Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. v. Tomato Thyme Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.
Defendant: Tomato Thyme Corporation and German Javier Torres
Case Number: 8:2018cv03063
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/3/2019. (TWL)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/28/2018. (TWL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to German Javier Torres. (BES)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Tomato Thyme Corporation. (BES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:18-cv-3063-T-33CPT. (SJB)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. (Esquivel, Katy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14949971) filed by Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summary of Invoices & Invoices), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Tomato Thyme, #4 Proposed Summons German Torres)(Esquivel, Katy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval Wholesales, Inc. v. Tomato Thyme Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoval Wholesales, Inc.
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomato Thyme Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?