Gray v. Uber, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Gray
Defendant: Unknown Individuals, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber, Inc. and Unknown Individual
Case Number: 8:2018cv03093
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION to modify Motion to Correct Errors by Phillip Gray. (Gray, Phillip)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay all Court Proceedings (Dkt. #9 ) is GRANTED. All other pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to stay these proceedings pending arbitration and administratively close this case. The parties are directed to arbitrate the claims pursuant to the Services Agreement's Arbitration Provisions. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/22/2019. (SMB)
February 18, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Hearing by Phillip Gray. (Gray, Phillip)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Denial of Motion for forced arbitration filed by Uber, Inc.. (White, Brandon)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER re: #12 Motion. The Court directs Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to reply to Plaintiff's argument that he opted out of the Service Agreement's arbitration provision. Defendant shall file its reply on or before February 12, 2019. The reply shall be no longer than seven (7) pages. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/5/2019. (JSK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Discovery by Phillip Gray. (Gray, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Denial of Motion for forced arbitration by Phillip Gray. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Phillip Gray)(Gray, Phillip)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Dylan Tonti re #9 MOTION to compel arbitration and Stay all Court Proceedings by Uber, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to stay Proceedings Pending Determination of [re 9]Motion to Compel by Uber, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to compel arbitration and Stay all Court Proceedings by Uber, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Access to the Electronic Filing System. Plaintiff shall comply with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing and the Court's Local Rules. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (SMB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Phillip Gray. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to allow access to the electronic filing system by Phillip Gray. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/2/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal ,Complaint by Uber, Inc.. (White, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2018. (AD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:18-cv-3093-T-30SPF. (SJB)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 5th Circuit, Hernando County, case number 2018-CA-1196 filed in State Court on 10/10/18. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14960555) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 State Court Docket Sheet)(White, Brandon) Modified on 12/27/2018 to correct docket text (SJB). Modified defendants names per state court complaint on 12/27/2018 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Uber, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon T. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon T. White
Represented By: Edward M. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?