Agurcia et al v. Republica De Honduras et al
Plaintiff: Leslie B Solt, Barrett Handlon, Lyn Macbeth, Linda Frary, Hugh Anderson, William Valenti, Thaddeus Handlon, Antiquare International, LTD, Lyn Townsend, Melina Ebjornstad, Patricia Urban, William P Rovira IV, Linda Brent, Luther Luck, Mary Belvin, Vision Corporation Limited, Richard Porter, Richard Frary, Gail Gilchrist, Lisa Marie Gauslow, Randy Solt, Regina Anderson, Katherine C Srur, Waldron Palmer, Anna Nardella, Garrett Byrne, Lisa Strayer, Stiles Byrne, Renee Perusso, Jerzy Bandrowski, Jane Best Grandbouche, Steven T Huntington, Cameron Priesmeyer, Joel Handlon, William Bowen, Barbara Parker, Veronica Calderon, Nicci Nunez, Robert Strayer, Jr, Wally Phillips, Jennifer Siddons, Theresa Salpino, L&R International Ventures, Diane Emery, Robert Dynan, Marco Agurcia, Jeffrey Sterns, Estate of John P. Nitchie, Estate of Johanna Giwosky, Mary Anne Bowie, Lucinda Steinwachs, Patricia A Star, Megan Steinwachs, Rachel Renne, Dennis Hartzler, Cherie Dinoia, Gary Steinwachs, Pamela Bowen, Richard Martin, Anita Bandrowski, Judith Burke Cannon, Patricia Novak, Kathleen Conn, Pat Dzierwinski, Dennis Hassell, Haylee Hines, Jack Sims, Jan Van Wart, Marjorie Burst, Clifford Wright, Betty F Lupacchino, Joseph Simonetta, Dorothy Davis, Edward Baum, Douglas Robertson, Amy Grewal, Mary Drudy, Eileen Agurcia, Joshua Solt, Laura Byrne, Paula Knudsen, Alex Steinwachs, Elizabeth K Murdoch, Christine O Huntington, Harmony C Roberts, Rose Wright, Dennis Dinoia, Jessica Rhodes Mcfarland, Steven Dinoia, James Nardella, Lance Parker, Yvette Valenti, Jay Petty, The Vision Corporation, LTD, Gail Dinoia, Paul Demos, Angelia Handlon, Jessie Greer, Logan Byrne, Elizabeth Knauss Murdoch, Harmony Christina Roberts, Yvette S. Rovira, Betty F. Lupacchino, Christine O. Huntington, Patricia Ann Star, The Vision Corporation, LTD., Katharine C. Srur, Leslie Byrne Solt and Melina I. Bjornstad
Defendant: Empresa Nacional De Energia Electrica, Instituto De La Propiedad and Republica De Honduras
Petitioner: Yvette S Rovira
Case Number: 8:2019cv00038
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Empresa Nacional De Energia Electrica, Instituto De La Propiedad, Republica De Honduras. (JCG)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eileen Agurcia, Marco Agurcia, Hugh Anderson, Regina Anderson, Antiquare International, LTD, Anita Bandrowski, Jerzy Bandrowski, Edward Baum, Mary Belvin, Melina I. Bjornstad, Pamela Bowen, William Bowen, Mary Anne Bowie, Linda Brent, Marjorie Burst, Garrett Byrne, Laura Byrne, Logan Byrne, Stiles Byrne, Veronica Calderon, Judith Burke Cannon, Kathleen Conn, Dorothy Davis, Paul Demos, Cherie Dinoia, Dennis Dinoia, Gail Dinoia, Steven Dinoia, Mary Drudy, Robert Dynan, Pat Dzierwinski, Diane Emery, Estate of Johanna Giwosky, Estate of John P. Nitchie, Linda Frary, Richard Frary, Lisa Marie Gauslow, Gail Gilchrist, Jane Best Grandbouche, Jessie Greer, Amy Grewal, Angelia Handlon, Barrett Handlon, Joel Handlon, Thaddeus Handlon, Dennis Hartzler, Dennis Hassell, Haylee Hines, Christine O. Huntington, Steven T Huntington, Paula Knudsen, L&R International Ventures, Luther Luck, Betty F. Lupacchino, Lyn Macbeth, Richard Martin, Jessica Rhodes Mcfarland, Elizabeth Knauss Murdoch, Anna Nardella, James Nardella, Patricia Novak, Nicci Nunez, Waldron Palmer, Barbara Parker, Lance Parker, Renee Perusso, Jay Petty, Wally Phillips, Richard Porter, Cameron Priesmeyer, Rachel Renne, Harmony Christina Roberts, Douglas Robertson, Yvette S. Rovira, William P Rovira IV, Theresa Salpino, Jennifer Siddons, Joseph Simonetta, Jack Sims, Joshua Solt, Leslie Byrne Solt, Randy Solt, Katharine C. Srur, Patricia Ann Star, Alex Steinwachs, Gary Steinwachs, Lucinda Steinwachs, Megan Steinwachs, Jeffrey Sterns, Lisa Strayer, Robert Strayer, Jr, The Vision Corporation, LTD., Lyn Townsend, Patricia Urban, William Valenti, Yvette Valenti, Vision Corporation Limited, Jan Van Wart, Clifford Wright, Rose Wright. Related case(s): no (Alvarez, Ignacio)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING CIVIL COVER SHEET by Eileen Agurcia, Marco Agurcia, Hugh Anderson, Regina Anderson, Antiquare International, LTD, Anita Bandrowski, Jerzy Bandrowski, Edward Baum, Mary Belvin, Melina I. Bjornstad, Pamela Bowen, William Bowen, Mary Anne Bowie, Linda Brent, Marjorie Burst, Garrett Byrne, Laura Byrne, Logan Byrne, Stiles Byrne, Veronica Calderon, Judith Burke Cannon, Kathleen Conn, Dorothy Davis, Paul Demos, Cherie Dinoia, Dennis Dinoia, Gail Dinoia, Steven Dinoia, Mary Drudy, Robert Dynan, Pat Dzierwinski, Diane Emery, Estate of Johanna Giwosky, Estate of John P. Nitchie, Linda Frary, Richard Frary, Lisa Marie Gauslow, Gail Gilchrist, Jane Best Grandbouche, Jessie Greer, Amy Grewal, Angelia Handlon, Barrett Handlon, Joel Handlon, Thaddeus Handlon, Dennis Hartzler, Dennis Hassell, Haylee Hines, Christine O. Huntington, Steven T Huntington, Paula Knudsen, L&R International Ventures, Luther Luck, Betty F. Lupacchino, Lyn Macbeth, Richard Martin, Jessica Rhodes Mcfarland, Elizabeth Knauss Murdoch, Anna Nardella, James Nardella, Patricia Novak, Nicci Nunez, Waldron Palmer, Barbara Parker, Lance Parker, Renee Perusso, Jay Petty, Wally Phillips, Richard Porter, Cameron Priesmeyer, Rachel Renne, Harmony Christina Roberts, Douglas Robertson, Yvette S. Rovira, William P Rovira IV, Theresa Salpino, Jennifer Siddons, Joseph Simonetta, Jack Sims, Joshua Solt, Leslie Byrne Solt, Randy Solt, Katharine C. Srur, Patricia Ann Star, Alex Steinwachs, Gary Steinwachs, Lucinda Steinwachs, Megan Steinwachs, Jeffrey Sterns, Lisa Strayer, Robert Strayer, Jr, The Vision Corporation, LTD., Lyn Townsend, Patricia Urban, William Valenti, Yvette Valenti, Vision Corporation Limited, Jan Van Wart, Clifford Wright, Rose Wright Civil Cover Sheet (Alvarez, Ignacio)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/7/2019. (SMB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-38-T-30SPF. (SJB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14986880) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Alvarez, Ignacio) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agurcia et al v. Republica De Honduras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie B Solt
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrett Handlon
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyn Macbeth
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Frary
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Anderson
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Valenti
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Handlon
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antiquare International, LTD
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyn Townsend
