Windwood Oaks Tampa Apartments, LTD. v. McCall

Plaintiff: Windwood Oaks Tampa Apartments, LTD.
Defendant: Genesta S. McCall
Case Number: 8:2019cv00203
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Steven D Merryday
1 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #6 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying #2 --motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; remanding the action; directing the clerk to MAIL a certified copy of this order to the state court and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/26/2019. (BK)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Genesta S. McCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/11/2019. (BEE)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to remand to State Court by Windwood Oaks Tampa Apartments, LTD. (Elliott, James) Modified on 2/1/2019 (DG).
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Elliott on behalf of Windwood Oaks Tampa Apartments, LTD. (Elliott, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel John E. McMillan of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (JCG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Genesta McCall. (JCG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CC-002952 filed in State Court on 01/18/2019. filed by Genesta McCall. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windwood Oaks Tampa Apartments, LTD. v. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windwood Oaks Tampa Apartments, LTD.
Represented By: John E. McMillan
Represented By: James W. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesta S. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?