Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. CLS, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-West, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. and SVC-Americana, LLC
Respondent: 417 MRC, LLC, Dan Chudy, Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mutual Release Corporation, Jason Levi Hemingway, VCS Communications, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq., The Transfer Group, LLC, Real Travel, LLC, Matthew Tucker, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, CLS, Inc., Bart Bowe, Transfer For You LLC, Donnelly Snellen, Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC, Allied Solution Group, LLC, Brian Scroggs, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC, Josh Ungaro and CLS, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Atlas Vacation Remedies doing business as Principal Transfer Group
Case Number: 8:2019cv00244
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 6/15/2020. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's December 2020 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 3/29/2019. (JD)
March 20, 2019 Filing 116 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bennington, Alfred)
March 11, 2019 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (BSN).
March 11, 2019 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (BSN).
March 11, 2019 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 Second MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (BSN).
March 11, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (BSN).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to file a joint case management report by 3/21/19. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 2/25/2019. (JD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 110 Second MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq. (Clapp, Mary) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (BSN).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ENDORSED ORDER directing Clapp Business Law and Mary Clapp to file a response to the amended complaint by 3/1/19. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 2/25/2019. (JD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Real Travel, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon)
February 25, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Bart Bowe, Brian Scroggs. (Zetrouer, Shannon)
February 25, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon)
February 5, 2019 Filing 105 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Order transferring case to MDFL) (JNB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment 8:19-cv-244-T-24AAS (signed by deputy clerk). (JNB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 102 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:18-cv-81250. File received electronically
February 4, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #101 Order. Closing Case. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA and granting #99 Unopposed Motion to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk shall CLOSE the case file in this district and DENY any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Support re #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Bart Bowe, Brian Scroggs. (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 99 Second MOTION to Change Venue Unopposed by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mary Clapp)(Clapp, Mary) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Support re #87 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Real Travel, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Support re #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, filed by VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shannon L. Zetrouer (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, , #90 First MOTION TO DISMISS #70 Amended Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6)First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 Amended Complaint,,, , #86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, , #88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (D.E. 86,87,88, 90) Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (D.E. 70) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Bennington, Alfred) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Phillip Hart on behalf of SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party SVC-Americana, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party SVC-Hawaii, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party SVC-West, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party Shell Vacations, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party Wyndham Resort Development Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.(pty:pla). (Hart, Jonathan) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #92 Unopposed Expedited Motion to Allow Plaintiffs to File Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , Unopposed MOTION Motion to Allow Plaintiffs To File Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions To Dismiss and To Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party SVC-Americana, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party SVC-Hawaii, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party SVC-West, LLC(pty:pla). (Bennington, Alfred) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #89 Motion to Change Venue. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #89 , filed herein on January 14, 2019. The Court has carefully considered the Motion and is otherwise fully advised in the premises. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion [DE 89] is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to file a motion that complies with the requirements of S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1.A.3., which requires the moving party to certify that he has conferred, or describes a reasonable effort to confer, with all of the parties affected in a good faith effort to resolve the dispute. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 01/15/2019. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 90 First MOTION TO DISMISS #70 Amended Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6), First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 Amended Complaint,,, ( Responses due by 1/28/2019) by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. (Clapp, Mary) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 89 First MOTION to Change Venue pursuant to 28 USC secs. 406 and 404 by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Clapp, Mary) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, by VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, by Real Travel, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #70 Amended Complaint,,, by Bart Bowe, Brian Scroggs. Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Michelle Clapp on behalf of Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Attorney Mary Michelle Clapp added to party Clapp Business Law, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Michelle Clapp added to party Mary Clapp, Esq.(pty:dft). (Clapp, Mary) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 84 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Midwest Transfers LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The Mid-West Transfer, LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 82 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by JJ&C Marketing, LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by JJ Midwest Marketing LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Allied Solution Group, LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 79 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Transfer For You LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Filing 78 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Josh Ungaro. