Arbor Lakes Apartments, L.P. v. McLeod

Plaintiff: Arbor Lakes Apartments, L.P.
Defendant: Elizabeth K. McLeod
Case Number: 8:2019cv00126
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Mail returned (6161 Memorial Hwy Apt #1402 Tampa, FL 33615) as Undeliverable as addressed unable to forward re:. Mail not resent to Elizabeth K. McLeod. (JCG)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Elizabeth K. McLeod by Elizabeth K. McLeod. (JCG)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgement from State Court. The Certified Copy of the Order of Remand was received in State Court on January 28, 2019. (KMM)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to REMAND this case to state court. After remand has been effected, the Clerk shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/23/2019. (KAK)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2019. (TWL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Charles Vincent Barrett, III of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (AG)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth K. McLeod. (JCG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 2019-CC-1886 filed in State Court on 01/11/2019, filed by Elizabeth K. McLeod. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit A Other State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arbor Lakes Apartments, L.P. v. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth K. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arbor Lakes Apartments, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Vincent Barrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?