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melina Ebjornstad
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Urban
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Rovira IV
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brent
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Luck
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Belvin
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Corporation Limited
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Porter
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Frary
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Gilchrist
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Gauslow
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Solt
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Anderson
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine C Srur
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldron Palmer
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Nardella
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Byrne
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Strayer
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stiles Byrne
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Perusso
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Bandrowski
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Best Grandbouche
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven T Huntington
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Priesmeyer
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Handlon
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bowen
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Parker
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Calderon
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicci Nunez
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Strayer, Jr
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wally Phillips
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Siddons
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Salpino
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&R International Ventures
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Emery
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dynan
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Agurcia
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Sterns
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of John P. Nitchie
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Johanna Giwosky
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Bowie
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Steinwachs
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Star
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Steinwachs
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Renne
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hartzler
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Dinoia
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Steinwachs
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Bowen
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Martin
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Bandrowski
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Burke Cannon
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Novak
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Conn
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Dzierwinski
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hassell
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haylee Hines
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Sims
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Van Wart
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Burst
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Wright
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty F Lupacchino
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Simonetta
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Davis
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Baum
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Robertson
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Grewal
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Drudy
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Agurcia
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Solt
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Byrne
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Knudsen
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Steinwachs
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth K Murdoch
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine O Huntington
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmony C Roberts
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Wright
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Dinoia
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rhodes Mcfarland
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dinoia
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nardella
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Parker
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Valenti
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Petty
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Vision Corporation, LTD
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Dinoia
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Demos
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Handlon
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Greer
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Byrne
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Knauss Murdoch
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmony Christina Roberts
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette S. Rovira
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty F. Lupacchino
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine O. Huntington
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Star
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Vision Corporation, LTD.
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine C. Srur
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Byrne Solt
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melina I. Bjornstad
Represented By: Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Represented By: Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yvette S Rovira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empresa Nacional De Energia Electrica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instituto De La Propiedad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republica De Honduras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?