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC (Steinfeld, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REFERRING #75 Motion for Award of Fees to Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Steinfeld, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 72 : Clapp Business Law, LLC response due 1/14/2019; Mary Clapp, Esq. response due 1/14/2019. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #73 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants THE TRANSFER GROUP, LLC, VACATION CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC, VCS COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, BRIAN SCROGGS, REAL TRAVEL, LLC, and BART BOWE shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before January 14, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/18/2018. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #70 Amended Complaint,,, by Bart Bowe, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, The Transfer Group, LLC, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants, Clapp Business Law, LLC, and Mary Clapp, Esq. shall file a response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint on or before January 14, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/18/2018. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #70 Amended Complaint,,, by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. (Slater, J.) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, SVC-Americana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Composite 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Composite 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Composite 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Barsky, Daniel) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 67 : Amended Complaint due by 12/10/2018. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Denying/ Non-Entry of Default re #64 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to CLS, Inc., Jason Levi Hemingway, Donnelly Snellen. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk) (lk). [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 68 VACATED Clerks Entry of Default as to CLS, Inc., Donnelly Snellen, Jason Levi Heminway - Motions Terminated: #64 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/15/2018. (lk) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (lk). [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file an amended complaint is extended to December 10, 2018. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/15/2018. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Amended Complaint re #58 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amended Complaint)(Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Clerk of Non-Entry of Default/DENYING re #63 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to 417 MRC LLC, and Matthew Tucker. The Defendants are not required to respond to the Complaint.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk) (lk). [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to CLS, Inc., Jason Levi Hemingway, Donnelly Snellen by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 417 MRC LLC, Matthew Tucker by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion for Clarification. Defendant Clapp need not file a response to the original Complaint and can wait to respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/07/2018. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for clarification #58 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Responses due by 11/21/2018 (Slater, J.) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 60 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Dan Chudy served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. Jason Levi Hemingway waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part #36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.); Denying as moot #52 Motion for More Definite Statement; Denying as moot #53 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #54 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.); denying as moot #56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.); denying as moot #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bart Bowe, Brian Scroggs. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Real Travel, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike #52 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Strike #51 Response/Reply (Other) Defendant, Catalyst Consulting Firm, LLC's, Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. (Steinfeld, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 51 REPLY to #40 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Motion for More Definite Statement by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. (Steinfeld, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Anthony Wilson on behalf of Allied Solution Group, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Striking #41 Notice of Attorney Appearance,,, filed by The Transfer Group, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, Allied Solution Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC by Allied Solution Group, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Josh Ungaro. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Mid-West Transfer, LLC. Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party The Mid-West Transfer, LLC(pty:dft). (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transfer For You LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Midwest Transfers LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by JJ&C Marketing, LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by JJ Midwest Marketing LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allied Solution Group, LLC. (Wilson, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 41 (Stricken)NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Anthony Wilson on behalf of Allied Solution Group, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro. Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Allied Solution Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party JJ Midwest Marketing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party JJ&C Marketing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Midwest Transfers LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party The Transfer Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Transfer For You LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Josh Ungaro(pty:dft). (Wilson, David) Modified text as per DE #49 on 10/31/2018 (lk). [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (re: Defendant, Catalyst Consulting Firm, LLC) filed by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Replies due by 11/6/2018. (Bennington, Alfred) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Midwest Transfers LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Clapp Business Law, LLC response due 11/9/2018; Mary Clapp, Esq. response due 11/9/2018. per DE 38 (cbr) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants, Clapp Business Law, LLC, and Mary Clapp, Esq. shall file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2018. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Complaint by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Attorney J. Scott Slater added to party Clapp Business Law, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Slater added to party Mary Clapp, Esq.