Shows v. Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Myiah Shows
Defendant: Daniel C. Consuegra, Amanda R. Duffy, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Joshua D. Moore and Chad W. Howard
Case Number: 8:2018cv02633
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. The Defendants' responses are due on or before 1/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 12/18/2018. (AMM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Moore, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. The Defendants' responses are due on or before 12/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 11/19/2018. (AMM)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel C. Consuegra, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Amanda R. Duffy, Chad W. Howard, Joshua D. Moore. (Moore, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Daniel C. Consuegra, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Amanda R. Duffy, Chad W. Howard, Joshua D. Moore. (Moore, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Daniel C. Consuegra, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Amanda R. Duffy, Chad W. Howard, Joshua D. Moore. Related case(s): YES (Moore, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua David Moore on behalf of Daniel C. Consuegra, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Amanda R. Duffy, Chad W. Howard, Joshua D. Moore (Moore, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 11-5-18 by Myiah Shows as to Joshua D. Moore. (Leavengood, Ian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 11-5-18 by Myiah Shows as to Daniel C. Consuegra. (Leavengood, Ian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11-5-18 by Myiah Shows as to Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C.. (Leavengood, Ian)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Myiah Shows. Related case(s): yes (Leavengood, Ian)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Myiah Shows. (Leavengood, Ian)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/29/2018. (BGS)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/29/2018. (BGS)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Daniel C. Consuegra, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Amanda R. Duffy, Chad W. Howard, Joshua D. Moore. (CTR)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel C. Consuegra, Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C., Amanda R. Duffy, Chad W. Howard, Joshua D. Moore with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA053875 filed by Myiah Shows. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shows v. Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Consuegra
Represented By: Joshua David Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda R. Duffy
Represented By: Joshua David Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consuegra & Duffy, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua David Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua D. Moore
Represented By: Joshua David Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad W. Howard
Represented By: Joshua David Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myiah Shows
Represented By: Ian Richard Leavengood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?