Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London v. Pharmatech, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London subscribing to policy number GLX0843-01 and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Defendant: Robert Scott, Victoria Bolls, Legend Johnson, James Kregg Barentine, Selena Garcia, Betty Jean Yokley, Christina King, Hattie Wade, Jami Jackson, Hayli Pair, Adrienne Ramsey, Taylor Emma, Norman Manuel, Willisha Johnson, Shirley Weinelt, Craig Kosinski, Lamont Singleton, Sydney Payne, Klay King, Fancher Harrell, Matthew Dunlap, Jade Linder, Lorraine Cummings, Jesiah Barrientos, Angelo Mancini, Blake Kubicki, Anderson Moreno, Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Tonesa Walker, Pharmatech, LLC, The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, Jocelyn Wilson, Cheryl Robinson, Melissa Geralds, Ursula Dixon, Logan Degraff, Sandi Greenhowe and Norman Manuel, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02550
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Mooney, Nichole)
December 14, 2018 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Mooney, Nichole)
December 14, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Mooney, Nichole)
December 14, 2018 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Arthur Liederman to appear pro hac vice by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Naberhaus, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 14, 2018 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Nicole Battisti to appear pro hac vice by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Naberhaus, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 13, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Brian Phillips on behalf of Legend Johnson, Willisha Johnson (Phillips, Jason)
December 12, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Brian Phillips on behalf of Legend Johnson, Willisha Johnson (Phillips, Jason) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (KMM). (Unsigned)
December 7, 2018 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by The Harvard Drug Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc. for The Harvard Drug Group, LLC.. (Whyte, Erika)
December 7, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Harvard Drug Group, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Whyte, Erika)
December 7, 2018 Filing 49 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Harvard Drug Group, LLC.(Whyte, Erika)
December 7, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Pharmatech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Joseph, Allan) . Modified relief and text on 12/10/2018 (KMM).
December 6, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pharmatech, LLC. Related case(s): Y (Joseph, Allan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Pharmatech, LLC. (Joseph, Allan)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 motion for extension of time. Virtus' answer or response is due December 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/5/2018. (DMP)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER taking under advisement #8 motion for miscellaneous relief. Underwriters' motion for nationwide notice is granted. The remaining relief Underwriters requests is taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/5/2018. (DMP)
December 5, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Naberhaus, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified relief and text on 12/5/2018 (KMM).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #41 Motion to Extend Time to Conduct Case Management Conference on or before 60 days from the ruling on the motion regarding service. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/3/2018. (CCB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Johnson, Robin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 29, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of service by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London . (Johnson, Robin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 39 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/29/2018 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as to Hattie Wade. (Johnson, Robin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Hohlt Wade on behalf of Hattie Wade (Wade, Linda)
November 28, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole M. Mooney on behalf of Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Mooney, Nichole)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 motion for extension of time. Virtus' answer or response is due December 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/28/2018. (DMP)
November 27, 2018 Filing 35 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/27/2018 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as to Selena Garcia. (Johnson, Robin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of service by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London . (Johnson, Robin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Naberhaus, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified relief and text on 11/28/2018 (KMM).
November 27, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Keith Naberhaus on behalf of Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Naberhaus, Joseph) Modified text on 11/28/2018- Counsel notified to file a separate appearance for Counsel listed on document (KMM).
November 26, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R.J. Pace on behalf of The Harvard Drug Group, LLC (Pace, Christopher)
November 15, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Zamora on behalf of Logan Degraff (Zamora, Omar)
November 14, 2018 Filing 29 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/14/2018 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as to Logan Degraff. (Johnson, Robin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Joseph on behalf of Pharmatech, LLC (Joseph, Allan)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint on or before 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/13/2018. (CCB)
November 12, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer to #1 Complaint by Pharmatech, LLC. (David, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified relief and text on 11/13/2018 (KMM).
November 12, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Kornhauser on behalf of Pharmatech, LLC (Kornhauser, Michael)
November 12, 2018 Filing 24 *** Counsel notified to re-file. The person who signs the document must be the person who submits the document *** NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Joseph on behalf of Pharmatech, LLC (Joseph, Allan) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 11/13/2018 (KMM).
November 9, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. David on behalf of Pharmatech, LLC (David, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 motion for extension of time. The Harvard Drug Group's answer or response is due December 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/5/2018. (DMP)
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Harvard Drug Group, LLC. (Whyte, Erika) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified filing event on 11/2/2018 (AG).
November 1, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. Related case(s): yes (Johnson, Robin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Johnson, Robin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 10/23/18 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as to Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Irel, Monica)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 10/23/18 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as to The Harvard Drug Group, LLC. (Irel, Monica)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 10/22/18 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as to Pharmatech, LLC. (Irel, Monica)
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 *** Terminated- Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed *** PROOF of service by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Irel, Monica) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 10/30/2018 (KMM).
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 *** Terminated- Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed ***PROOF of service by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Irel, Monica) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 10/30/2018 (KMM).
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 *** Terminated- Counsel notified to re-file using the event Summons Returned Executed *** PROOF of service by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Irel, Monica) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 10/30/2018 (KMM).
October 24, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA053849.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Robin Johnson to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
October 24, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA053849.) Related document: #10 MOTION for John Grossbart to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
October 24, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA053849.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Keith Moskowitz to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 , #10 , and #11 motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Keith Moskowitz, John Grossbart, and Robin N. Johnson may appear pro hac vice. Going forward, the parties must strictly follow Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/23/2018. (DMP)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Robin Johnson to appear pro hac vice by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Irel, Monica) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for John Grossbart to appear pro hac vice by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Irel, Monica) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Keith Moskowitz to appear pro hac vice by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Irel, Monica) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Effectuate Nationwide Service of Process, Deposit Policy Funds, Enjoin Claims, Discharge Plaintiff and Dismiss Plaintiff by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Irel, Monica)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (KMM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Pharmatech, LLC. (KMM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to The Harvard Drug Group, LLC. (KMM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/17/2018. (SAO)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London subscribing to policy number GLX0843-01. (Irel, Monica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:18-cv-2550-T-02AAS. (NAS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14720515) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Irel, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London v. Pharmatech, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Bolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Johnson
Represented By: Jason Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kregg Barentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selena Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Jean Yokley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hattie Wade
Represented By: Linda Hohlt Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayli Pair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Emma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willisha Johnson
Represented By: Jason Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Weinelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Kosinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamont Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klay King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fancher Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesiah Barrientos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Kubicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Keith Naberhaus
Represented By: Nichole M. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonesa Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmatech, LLC
Represented By: Allan Joseph
Represented By: Christopher M. David
Represented By: Michael B. Kornhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harvard Drug Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R.J. Pace
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Geralds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Degraff
Represented By: Omar Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandi Greenhowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Manuel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London subscribing to policy number GLX0843-01
Represented By: Monica L. Irel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Monica L. Irel
Represented By: Robin N. Johnson
Represented By: John I. Grossbart
Represented By: Keith Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?