Sarasota County Public Hospital Board v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarasota County Public Hospital Board
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. and Health Options, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02873
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (CKR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pegg, Allen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart)(Pegg, Allen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Sarasota County Public Hospital Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Patricios, Leon)
January 9, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Continue the Order Sealing Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 1.09 and for Leave to File a Redacted Complaint filed by Sarasota County Public Hospital Board. (Patricios, Leon)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to remand to State Court. Defendants' Response is due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/28/2018. (NCR)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to remand to State Court by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Pegg, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/27/2018. (NCR)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file response to Motion to Dismiss , MOTION for Extension of Time to File 1/11/2019 , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Sarasota County Public Hospital Board. (Patricios, Leon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Continue the Order Sealing Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 1.09 and for Leave to File a Redacted Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Pegg, Allen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to remand to State Court by Sarasota County Public Hospital Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Patricios, Leon)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sarasota County Public Hospital Board. Related case(s): yes (Patricios, Leon)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Notice of designation of track, #10 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Pegg, Allen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Pegg, Allen)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/5/2018. (GSO)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Leon N. Patricios on behalf of Sarasota County Public Hospital Board (Patricios, Leon)
November 26, 2018 Sealed Document [S-7]. (DG)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 --motion to seal; directing the defendants promptly to file the complaint, which the clerk is directed to SEAL. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/26/2018. (BK)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 the defendants' unopposed motion to extend through December 10, the time within which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/26/2018.
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Pegg, Allen)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.. (Pegg, Allen)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:18-cv-2873-T-23SPF. (NAS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sarasota County Circuit Court, case number 2018-CA-005593-NC filed in State Court on 10/22/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14851121 filed by Health Options, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Annette Norman, #4 Exhibit 2-A, #5 Exhibit 2-B, #6 Exhibit 2-C, #7 Exhibit 2-D, #8 Exhibit 2-E, #9 Exhibit 2-F, #10 Exhibit 2-G, #11 Exhibit 2-H, #12 Exhibit 2-I, #13 Exhibit 2-J, #14 Exhibit 2-K, #15 Exhibit 2-L, #16 Exhibit 2-M, #17 Exhibit 2-N, #18 Exhibit 2-O, #19 Exhibit 2-P, #20 Exhibit 2-Q, #21 Exhibit 2-R, #22 Exhibit 2-S, #23 Exhibit 2-T, #24 Exhibit 2-U, #25 Exhibit 2-V, #26 Exhibit 2-W, #27 Exhibit 2-X, #28 Exhibit 2-Y, #29 Exhibit 2-Z, #30 Exhibit 2-AA, #31 Exhibit 2-BB, #32 Exhibit 2-CC, #33 Exhibit 2-DD, #34 Exhibit 3 - State Court Filings, #35 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pegg, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarasota County Public Hospital Board v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Options, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarasota County Public Hospital Board
Represented By: Joseph Ignacio Zumpano
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?