F2VS Technologies, LLC v. Gooee, LLC
Plaintiff: F2VS Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Gooee, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv03132
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/4/2019. (SRC)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (LD)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/2008. (LD)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Gooee, LLC. (LD)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:18-cv-3132-T-17AEP. (NAS)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by F2VS Technologies, LLC OF PROPOSED REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK (Davis, Timothy)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by F2VS Technologies, LLC. (Davis, Timothy)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gooee, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14968803) filed by F2VS Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons)(Davis, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F2VS Technologies, LLC v. Gooee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F2VS Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Timothy C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gooee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?