(pty:dft). (Slater, J.) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. Responses due by 10/30/2018 (Steinfeld, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Steinfeld on behalf of Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. Attorney David Steinfeld added to party Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC(pty:dft). (Steinfeld, David) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 34 : Bart Bowe response due 11/2/2018; Real Travel, LLC response due 11/2/2018; Brian Scroggs response due 11/2/2018; The Transfer Group, LLC response due 11/2/2018; VCS Communications, LLC response due 11/2/2018; Vacation Consulting Services, LLC response due 11/2/2018. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants THE TRANSFER GROUP, LLC, VACATION CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC, VCS COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, BRIAN SCROGGS, REAL TRAVEL, LLC, and BART BOWE shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 2, 2018 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/12/2018. (mkz) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. 417 MRC LLC served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Bart Bowe, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, The Transfer Group, LLC, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Real Travel, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Bart Bowe served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. VCS Communications, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Matthew Tucker served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Donnelly Snellen served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Allied Solution Group, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Transfer For You LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Vacation Consulting Services, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. The Mid-West Transfer, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. JJ&C Marketing, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. JJ Midwest Marketing LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Brian Scroggs served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Clapp Business Law, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Josh Ungaro served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Mary Clapp, Esq. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. The Transfer Group, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. CLS, Inc. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon L. Zetrouer on behalf of Bart Bowe, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, The Transfer Group, LLC, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Bart Bowe(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Real Travel, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Brian Scroggs(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party The Transfer Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party VCS Communications, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Vacation Consulting Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Zetrouer, Shannon) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 7 Summons Issued restricted due to image issues. >Correction: Summonses redocketed as DE 11 as per DE 10 Notice of filing Proposed summonses (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #3 Summons Issued restricted due to image issues. >Correction: Summonses redocketed as DE #7 as per DE #6 Notice of filing Proposed summonses Other. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring counsel to meet and file Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorneys' listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s), #18 Summon(s), #19 Summon(s), #20 Summon(s))(lk) (Attachment 18 replaced on 9/17/2018) (lk). [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against 417 MRC LLC, Allied Solution Group, LLC, Bart Bowe, CLS, Inc., Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC, Dan Chudy, Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq., Jason Levi Hemingway, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, Donnelly Snellen, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Matthew Tucker, Josh Ungaro, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10997604, filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 27, #29 Summon(s) Summons - CLS, Inc. d/b/a Atlas Vacation Remedies d/b/a Principal Transfer Group, #30 Summon(s) Summons - Donnelly Snellen, #31 Summon(s) Summons - Jason Levi Hemingway, #32 Summon(s) Summons - Clapp Business Law, LLC, #33 Summon(s) Summons - Mary Clapp, Esq., #34 Summon(s) Summons - The Transfer Group, LLC, #35 Summon(s) Summons - Vacation Consulting Services, LLC, #36 Summon(s) VCS Communications, LLC, #37 Summon(s) Summons - Brian Scroggs, #38 Summon(s) Summons - Transfer for You, LLC, #39 Summon(s) Summons - Allied Solution Group, LLC, #40 Summon(s) Summons - JJ Midwest Marketing, LLC, #41 Summon(s) Summons - JJ&C Marketing, LLC, #42 Summon(s) Summons - The Mid-West Tranfer, LLC, #43 Summon(s) Summons - Midwest Transfers, LLC, #44 Summon(s) Summons - Josh Ungaro, #45 Summon(s) Summons - Mutual Release Corporation a/k/a 417 MRC LLC, #46 Summon(s) Summons - Dan Chudy, #47 Summon(s) Summons - Matthew Tucker, #48 Summon(s) Summons - Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC, #49 Summon(s) Summons - Real Travel, LLC, #50 Summon(s) Summons - Bart Bowe)(Bennington, Alfred) [Transferred from flsd on 2/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. CLS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 417 MRC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Chudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clapp Business Law, LLC
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Represented By: Mary M. Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mutual Release Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Levi Hemingway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: VCS Communications, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary Clapp, Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Represented By: Mary M. Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Transfer Group, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Real Travel, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Mid-West Transfer, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Midwest Transfers LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JJ Midwest Marketing LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CLS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bart Bowe
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Transfer For You LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donnelly Snellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Allied Solution Group, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Scroggs
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JJ&C Marketing, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vacation Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josh Ungaro
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CLS, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Atlas Vacation Remedies doing business as Principal Transfer Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shell Vacations, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SVC-West, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SVC-Hawaii, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SVC-Americana, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?