United States of America v. $919,251.94 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $919,251.94, 2016 Silver Lexus RC 350 and Approximately $809.94
Case Number: 8:2019cv00144
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: James D Whittemore
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 US Marshal 285 form for Execution of Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Seizure of $809.94 from Grow FCU). (Muench, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 US Marshal 285 form for Execution of Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the 2016 Lexus RC 350. (Muench, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by United States of America, US Marshal 285 form for Execution of Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the $919,251.94 from three Grow Financial Credit Union Accounts. (Muench, James)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/25/2019. (LV)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Muench, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Muench, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Muench, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (CAB)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $919,251.94, 2016 Silver Lexus RC 350, Approximately $809.94 filed by United States of America. Fee waived. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(BSN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $919,251.94 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $919,251.94
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Silver Lexus RC 350
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $809.94
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James A. Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?