Bullard v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Maria Bullard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2019cv00289
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Steven D Merryday
1 Judge: Monte C Richardson
2 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #11 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security that the parties DO NOT CONSENT to the Magistrate (Rudy, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 8:19-cv-289-T-23MCR. Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service upon Regional Chief Counsel, Region IV, Social Security Administration, by Maria Bullard. (DG)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF of service upon Attorney General of the United States by Maria Bullard. (DG)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Maria Bullard. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (DG)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DG)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/11/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (DG)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Maria Bullard. (DG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Maria Bullard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bullard
Represented By: Stephan John Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?