G & A of Tampabay, LLC v. Bokros et al

Plaintiff: G & A of Tampabay, LLC
Defendant: Unknown Party #2, Csaba Bokros and Unknown Party #1
Case Number: 8:2019cv00157
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Acknowledgment of receipt of transmittal of record to state court on 2/19/19. (AG)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of TRANSMITTAL OF REMAND TO STATE COURT (LSS)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Dkt. #4 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to remand the case to The Circuit Court of the Twelfth Judicial Circuit in and for Sarasota County, Florida. The Clerk is also directed to forward a certified copy of this Order to that Court. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/13/2019. (SMB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Csaba Bokros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(JCG)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Csaba Bokros. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JCG)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to the clerk and the court of withholding consent by Csaba Bokros. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JCG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by G & A of Tampabay, LLC. Related case(s): no (Montanez, Felix)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to remand to State Court by G & A of Tampabay, LLC. (Montanez, Felix)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/23/2019. (AC)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Csaba Bokros. (JCG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 12th Judicial Circuit, in and for Sarasota County, Florida, case number 18-CA-6798 filed in State Court on 01/14/2019. filed by Csaba Bokros. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & A of Tampabay, LLC v. Bokros et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Csaba Bokros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & A of Tampabay, LLC
Represented By: Felix Gabriel Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?