Juul Labs, Inc. v. Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02855
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of compliance re 9 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Juul Labs, Inc. (Hull, Bryan)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. The parties are directed to notify the Court upon a final decision of the USITC. The Clerk is directed to stay and administratively close the case in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/17/2018. (CCB)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to stay Action filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Hull, Bryan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC.(Yennes, Adham)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Juul Labs, Inc. (Hull, Bryan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Juul Labs, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc. (Hull, Bryan) Modified on 12/12/2018 DOCUMENT TERMINATED, counsel refiled #14 Amended Certificate (BES).
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to stay Action by All Defendants. (Yennes, Adham)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adham Yennes on behalf of Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC (Yennes, Adham)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Juul Labs, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Hull, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael E. Joffre, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054356.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Michael E. Joffre to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nirav N. Desai, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054356.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Nirav N. Desai to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Daniel E. Yonan, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054356.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Daniel E. Yonan to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 4, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathan Tuminaro, appearing on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA054356.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Jonathan Tuminaro to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Daniel E. Yonan, Michael E. Joffre, Nirav N. Desai, and Jonathan Tuminaro may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorneys David C. Banker and Bryan D. Hull designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/3/2018. (JMF)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel E. Yonan, Michael E. Joffre, Nirav N. Desai, and Jonathan Tuminaro to appear pro hac vice by Juul Labs, Inc. (Banker, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11/23/2018 by Juul Labs, Inc. as to Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC. (BES)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Juul Labs, Inc. (Banker, David)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/27/2018. (SAO)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC. (BES)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:18-cv-2855-T-02AEP. (SJB)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14844244) filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons)(Banker, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twist Vapor Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Adham Yennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Daniel E. Yonan
Represented By: Jonathan Tuminaro
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Michael E. Joffre
Represented By: Nirav N. Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?