Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 1.63 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida et al

Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Hillsborough County, Florida, Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC, Veronica Burgos, Unknown Owners, If Any, REI Holdings, LLC, 1.63 Acres of Land more or less in Hillsborough County, Florida, Helen M Malzahn Living Trust U/A/D, IMC Development Corp., as successor to Alafia-Keysville Land Co, Humberto Jimenez, 1.63 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida, IMC Development Corp. and Unknown Owners
Case Number: 8:2018cv03062
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
2 Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 STATUS report (Second) Regarding Settlement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #46 --stipulation by Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC substituting Benjamin Brown, Lauren Raines, and Charlotte Keeling for Dane Blunt and H. Ray Allen, II. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/13/2019. (BK)
February 13, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for default judgment against Hillsborough County, Florida, IMC Development Corp., Helen M Malzahn Living Trust U/A/D 4/12/1994, REI Holdings, LLC by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loeb, Ethan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 52 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Helen M Malzahn Living Trust U/A/D 4/12/1994. (DG)
February 12, 2019 Filing 51 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hillsborough County, Florida. (DG)
February 12, 2019 Filing 50 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to REI Holdings, LLC. (DG)
February 12, 2019 Filing 49 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to IMC Development Corp. (DG)
February 11, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Hillsborough County, Florida, Helen M Malzahn Living Trust U/A/D 4/12/1994, REI Holdings, LLC by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 11, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against IMC Development Corp. by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 8, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Order Substituting Attorney for Defendant Angel Oak Mortgage by Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raines, Lauren)
February 8, 2019 Filing 45 STATUS report (Joint) Regarding Settlement of Tract No. FLMEF-HILL-208.00 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 44 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite: MOTION HEARING held on 2/4/2019 re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC, #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (LYB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding FERC Documentation by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (part 1), #4 Exhibit C (part 2), #5 Exhibit C (part 3), #6 Exhibit C (part 4), #7 Exhibit C (part 5), #8 Exhibit C (part 6), #9 Exhibit C (part 7), #10 Exhibit C (part 8), #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (as to Judge and Courtroom only): The Motion hearing previously scheduled for 2/4/2013 at 1:30 p.m. is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (AHA)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Tuite for a report and recommendation: #3 --motion for partial summary judgment, and #4 --motion for preliminary injunction; directing Florida Gas to reply by 2/1/2019 to each opposition to the motions. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/29/2019. (BK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 29, 2019 Filing 39 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:18-cv-3062-T-23CPT. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. (SMS)
January 28, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC.(Keeling, Charlotte)
January 28, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction for immediate possession filed by Veronica Burgos, Humberto Jimenez. (Gaylord, S.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment and incorporated memorandum of law filed by Veronica Burgos, Humberto Jimenez. (Gaylord, S.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 35 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Veronica Burgos, Humberto Jimenez.(Gaylord, S.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Elise Murrell on behalf of Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC (Murrell, Charlotte)
January 24, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC Certificate of Service by Publication. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Ray Allen, II on behalf of Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC (Allen, H.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC. (Blunt, Dane)
January 16, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Rhodes Blunt on behalf of Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC (Blunt, Dane)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 --motion for an extension of time; allowing Florida Gas Transmission Company to complete by 1/18/2019 service by publication. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2019. (BK)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to extend time to Complete Service on IMC Development Corp. by Publication Prior to Hearing and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Ethan Jerome Loeb on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Loeb, Ethan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of hearing on motions (Docs. #3 and #4 ) scheduled for 2/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday; directing the plaintiff to serve each defendant no later than 1/7/2019; directing the defendants to respond to the complaint, motion for partial summary judgment, and motion for preliminary injunction no later than 1/27/2019. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/26/2018.(GSO)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/26/2018. (GSO)
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (of Filing Proposed Order) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Loeb, Ethan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:18-cv-3062-T-23JSS. (SJB)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION with Exhibit A filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A part 3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for partial summary judgment by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14949270) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Loeb, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 1.63 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Oak Mortgage Solutions LLC
Represented By: Charlotte Elise Keeling
Represented By: Benjamin Bruce Brown
Represented By: H. Ray Allen, II
Represented By: Dane Rhodes Blunt
Represented By: Lauren G. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Burgos
Represented By: S. Cary Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners, If Any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REI Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.63 Acres of Land more or less in Hillsborough County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen M Malzahn Living Trust U/A/D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC Development Corp., as successor to Alafia-Keysville Land Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto Jimenez
Represented By: S. Cary Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.63 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC Development Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Jerome Loeb
Represented By: Jon P. Tasso
Represented By: Allison Doucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?