9, 2018 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Suarez, Tanya)
September 18, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Amy Wright. (Coffman, William)
September 18, 2018 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Amy Wright. Related case(s): n (Coffman, William)
September 14, 2018 4 Featured Case INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/14/2018. (BGS)
September 14, 2018 3 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/14/2018. (BGS)
September 14, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (EA)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA053074) filed by Amy Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Wright
Represented By: William S. Coffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Tanya I. Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?