Venegas v. One Paramedic et al

Plaintiff: Ramon Venegas
Defendant: One Paramedic and Two Paramedic
Case Number: 8:2019cv00299
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
1 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #5 Notice of appeal. (LNR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order by Ramon Venegas. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Venegas's Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/13/2019. (SM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1 issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/12/2019. (SRC)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One Paramedic, Two Paramedic with Jury Demand filed by Ramon Venegas.(Filing fee not paid.) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venegas v. One Paramedic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Paramedic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Paramedic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Venegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?