Nordhausen v. Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)

Plaintiff: Amy Nordhausen
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)
Case Number: 8:2018cv02970
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
0 Judge: Sean P Flynn
1 Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 18 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 9, 2019 at 9:00 a.m before Jack Townsend, Sr. (Tucker, John) Modified on 1/30/2019 (DG).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/8/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2019, Pretrial statement due by 3/24/2020, All other motions due by 3/31/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 1:45 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Bench Trial set for term commencing 5/4/2020 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/19/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/29/2019. (BGS)
January 25, 2019 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA).(Lehner, Steven)
January 16, 2019 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tucker, John)
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/12/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
January 11, 2019 13 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Amy Nordhausen. (Tucker, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 9, 2019 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). Related case(s): no (Lehner, Steven)
January 9, 2019 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA) identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc. for Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA).. (Lehner, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/4/2019. (CKR)
January 3, 2019 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Lehner, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
December 21, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Amy Nordhausen. (Tucker, John)
December 21, 2018 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Amy Nordhausen. Related case(s): no (Tucker, John)
December 20, 2018 6 RETURN of service executed on December 14, 2018 by Amy Nordhausen as to Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Tucker, John)
December 7, 2018 5 SUMMONS issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (DG)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/7/2018. (BGS)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/7/2018. (BGS)
December 7, 2018 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:18-cv-2970-T-36SPF. (SJB)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14903057) filed by Amy Nordhausen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(Tucker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordhausen v. Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Nordhausen
Represented By: John V. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)
Represented By: Steven D. Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?