The City of Tampa v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The City of Tampa
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuical Industries Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02792
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 21:801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Case transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46282, filed 11/30/2018. (JNB)
November 29, 2018 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Ohio pursuant #25 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO-28) transferring case re MDL case number: 2804. (AG)
November 29, 2018 Filing 25 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio re: MDL case number: 2804. (AG)
November 28, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Furness, Amy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Furness, Amy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Furness on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Furness, Amy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Gulde, Virginia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Gulde, Virginia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc... (Ercole, Brian)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Related case(s): yess (Ercole, Brian)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Hearn, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mallinckrodt LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Hearn, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Kissane, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Purdue Pharma L.P.. Related case(s): yes (Kissane, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Gerber, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by H.D. Smith, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Gerber, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by AmerisourceBergen Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Other Affiliate Amerisourcebergen Corp., Other Affiliate AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Corporation.. (Pratico, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. Related case(s): y (Pratico, Steven)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendants Purdue, Mallinckrodt, EHSI, EPI, TEVA, INSYS, Johnson & Johnson, and Janssen's Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendants' answers or responses shall be due the later of (a) 30 days after the final ruling of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer of this of this case to the Northern District of Ohio to become a part of MDL-2804: In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, or (b) 30 days after a decision by this Court on whether this action should be remanded to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 11/27/2018. (AHA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint and Joint Notice of Adoption by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Kissane, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendants' answers or responses shall be due the later of (a) 30 days after the final ruling of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer of this of this case to the Northern District of Ohio to become a part of MDL-2804: In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, or (b) 30 days after a decision by this Court on whether this action should be remanded to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 11/21/2018. (AHA)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal Amended Complaint (jointly with Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation and H.D. Smith, LLC) by McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/14/2018. (GSO)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:18-cv-2792-T-23CPT. (NAS)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 18-CA-009614 filed in State Court on 10/02/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14816436 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Silverglate, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Tampa v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel Robbie Chewning
Represented By: Daniel J. Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Redi Kasollja
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: William Newton Shepherd
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel Robbie Chewning
Represented By: Daniel J. Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Oni H. Harton
Represented By: Kathleen L. Matsoukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Conor O'Croinin
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Steven Charles Pratico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel Robbie Chewning
Represented By: Daniel J. Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Tampa
Represented By: Salvatore Territo
Represented By: Thomas Lowe Young
Represented By: Mike Moore
Represented By: James Stephen Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?